J&JB Timberlands, LLC v. Woolsey Energy II, LLC et al

Plaintiff: J&JB Timberlands, LLC
Defendant: Woolsey Energy II, LLC and Woolsey Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv01318
Filed: November 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/11/2019. (sgp)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify (Doc. 64 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/20/2017. (tfs)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING in part Defendants' Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration (Doc. 3 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/30/2017. (tfs)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ADOPTING 44 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/25/2016. (rlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&JB Timberlands, LLC v. Woolsey Energy II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&JB Timberlands, LLC
Represented By: Thomas F. Crosby, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woolsey Energy II, LLC
Represented By: Ronald E. Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woolsey Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Ronald E. Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?