McCoy v. Edmeister et al
Plaintiff: |
Christopher H McCoy |
Defendant: |
Eric T Edmeister, Renee Strauss, Robin V Bryson and Jeffrey S Walton |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01379 |
Filed: |
December 16, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Williamson |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Rosenstengel |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 17, 2017 |
Filing
132
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER,Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. 131 ) for Findings and Conclusion of Law is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/17/2017. (jdh)
|
January 12, 2017 |
Filing
130
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. 128 ) to Transfer Record is MOOT. The Court CERTIFIES that this appeal is not taken in good faith and accordingly DENIES the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis (Doc. 129 ). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/12/2017. (jdh)
|
December 14, 2016 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court advises the Plaintiff that if he wishes to appeal the judgment in this case or the order denying his motion to reconsider, he must file a notice of appeal in this Court within30 days of entry of the order denying his motion to reconsider. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/14/2016. (jdh)
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing
121
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 119 MOTION for Reconsideration re 117 Memorandum & Order. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/30/2016. (jdh)
|
October 17, 2016 |
Filing
118
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Eric T Edmister, Jeffrey S Walton, Renee Strauss, Robin V Bryson against Christopher H McCoy. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/17/2016. (jdh)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing
94
ORDER DENYING 63 MOTION for Leave to Move the Honorable Court to Clarify Defendant's Position filed by Christopher H McCoy; DENYING 73 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Christopher H McCoy; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 77 MOTION for Leave For an Expansion of Interrogatory Limit filed by Christopher H McCoy; DENYING 80 MOTION for Leave to Place Action in Abeyance filed by Christopher H McCoy; DENYING 84 MOTION to Compel filed by Christopher H McCoy; FINDING AS MOOT IN PART AND DEN YING IN PART 85 MOTION to Stay Discovery, and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Interrogatories (Doc. 77 ) filed by Jeffrey S Walton, Eric T Edmeister; DENYING 87 MOTION filed by Christopher H McCoy; GRANTING 88 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Christopher H McCoy; and DENYING 89 MOTION to Compel filed by Christopher H McCoy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 4/29/2016. (nms)
|
January 4, 2016 |
Filing
43
ORDER ADOPTING 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's 37 Objection to Magistrate Judge Wilkerson's Report and Recommendation is OVERRULED, Magistrate Judge Wilkerson's 36 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED, and Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 01/04/2016. (bak)
|
May 14, 2015 |
Filing
24
ORDER ADOPTING 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and finding as MOOT 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 05/14/2015. (bak)
|
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
10
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/3/2015. (tjk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?