Allen et al v. Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allen, Vicki Pierce, James White, Samuel Lovell, Ray Hill, Ruby Rusk, Blossom Singer, Mike Wainz, Kathy Rush, Carl Miller, Maurice Jones, Floyd Parks, Clara Horton, Shannon Harding, Bobbie Brown, Joyce Sherman, Charles Heard, Dorothy Mann, Charles Rogers, Dane Hansen, Dewayne Ashley, Bobbie Terry, Jennifer Jackson, Michael Johnson, Carole Bellman, Lorna Edwards, Rose Lewis-Taylor, Jim Alter, Jill Reeves, Michael Hunt, Betsy Hall, Sandra Atherton Combs, Michael Tempel, Pat Schwartz, Marian Gluckhertz, Ella Lingard, Greg Kelly, Arthur Frost, William Meriweather, Susan Galfano, Debra Barrow, Sharon Brooks, Margaret Maxwell, Katrina Maltzman, Wayne Morgan, Kenneth Quillman, Melinda Blackmon, Maxie Dozier, Steven Payne, Richard Engelhardt, Kenneth Harris, Mary Hof, Rayburn Silver, Rodney Farwell, Ruby McDonald, Raymond Blase, Penny Bickford, Reva Gray, Stephen Roth, William Lambert, Joyce Barnes, Malcolm Reed, Karen Reed, Barbara Riley-Catlett, Kari Brittain, Velma Haley, Brandy Fletcher, Mona Sanders, James Guy, Cathy Pearce, Barquael Brown, Sherida Carter, Loraine Henderson, Michele Stone, Tonya Crawford, Renee Nelson, Roberta Hafner, Eric Choate, Carole Chalkus, Mertice Waters, Gregory Sureck, Diana Kuhar, Patricia Nolan, Edwin Schoenbeck, Charlene Hall, Paula Gianella, Charlotte Verga, Charles White, Catherine Roach, Lydia Douglas, Stella Jenkins, Betty Hobbs, Deborah Nicolai, Tasha Collins, Dan Deters, Carol Tassone, Tamala Ford, Carla Miget, Herman King, Leander Beatty, Bruce Deady, Linda Lapekas, Gary Jones, Michael Constellano, Doris Pugh, Norma Peebles, Jill Underwood, Eileen O'Sullivan, Linda Macy, Belinda Wilson, Emily Mitchell, Brian Burmingham, Rick Plouffe, William Polonius, Beverly Mikel, Catherine Maupin, Barbara Martin, Cheryl McLimans, Linda Oliver, Regina Wilson, Marian Devlin, Kathy Howard, Sandra Travis, Dorothy Hayseltt, Cecelia Braden, Fred Kininson, Linda Schomber, George Murry, Beverly Schulze, Angela Russell, Randy Miller, Chris Johnson, Carol Montague, Ricky Dixon, James Hagedorn, Rosario Turallo, Michael Shine, Anita Ohren, Jayne Graves, Theresa Standing, Pauline Kaesberg, Barbara Wittmer, Barbara Jernigan, Celia Spicer, Donna McEltrath, Sandra Jackson, Thomas Jones, Robert Nixon, Ina Latchison, James Wesley, Joy Curry, Andrew Weatherholt, Teresa Dennison, Eileen Buhlinger, Nora Benack, Erwin Ramelow, Joetta Boyd, James Madison, Matthew Weber, Eugene Thomas, Michael Gavin, Jay Roever, John Johnson, Michael Benskin, Peggy Malone, June Clay, Gyendolyn Ford, Louis Caimi, Irvin Roselman, Amato Crispino, Verne Vollrath, Juanita Duncan, Steven Kueker, David Hildestad, Lindsay Nalley, Rachel Hinton, Shirley Herbert, Gary Fults, Audie Helton, Patricia Burress, Mary Lee, Lindsay Hardy, Kelly Wright, Thomas Walker, Beat Raess, Barbara Welte, Jessie Anderson, Ezell James, Kevin Ogden, James Cochran, Jerry Schaedig, Diana Wirth, Gloria Brown, Lillian Brown, Beatrice Jones, TIfani Foster, Mary Fuller, Reed McClean, Rosie Bridges, Clyde Allen, Pauline Hill, Noah Cox, Angela Pirck, Jeanie Bach, Betty Phillips and Lee Seals
Defendant: Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00061
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Michael J Reagan
Referring Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2016 Filing 54 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 04/15/16. (dkd)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached order, the Court GRANTS Schnucks' motions to dismiss (Docs. #41 & #51 ) and DISMISSES the claims of Wilson, Bellman, Deters, Douglas, James, and Vollrath with prejudice. That order disposes of all of the remaining claims in this case, so the CLERK is DIRECTED to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 4/12/2016. (wtw)
February 16, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE by Schnuck Markets, Inc. re #51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution Claims of Plaintiffs Carole Bellman, Dan Deters, Lydia Douglas, Ezell James, and Verne Vollrath (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Exhibit 2 - USPS Tracking Information, #3 Exhibit 3 - Undelivered Mail)(Collignon, Casie)
November 30, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution Claims of Plaintiffs Carole Bellman, Dan Deters, Lydia Douglas, Ezell James, and Verne Vollrath by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. Responses due by 1/4/2016 (Collignon, Casie)
November 20, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE by Carole Bellman, Dan Deters, Lydia Douglas, Ezell James, Verne Vollrath re #49 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confirmation of Delivery to Carole Bellman of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw, #2 Exhibit Confirmation of Delivery to Dan Deters of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw, #3 Exhibit Confirmation of Delivery to Lydia Douglas of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw, #4 Exhibit Confirmation of Delivery to Ezell James of Order Granting Motion to Withdraw, #5 Exhibit Obituary of Verne Vollrath)(Quinn, Christopher)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #45 , #46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John J. Driscoll and Christopher J. Quinn terminated from their representation of Plaintiffs Carole Bellman, Dan Deters, Lydia Douglas, Ezell James, and Verne Vollrath. Attorneys John J. Driscoll and Christopher J. Quinn are ORDERED to serve a copy of this Order upon all unrepresented parties within 7 days and file a notice with the Court indicating when and how all unrepresented parties were served with such notice by November 20, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/6/2015. (nms)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 47 10/26/15 Order: The Court's October 26, 2015 Order (Doc. 47) contained a typographical error. The undersigned STRIKES Doc. 47 and ENTERS the following: On October 16, 2015, counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendant submitted a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, seeking to dismiss the claims of 199 of the Plaintiffs in this case with prejudice because a settlement was reached between Defendant and those Plaintiffs. Accordingly, the Court finds that the claims for these settling Plaintiffs are DISMISSED with prejudice, without costs or fees to any party for those claims. The claims in the complaint relevant to the six non-settling Plaintiffs remain active following entry of this order. The Clerk's office will enter judgment for the settling parties at the close of this case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 10/28/15. (wtw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STRICKEN PER ORDER AT DOCUMENT 48-ORDER: On October 16, 2015, counsel for Plaintiffs in this Fair Labor Standards Act collective action case and counsel for Defendant submitted a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, seeking to dismiss the claims of 199 of the Plaintiffs in this case with prejudice because a settlement was reached between Defendant and those Plaintiffs. Accordingly, the Court finds that the claims for these settling Plaintiffs are DISMISSED with prejudice, without costs or fees to any party for those claims. The claims in the complaint relevant to the six non-settling Plaintiffs remain active following entry of this order. The Clerk's office will enter judgment for the settling parties at the close of this case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 10/26/15. (dkd) Modified on 10/29/2015 (trb).
October 16, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Carole Bellman, Dan Deters, Lydia Douglas, Ezell James, Verne Vollrath. (Quinn, Christopher)
October 16, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Carole Bellman, Dan Deters, Lydia Douglas, Ezell James, Verne Vollrath. (Driscoll, John)
October 16, 2015 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
October 12, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE by Schnuck Markets, Inc. re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution re Plaintiff Belinda Wilson OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON BELINDA WILSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Service)(Collignon, Casie)
October 5, 2015 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Status Conference held on 10/5/2015. The Court has been informed that settlement as to some parties is imminent. Motions to dismiss plaintiffs that have agreed to the terms of the settlement SHALL be filed by October 16, 2015. Motions related to plaintiffs' counsel's representation of those plaintiffs that have not agreed to the terms of the settlement SHALL be filed by October 16, 2015. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 23, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution re Plaintiff Belinda Wilson by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. Responses due by 10/26/2015 (Collignon, Casie)
September 8, 2015 Filing 40 Certified mail card returned as to Belinda Wilson. (trb)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Belinda Wilson and #32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Belinda Wilson filed by Belinda Wilson. Attorneys John J. Driscoll and Christopher J. Quinn terminated. Plaintiff Belinda Wilson must either retain counsel, who must file a notice of appearance on her behalf, or inform the Court of her intention to proceed in this matter pro se, in writing, by September 18, 2015. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Belinda Wilson's last known address, 2200 1st Street, Apt. 404, Moline, IL 61625, via certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/27/2015. (nms)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum & Order, Schnucks' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #19 ) and Schnucks' Motion to Transfer (Doc. #5 ) are respectively DENIED. See attached for details. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 8/27/2015. (jls)
August 17, 2015 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Status Conference held on 8/17/2015. Attorney Christopher J. Quinn for Plaintiffs and Attorneys Russell K. Scott and Casie D. Collignon for Defendant. If the parties seek a stay or continuance of any dates in this matter, they are directed to file a motion. (Court Reporter n/a.) (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 13, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Hearing: Per the reqeust of the parties, a Telephonic Status Conference is set for August 17, 2015 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Counsel for Defendant to initiate the call by conferencing in counsel for Plaintiffs and then calling the Court's conference line at 618-482-9004. (nms)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 30 Discovery Dispute Conference: Defendants are INSTRUCTED to submit a motion for protective order, including a proposed protective order for review, with the revised definition of "Confidential Information" submitted to the Court via email on July 22, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/11/2015. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 10, 2015 Filing 34 Receipt for Certified Mail Returned Signed by Plaintiff. Order at Document 33 sent to Belinda Wilson. Signed for delivery on 8/7/2015. (anm)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Belinda Wilson filed by Belinda Wilson, and #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Belinda Wilson. Hearing on counsel's motion to withdraw is SET for 8/26/2015 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Plaintiff Belinda Wilson's appearance at the hearing is MANDATORY, as is attendance by Plaintiff's current counsel. Defendant's counsel may, but is not required, to appear. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Belinda Wilson's last known address, 2200 1st Street, Apt. 404, Moline, IL 61265, via certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/3/2015. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Belinda Wilson by Belinda Wilson. (Driscoll, John)
July 21, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Belinda Wilson. (Quinn, Christopher)
July 20, 2015 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 7/20/2015. Attorneys John J. Driscoll and Christopher J. Quinn for Plaintiffs and Attorneys Russell K. Scott, Casie D. Collignon, and Paul Karlsgodt for Defendant. The parties discussed their dispute concerning the entry of Defendant's proposed protective order in this matter. Based on Plaintiff's arguments concerning the definition of "Confidential Information" and the Seventh Circuit's analysis of such, as well as their argument that Defendant bears the burden of establishing the confidentiality of documents, Defendant may submit a revised definition of "Confidential Information," and any relevant case law to support such, to the Court's proposed documents email, DGWpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov, by close of business on July 22, 2015, ensuring counsel for Plaintiffs is included on any such email. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 17, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference set for July 20, 2015 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. The parties have informed the Court of a dispute regarding the entry of a protective order in this matter. The Court does NOT need briefing on this issue prior to the telephone conference, if the Court requires briefing, it will order such at the conference. Counsel for Defendant shall direct the call by conferencing in counsel for Plaintiffs and then calling the Court's conference line at 618-482-9004. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 29, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 26 Order, Set Hearings 27 Order, Set Hearings. Order setting firm trial dates at doc 26 and 27 entered in incorrect case. Document 25 remains in place setting this case for a firm trial date of 9:00 a.m. Monday, June 20, 2016 and final pretrial conference for 1:30 p.m. Friday, June 10, 2016. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENTRY STRICKEN: ORDER SETTING FIRM TRIAL DATE: Chief Judge Reagan is returning to a system of assigning firm trial dates for all his civil cases. We are in the process of converting presumptive trial months to firm trial dates and adjusting the final pretrial conference, where warranted. Your case, currently set for the presumptive trial month of December, 2016 is hereby RE-SET with the firm trial date of 9:00 a.m. Monday, December 19, 2016. The final pretrial conference is hereby CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m., Friday, December 9, 2016. If the trial date presents extraordinary difficulties for you (e.g., nonrefundable plane tickets, a conflicting firm trial setting in another federal district court, a pre-planned medical procedure), you may request a different trial setting by consulting with opposing counsel and -- within 21 days of today -- filing a joint "Motion to Re-Set Firm Trial Date" articulating the extraordinary reason justifying a continuance. Questions regarding this notice may be addressed to Judge Reagan's Courtroom Deputy (Debbie, 618-482-9298) or the law clerk assigned to your case (John, 618-482-9424). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 5/18/15. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENTRY STRICKEN: ORDER SETTING FIRM TRIAL DATE: Chief Judge Reagan is returning to a system of assigning firm trial dates for all his civil cases. We are in the process of converting presumptive trial months to firm trial dates and adjusting the final pretrial conference, where warranted. Your case, currently set for the presumptive trial month of July, 2016 is hereby RE-SET with the firm trial date of 9:00 a.m. Monday, July, 18, 2016. The final pretrial conference is hereby CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. Friday, July 8, 2016. If the trial date presents extraordinary difficulties for you (e.g., nonrefundable plane tickets, a conflicting firm trial setting in another federal district court, a pre-planned medical procedure), you may request a different trial setting by consulting with opposing counsel and -- within 21 days of today -- filing a joint "Motion to Re-Set Firm Trial Date" articulating the extraordinary reason justifying a continuance. Questions regarding this notice may be addressed to Judge Reagan's Courtroom Deputy (Debbie, 618-482-9298) or the law clerk assigned to your case (John, 618-482-9424). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 5/18/15. (dkd)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING FIRM TRIAL DATE: Chief Judge Reagan is returning to a system of assigning firm trial dates for all his civil cases. We are in the process of converting presumptive trial months to firm trial dates and adjusting the final pretrial conference, where warranted. Your case, currently set for the presumptive trial month of June, 2016 is hereby RE-SET with the firm trial date of 9:00 a.m. Monday, June 20, 2016. The final pretrial conference is hereby CONTINUED to 1:30 p.m. Friday, June 10, 2016. If the trial date presents extraordinary difficulties for you (e.g., nonrefundable plane tickets, a conflicting firm trial setting in another federal district court, a pre-planned medical procedure), you may request a different trial setting by consulting with opposing counsel and -- within 21 days of today -- filing a joint "Motion to Re-Set Firm Trial Date" articulating the extraordinary reason justifying a continuance. Questions regarding this notice may be addressed to Judge Reagan's Courtroom Deputy (Debbie, 618-482-9298) or the law clerk assigned to your case (John, 618-482-9424). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 05/18/15. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 7, 2015 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
April 23, 2015 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Clyde Allen, Jim Alter, Jessie Anderson, Dewayne Ashley, Sandra Atherton Combs, Jeanie Bach, Joyce Barnes, Debra Barrow, Leander Beatty, Carole Bellman, Nora Benack, Michael Benskin, Penny Bickford, Melinda Blackmon, Raymond Blase, Joetta Boyd, Cecelia Braden, Rosie Bridges, Kari Brittain, Sharon Brooks, Barquael ` Brown, Gloria Brown, Lillian Brown, Bobbie Brown, Eileen Buhlinger, Brian Burmingham, Patricia Burress, Louis Caimi, Sherida Carter, Carole Chalkus, Eric Choate, June Clay, James Cochran, Tasha Collins, Michael Constellano, Noah Cox, Tonya Crawford, Amato Crispino, Joy Curry, Bruce Deady, Teresa Dennison, Dan Deters, Marian Devlin, Ricky Dixon, Lydia Douglas, Maxie Dozier, Juanita Duncan, Lorna Edwards, Richard Engelhardt, Rodney Farwell, Brandy Fletcher, Gyendolyn Ford, Tamala Ford, TIfani Foster, Arthur Frost, Mary Fuller, Gary Fults, Susan Galfano, Michael Gavin, Paula Gianella, Marian Gluckhertz, Jayne Graves, Reva Gray, James Guy, Roberta Hafner, James Hagedorn, Velma Haley, Betsy Hall, Charlene Hall, Dane Hansen, Shannon Harding, Lindsay Hardy, Kenneth Harris, Dorothy Hayseltt, Charles Heard, Audie Helton, Loraine Henderson, Shirley Herbert, David Hildestad, Pauline Hill, Ray Hill, Rachel Hinton, Betty Hobbs, Mary Hof, Clara Horton, Kathy Howard, Michael Hunt, Jennifer Jackson, Sandra Jackson, Ezell James, Stella Jenkins, Barbara Jernigan, Chris Johnson, John Johnson, Michael Johnson, Beatrice Jones, Gary Jones, Maurice Jones, Thomas Jones, Pauline Kaesberg, Greg Kelly, Herman King, Fred Kininson, Steven Kueker, Diana Kuhar, William Lambert, Linda Lapekas, Ina Latchison, Mary Lee, Rose Lewis-Taylor, Ella Lingard, Samuel Lovell, Linda Macy, James Madison, Peggy Malone, Katrina Maltzman, Dorothy Mann, Barbara Martin, Catherine Maupin, Margaret Maxwell, Reed McClean, Ruby McDonald, Donna McEltrath, Cheryl McLimans, William Meriweather, Carla Miget, Beverly Mikel, Carl Miller, Randy Miller, Emily Mitchell, Carol Montague, Wayne Morgan, George Murry, Lindsay Nalley, Renee Nelson, Deborah Nicolai, Robert Nixon, Patricia Nolan, Eileen O'Sullivan, Kevin Ogden, Anita Ohren, Linda Oliver, Floyd Parks, Steven Payne, Cathy Pearce, Norma Peebles, Betty Phillips, Vicki Pierce, Angela Pirck, Rick Plouffe, William Polonius, Doris Pugh, Kenneth Quillman, Beat Raess, Erwin Ramelow, Karen Reed, Malcolm Reed, Jill Reeves, Barbara Riley-Catlett, Catherine Roach, Jay Roever, Charles Rogers, Irvin Roselman, Stephen Roth, Kathy Rush, Ruby Rusk, Angela Russell, Mona Sanders, Jerry Schaedig, Edwin Schoenbeck, Linda Schomber, Beverly Schulze, Pat Schwartz, Lee Seals, Joyce Sherman, Michael Shine, Rayburn Silver, Blossom Singer, Celia Spicer, Theresa Standing, Michele Stone, Gregory Sureck, Carol Tassone, Michael Tempel, Bobbie Terry, Eugene Thomas, Sandra Travis, Rosario Turallo, Jill Underwood, Charlotte Verga, Verne Vollrath, Mike Wainz, Thomas Walker, Mertice Waters, Andrew Weatherholt, Matthew Weber, Barbara Welte, James Wesley, Charles White, James White, Belinda Wilson, Regina Wilson, Diana Wirth, Barbara Wittmer, Kelly Wright. (Quinn, Christopher)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 3/26/2015. (jmp)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/5/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2016. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/5/2015 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the phone call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 3/26/2015. (jmp)
March 26, 2015 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Scheduling Conference held on 3/19/2015. Attorney John J. Driscoll for Plaintiffs and Attorney Russell K. Scott for Defendant. The parties discussed the schedule in this matter. Scheduling Order to issue. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 20, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2015 (Scott, Russell)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Othewrise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc. Schnuck Markets, Inc.'s answer due March 20, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 3/12/2015. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 12, 2015 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Othewrise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
February 25, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 3/19/2015 at 4:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (jmp)
February 16, 2015 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Missouri filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Scott, Russell)
February 9, 2015 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Missouri . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Quinn, Christopher)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Collignon. (anm)
January 28, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Casie D Collignon $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2516089 by on behalf of Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Collignon, Casie)
January 28, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Quinn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Quinn, Christopher)
January 28, 2015 Filing 10 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2016 at 09:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. Bench Trial set for presumptive month of June, 2016 in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. The parties should note that (for non-prisoner civil cases set after October 31, 2014) District Judge Reagan has recently altered procedures so as to schedule presumptive trial months rather than firm dates. As such, parties and attorneys who have previously appeared before Judge Reagan should be sure they are not relying on older copies of Judge Reagan's case management procedures, and are familiar with current procedures (which can be found on the Court website) (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(dkd)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Karlsgodt. (anm)
January 26, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul Karlsgodt $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2512544 by on behalf of Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Karlsgodt, Paul)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc. Schnuck Markets, Inc. answer due 3/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/26/2015. (nms) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 23, 2015 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Missouri filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Scott, Russell)
January 23, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Missouri by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Scott, Russell)
January 23, 2015 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Scott, Russell)
January 23, 2015 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Scott, Russell)
January 20, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schnuck Markets, Inc. from St. Clair County, case number 14-L-785. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2507149) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - McGann Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Castellano Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Summons, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Pleadings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Russell)
January 20, 2015 Filing 1 Case Opened. Documents may now be electronically filed. Case number 15-61-MJR/DGW must be placed on all documents prior to electronically filing them. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Pierce
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Lovell
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Hill
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Rusk
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blossom Singer
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Wainz
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Rush
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Miller
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Jones
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Parks
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Horton
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Harding
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Brown
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Sherman
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Heard
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Mann
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rogers
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane Hansen
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Ashley
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Terry
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jackson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Bellman
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Edwards
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Lewis-Taylor
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Alter
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Reeves
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hunt
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Hall
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Atherton Combs
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Tempel
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Schwartz
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Gluckhertz
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Lingard
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Kelly
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Frost
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Meriweather
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Galfano
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Barrow
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Brooks
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Maxwell
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Maltzman
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Morgan
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Quillman
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Blackmon
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxie Dozier
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Payne
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Engelhardt
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Harris
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hof
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayburn Silver
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Farwell
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby McDonald
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Blase
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Bickford
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reva Gray
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Roth
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lambert
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Barnes
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Reed
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Reed
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Riley-Catlett
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari Brittain
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velma Haley
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Fletcher
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Sanders
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Guy
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Pearce
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barquael Brown
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherida Carter
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine Henderson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Stone
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Crawford
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Nelson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Hafner
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Choate
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Chalkus
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mertice Waters
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sureck
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Kuhar
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Nolan
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Schoenbeck
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Hall
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Gianella
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Verga
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles White
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Roach
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Douglas
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Jenkins
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Hobbs
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Nicolai
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Collins
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Deters
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Tassone
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamala Ford
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Miget
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman King
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leander Beatty
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Deady
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lapekas
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Jones
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Constellano
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Pugh
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Peebles
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Underwood
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen O'Sullivan
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Macy
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Wilson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Mitchell
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Burmingham
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Plouffe
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Polonius
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Mikel
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Maupin
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Martin
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl McLimans
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Oliver
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Wilson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Devlin
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Howard
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Travis
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Hayseltt
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecelia Braden
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Kininson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Schomber
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Murry
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Schulze
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Russell
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Miller
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Montague
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Dixon
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hagedorn
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Turallo
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shine
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Ohren
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayne Graves
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Standing
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Kaesberg
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Wittmer
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Jernigan
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Spicer
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna McEltrath
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Jackson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jones
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nixon
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina Latchison
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wesley
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Curry
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Weatherholt
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Dennison
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Buhlinger
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Benack
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erwin Ramelow
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joetta Boyd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Madison
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Weber
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Thomas
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gavin
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Roever
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Johnson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Benskin
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Malone
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Clay
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gyendolyn Ford
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Caimi
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin Roselman
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amato Crispino
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verne Vollrath
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Duncan
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kueker
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hildestad
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Nalley
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Hinton
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Herbert
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Fults
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audie Helton
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Burress
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lee
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Hardy
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Wright
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Walker
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beat Raess
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Welte
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Anderson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezell James
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ogden
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cochran
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Schaedig
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Wirth
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Brown
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Brown
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Jones
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIfani Foster
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Fuller
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed McClean
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Bridges
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Allen
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Hill
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Cox
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Pirck
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanie Bach
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Phillips
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Seals
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Represented By: Paul Karlsgodt
Represented By: Russell K. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?