Madaris et al v. Adel Wiggins, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James E Madaris, Jr and Sandra S Madaris
Defendant: Adel Wiggins, Inc., Flowserve Corp., Ameron International Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Bucyrus International, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC., Crane Company, Buffalo Air Handling, Lear Siegler Diversified Holding, Inc., William Powell Company, Borgwagner Morse Tec, Inc., Standard Motor Products Inc, Riley Power, Inc., Hysol, Adel Wiggins Group, Flowserve Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, Formosa Plastics Corporation, USA, General Gasket Corporation, Curtis-Wright Corporation, Brand Insulation Company, Shell Chemical Company, Certain Teed Corporation, Zurn Industries LLC, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., John Deere Company, Imo Industries, Inc., Ametek, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., CBS Corporaton, Armstrong International, Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Cooper Industries, Inc., Pratt & Whitney, Special Electric Company, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Sprinkmann Insulation, Inc., 3M Company, Arvinmeritor, Inc., General Electric Company, Dezurik, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Dap, Inc., Sepco Corporation, Boeing Company, Pharmacia Corporation, Greene Tweed & Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Champlain Cable Corporation, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., CSR, Ltd., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Rockwell Automation Inc, Novartis Corporation, General Metals Corporation, Young Group Ltd., Industrial Holding Corporation, Alliant Techsystems, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Inc., Ford Motor Company, Rolls-Royce Corp, Union Carbide Corporation, Cooper Electric Supply Co., Warren Pumps, LLC., Bridgestone/Firestone America's Holding, Inc., Continental Teves, Northrop Grumman Advanced Information Systems, Inc., Flowserve U.S., Inc, Advanced Composites Group, Inc., Continental Motors, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Hercules, Inc., Lehigh Gasket Company, Sprinkman Sons Corporation, Cooper Crouse-Hinds, LLC, Square D, Reynolds Metals Company, Kelly Moore Paint Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., Eaton Corporation, ITT Corporation, Autoliv ASP, Inc., Peerless Pump Company, Inc., Triumph Group, Inc., General Rafractories Company, Texaco, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Hennessy Industries, Inc., CSR, Inc., Elliott Company, Alcoa, Inc. and Caterpillar Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv01223
Filed: October 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Stephen C Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING as MOOT #69 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice: On January 22, 2015, Plaintiffs filed a #60 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss the case without prejudice as to all Defendants. Responses were due on or before February 26, 2015. Because there was no objection to Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss, the Court granted the motion and dismissed the case without prejudice on April 15, 2015. Judgment was entered that same day. On July 16, 2015, three months later, the parties filed a #69 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Because judgment has been entered and the case is now closed, the Court DENIES the #69 Joint Motion to Dismiss as MOOT. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/9/15. (ceg)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 16, 2015 Filing 69 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by General Electric Company. Responses due by 8/20/2015 (Fournie, Raymond)
April 15, 2015 Filing 68 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/15/15. (mah)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING #60 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs James and Sandra Madaris: Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) a plaintiff may request dismissal of an action and the Court may dismiss on terms that it deems proper. Because there is no objection to Plaintiffs' Motion, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case on the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/15/15. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 11, 2015 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Lee, Jungmin)
February 11, 2015 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Lee, Jungmin)
February 11, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Jungmin Lee on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Lee, Jungmin)
February 11, 2015 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by Zurn Industries LLC.(Lee, Jungmin)
February 11, 2015 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord-Zurn Holdings, Inc. for Zurn Industries LLC. (Lee, Jungmin)
February 11, 2015 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Jungmin Lee on behalf of Zurn Industries LLC (Lee, Jungmin)
January 22, 2015 Filing 60 First MOTION to Dismiss all defendants by James E Madaris, Jr. Responses due by 2/26/2015 (Ferrell, James)
January 5, 2015 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiff's Second Amended) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS AND, COUNTERCLAIM for Contributions against BP Products North America, Inc., Boeing Company, Borgwagner Morse Tec, Inc., Brand Insulation Company, Bridgestone/Firestone America's Holding, Inc., Bucyrus International, Inc., Buffalo Air Handling, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., CBS Corporaton, CSR, Inc., CSR, Ltd., Caterpillar Inc., Certain Teed Corporation, Champlain Cable Corporation, Continental Motors, Inc., Continental Teves, Cooper Crouse-Hinds, LLC, Cooper Electric Supply Co., Cooper Industries, Inc., Crane Company, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Curtis-Wright Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC., Dap, Inc., Dezurik, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Elliott Company, Flowserve Corp., Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve U.S., Inc, Ford Motor Company, Formosa Plastics Corporation, USA, Foster Wheeler Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, General Gasket Corporation, General Metals Corporation, General Rafractories Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Goodrich Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Hennessy Industries, Inc., Hercules, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell, Inc., Hysol, ITT Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc., Industrial Holding Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., John Deere Company, Kelly Moore Paint Company, Lear Siegler Diversified Holding, Inc., Lehigh Gasket Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, 3M Company, Adel Wiggins, Inc., Advanced Composites Group, Inc., Alcoa, Inc., Alliant Techsystems, Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Ametek, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Autoliv ASP, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Northrop Grumman Advanced Information Systems, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Novartis Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Peerless Pump Company, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Pratt & Whitney, Reynolds Metals Company, Riley Power, Inc., Rockwell Automation Inc, Rolls-Royce Corp, Sepco Corporation, Shell Chemical Company, Special Electric Company, Inc., Sprinkman Sons Corporation, Sprinkmann Insulation, Inc., Square D, Standard Motor Products Inc, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Inc., Texaco, Inc., Trane US, Inc., Triumph Group, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC., William Powell Company, Young Group Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Zurn Industries LLC by John Crane, Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James C. Ferrell on behalf of Plaintiff James E Madaris, Jr (slh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 22, 2014 Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James C. Ferrell $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2484648 by on behalf of James E Madaris, Jr. (Ferrell, James)
December 19, 2014 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc.. (Fergus, Sean)
December 19, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Fergus on behalf of John Crane, Inc. (Fergus, Sean)
December 19, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura P. Yee on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Yee, Laura)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/9/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/19/14. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of the Parties)(amv)
December 18, 2014 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Scheduling and Discovery Conference held on 12/18/2014. Plaintiff's counsel does not appear. However the court did communicate with Attorney James Ferrell who is in the process of filing a motion for pro hac status. Mr. Ferrell participated in the joint proposed scheduling order. Keith Hill, Julie Fix Meyer, Ray Fournie, Ben Wilson, Ross Titzer, James Brodzik and Ken Nussbaumer for various defendants. Court adopts proposed scheduling order and reviews discovery dispute procedures.Status Conference set for 5/22/2015 at 9:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv, )THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #44 Motion for Institution of Denials under Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/18/14. (jcp)
December 18, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of William Powell Company (Dauphin, Michael)
December 17, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Guy Patrick Glazier on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Glazier, Guy)
December 15, 2014 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Powell Company. (Newton, Lise)
December 15, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Lise A. Newton on behalf of William Powell Company (Newton, Lise)
December 3, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Buffalo Air Handling(Individually and as Successor to Buffalo Forge Co.), Buffalo Pumps, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
November 18, 2014 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint , First and Second Amended Complaints and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex LLC(Successor-in -Interest to Abex Corporation).(Titzer, Ross)
November 18, 2014 Filing 44 First MOTION FOR INSTITUTION OF DENIALS UNDER FEDERAL RULE 5(c)(1)(B) by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Titzer, Ross)
November 18, 2014 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Titzer, Ross)
November 18, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross S. Titzer on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Titzer, Ross)
November 18, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Orris, Thomas)
November 18, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 12/18/2014 at 3:00 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
November 13, 2014 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brand Insulation Company. (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
November 13, 2014 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Brand Insulation Company.(Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
November 13, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth M. Nussbaumer on behalf of Brand Insulation Company (Nussbaumer, Kenneth)
November 13, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary D. Rychnovsky on behalf of Brand Insulation Company (Rychnovsky, Mary)
November 13, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Brand Insulation Company (Orris, Thomas)
November 6, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Hercules, Inc.. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
November 6, 2014 Filing 33 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint and Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Hercules, Inc..(Fournie, Raymond)
November 6, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Hercules, Inc.. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
November 6, 2014 Filing 31 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2016 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for February, 2016 in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/6/14. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb)
November 5, 2014 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Lockheed Martin Corporation.(Fournie, Raymond)
November 5, 2014 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, COUNTERCLAIM Jury Demand against All Defendants by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Geraci, Carl)
November 5, 2014 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative and Other Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, COUNTERCLAIM Jury Demand against All Defendants by Industrial Holding Corporation.(Geraci, Carl)
November 5, 2014 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Geraci, Carl)
November 5, 2014 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holding Corporation. (Geraci, Carl)
November 5, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie)
November 5, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of General Electric Company (King, Melanie)
November 5, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of General Electric Company (Kidd, Anita)
November 5, 2014 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
November 5, 2014 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM s, Answer to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Fournie, Raymond)
November 5, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of General Electric Company (Fournie, Raymond)
November 5, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Hercules, Inc. (Meyer, Julie)
November 5, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of Hercules, Inc. (King, Melanie)
November 5, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of Hercules, Inc. (Kidd, Anita)
November 5, 2014 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hercules, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ashland Inc. for Hercules, Inc.. (Fournie, Raymond)
November 5, 2014 Filing 15 STRICKEN AT DOC. 32 - Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint , Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Hercules, Inc..(Fournie, Raymond) Modified on 11/7/2014 (mar).
November 5, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of Hercules, Inc. (Fournie, Raymond)
November 4, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
November 4, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Industrial Holding Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company (Geraci, Carl)
November 4, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Industrial Holding Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company (Wilson, Benjamin)
November 3, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc. (Brodzik, James)
October 29, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Meyer, Julie)
October 29, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (King, Melanie)
October 29, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Kidd, Anita)
October 29, 2014 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Fournie, Raymond)
October 29, 2014 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Fournie, Raymond)
October 29, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE by Lockheed Martin Corporation to Plaintiffs of Filing of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Fournie, Raymond)
October 29, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation (Fournie, Raymond)
October 29, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lockheed Martin Corporation from Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, Illinois, case number 2013L 000663. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2434876) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Fournie, Raymond)
October 29, 2014 Filing 1 Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 14-cv-1223-NJR/SCW must be placed on all documents prior to filing them electronically. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(trb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madaris et al v. Adel Wiggins, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Wiggins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameron International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Air Handling
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Siegler Diversified Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: L. Alexa Newton
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwagner Morse Tec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hysol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Wiggins Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formosa Plastics Corporation, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Gasket Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis-Wright Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Insulation Company
Represented By: Kenneth M. Nussbaumer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Mary D. Rychnovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Teed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deere Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ametek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Electric Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprinkmann Insulation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Guy Patrick Glazier
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Laura P. Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlain Cable Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Metals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holding Corporation
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Techsystems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Electric Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone/Firestone America's Holding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Teves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Advanced Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve U.S., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Composites Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Gasket Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprinkman Sons Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Crouse-Hinds, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds Metals Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Moore Paint Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv ASP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Pump Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Rafractories Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcoa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Madaris, Jr
Represented By: James C. Ferrell
Represented By: Randy L. Gori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra S Madaris
Represented By: Randy L. Gori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?