Davis v. Santos et al
Plaintiff: |
Willie Davis |
Defendant: |
Venerio Santos, Louis Shicker and Warden of Centralia Correctional Center |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00055 |
Filed: |
January 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Clinton |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Phil Gilbert |
Presiding Judge: |
Donald G. Wilkerson |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 21, 2018 |
Filing
117
ORDER ADOPTING 116 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Venerio Santos. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/21/2018. (klh2)
|
April 6, 2016 |
Filing
58
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court hereby ADOPTS the Report in itsentirety (Doc. 54 ) and DENIES Defendants Thomas Austin and Louis Shicker's Motion (Doc. 39 ) for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/6/2016. (jdh)
|
January 6, 2016 |
Filing
46
ORDER GRANTING 44 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Willie Davis. Attorney Eric A. Todd terminated. ORDER APPOINTING Attorney Dean Michael Athans for Willie Davis. Attorney Athans is DIRECTED to file his notice of appearance by 1/19/2016. Telephonic Sta tus Conference set for 1/29/2016 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Counsel for Defendant Shicker to direct the call by conferencing in counsel for all other parties and then calling the Court's conference line at 618-482-9004. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/6/2016. (nms)
|
October 30, 2015 |
Filing
42
ORDER GRANTING 41 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Willie Davis. Attorney Eric A. Todd for Willie Davis added. Attorney Todd to enter his appearance by 11/13/2015. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/2/2015 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/30/2015. (nms)
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 31 ) and DENIES Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 6 . Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/14/2015. (jdh)
|
January 23, 2015 |
Filing
5
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Plaintiff's request for a PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION is REFERRED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and Local Rule 72.1(c) to a United States Magistrate Judge, who shall resolve the request as soon as practicable and issue a report and recommendation. See attached order for details. (Action due by 3/2/2015). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/23/2015. (tjk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?