March 27, 2019 |
Filing
301
ORDER DENYING 285 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 3/27/2019. (nmf)
|
May 30, 2018 |
Filing
264
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 143 MOTION in Limine filed by Counselor Hill, Warden Butler, Chaplain Harner, Dietary Supervisor Newby, C/O Nagel, GRANTING 220 MOTION in Limine to Bar Plaintiff from testifying as an expert filed by Counselor Hill, Warden Butler, Chaplain Harner, Dietary Supervisor Newby, C/O Nagel; and GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART 138 MOTION in Limine filed by Durwyn Talley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 5/30/2018. (nmf)
|
May 24, 2018 |
Filing
262
ORDER FINDING AS MOOT IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 243 Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 5/24/2018. (nmf)
|
April 10, 2018 |
Filing
199
ORDER DENYING 153 MOTION to Reinstate filed by Durwyn Talley; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 154 MOTION to Copy filed by Durwyn Talley; GRANTING 160 MOTION to Copy filed by Durwyn Talley; DENYING 161 MOTION for Court Order and Inte rvention fied by Durwyn Talley; DENYING 162 MOTION for Copy filed by Durwyn Talley; DENYING 165 MOTION re 162 MOTION to Copy filed by Durwyn Talley; DENYING 166 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Durwyn Talley; DENYING 167 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Durwyn Talley; DENYING 170 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Durwyn Talley; FINDING AS MOOT 172 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Durwyn Talley; FINDING AS MO OT 173 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Durwyn Talley; DENYING 178 MOTION to Supplement filed by Durwyn Talley; DENYING 189 MOTION to the Court to Subpoena and Appoint U.S. EPA - United States Environmental Protection Agency Exp ert for Trial for the Issue of Lead Plumbing Systems, Tainted Water, etc., - Fed. R. Evid. 702 filed by Durwyn Talley; DENYING 190 MOTION for Substitution of Judges filed by Durwyn Talley; and DENYING 197 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Durwyn Talley. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Plaintiff a courtesy copy of the merit review order in this case (Doc. 13), as well as copies of Docs. 118, 120-121, 123-124, 126, and 142. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/10/2018. (nmf)
|
October 23, 2015 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 33 ); and DENIES Talleys third motion for a temporary restraining order or a preliminary injunction (Doc. 26 ). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/22/2015. (jdh)
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing
13
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier and DENYING as MOOT 12 MOTION for Status Update MOTION to Copy. Salvador Godinez, Jennifer Clendenin, and Counselor Ms Nippi are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Plaintiff m ay proceed on COUNT 1 against Defendants BUTLER, PREVIOUS WARDEN, DIETARY SUPERVISOR, and HEAD CHAPLAIN; COUNT 2 against Defendants BUTLER, PREVIOUS WARDEN, SEGREGATION PROPERTY OFFICER, and HILL;COUNT 3 against Defendant BUTLER; and COUNT 4 against Defendant BUTLER andPREVIOUS WARDEN. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/22/2014. (mkc)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
10
ORDER denying 1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Durwyn Talley. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 35 days of the date of this order (on or before November 4, 2014), Plaintiff shall file a compla int, thereby properly initiating an action. If Plaintiff still seeks injunctive relief, he must file a new motion. Failure to file a proper complaint by the prescribed deadline will result in the dismissal of this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Such a dismissal shall count as one of his three allotted strikes under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail to Plaintiff a Civil Rights Complaint form and instructions for a person in custody. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2014). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/30/2014. (tjk)
|