Owens v. Duncan et al
Plaintiff: |
James Owens |
Defendant: |
Stephen Duncan, Corkfeter, Tony Kittle, Phillipe, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3 and John Doe #4 |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01093 |
Filed: |
October 9, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Lawrence |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Reagan |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen C. Williams |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 15, 2017 |
Filing
132
JUDGMENT in favor of Burches, Chad Ray, Dana Darnold, John Doe #2, Roxanne McDonald, Tobey Rice against James Owens remaining issues have been settled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 11/15/2017. (amv)
|
January 12, 2017 |
Filing
100
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order the Motions for Summary Judgment filed by the Defendants (Docs. 72 , 78 ) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Defendants Hall, Ray, McDonald, and Rice; however, it is DENIED as to Defendant Phillippe. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment for Defendants Hall, Ray, McDonald, and Rice. Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as to Defend ant Duncan, as Plaintiff shall only be allowed to seek an injunction ordering that he be given a second foam mattress. Finally, since Plaintiff did not confirm the identity of John Doe 2 in the time allotted by Judge Williams, John Doe 2 is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 1/12/17. (rah)
|
January 30, 2015 |
Filing
19
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lawrence Correctional Center shall, within 21 days of this Order, provide the Clerk with the name and contact information for Defendant Corkfeter using the above information provided by Plaintiff. This information shall be used by the Clerk only for effecting service on defendant. Any documentation of the addresses shall not be maintained in the court file or otherwise disclosed by the Clerk. (Action due by 2/20/2015). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 1/30/2015. (tjk)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing
5
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 11/6/2014. (tjk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?