Dickey v. Harrington et al
Plaintiff: |
Maeceo Dickey |
Defendant: |
Richard Harrington, C/O Bebout, C/O Holmes, Sgt. Ealy, Nurse Stephanie and Nurse Missy |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01024 |
Filed: |
September 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Livingston |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Rosenstengel |
Presiding Judge: |
Donald G. Wilkerson |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 31, 2017 |
Filing
116
ORDER GRANTING 92 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Summary Judgment is GRANTED in favor of Defendant Harrington and against Plaintiff Maeceo Dickey as to Count 1 and in favor of Defendants Ealey, Bebout, and Harris and against Plaintiff Maeceo Dickey as to Count 4. Defendant Harrington and Count 4 are DISMISSED. This matter will proceed to trial on the claims and issues identified in the attached Order. Magistrate Judge Wilkerson is DIRECTED to recruit counsel for Plaintiff for trial. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial will be reset once an attorney enters an appearance on behalf of Plaintiff. Since counsel will be recruited for Dickey, 114 pro se Motion in Limine is DENIED without prejudice to counsel refiling if he or she deems it appropriate. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/31/17. (klh2)
|
June 12, 2015 |
Filing
66
ORDER GRANTING 37 Motion to Amend/Correct; DENYING 51 Motion to Compel; DENYING 53 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel ; DENYING 58 Motion for Protective Order; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 62 Motion for Issuance; DENYING 65 Motion to Appoint Counsel; STRIKING 44 , 52 , and 57 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/12/15. (sgp)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing
61
ORDER ADOPTING 48 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/23/15. (klh2)
|
December 18, 2014 |
Filing
36
ORDER DENYING 32 MOTION to Compel filed by Maeceo Dickey, GRANTING 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by Sgt. Ealy, Nurse Missy, Nurse Stephanie, C/O Bebout, Richard Harrington. C/O Bebout answer due 1/16/2015; Sgt. Ealy answer due 1/16/2015; Richard Harrington answer due 1/16/2015; Nurse Missy answer due 1/16/2015; Nurse Stephanie answer due 1/16/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/18/14. (sgp)
|
November 18, 2014 |
Filing
25
ORDER re 17 Waiver of Service Unexecuted as to Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/18/14. (sgp)
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/16/2014. (tjk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?