Donelson v. Shearing et al
Plaintiff: |
Charles Donelson |
Defendant: |
Dr Shearing and Dr Nwaobasi |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00095 |
Filed: |
January 29, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Livingston |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip M. Frazier |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Phil Gilbert |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 13, 2018 |
Filing
314
ORDER DENYING Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Donelson (Doc. 310 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/13/2018. (mah)
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
257
ORDER DENYING Motion to Amend/Correct 246 Order, Terminate Motions filed by Charles Donelson (Doc. 251 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/14/2017. (mah)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
246
ORDER: Defendant Aimee Lang's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 226 ) is GRANTED. Defendants Nwaobosi and Shearing's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 216 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for Defendant Aimee Lang and against Plaintiff Charles Donelson on Count 3 at the close of the case. Counts 1 and 2 against Defendants Samuel Nwaobosi and Robert Shearing will proceed to trial. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/19/2017. (mah).
|
May 30, 2017 |
Filing
238
ORDER DENYING Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Donelson (Doc. 213 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/30/2017. (mah)
|
May 9, 2017 |
Filing
233
ORDER denying 192 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 207 Motion to Compel; denying 209 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel; denying 210 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 219 Motion for Extension of Time to File Respo nse/Reply; denying 221 Motion for Order; granting 222 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 230 Motion to Strike. Defendant Lang shall respond to Plaintiffs discovery requests by May 30, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 5/9/17. (dam)
|
December 6, 2016 |
Filing
194
ORDER DENYING Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Charles Donelson (Doc. 191 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/6/2016. (mah).
|
November 22, 2016 |
Filing
189
ORDER DENYING Appeal of Magistrate Decision to District Court by Charles Donelson re 177 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Doc. 182 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/22/2016. (mah)
|
March 9, 2016 |
Filing
145
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Magistrate Judge Frazier is DIRECTED to recruit counsel for Plaintiff Charles Donelson. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/8/2016. (jdh)
|
June 22, 2015 |
Filing
57
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court hereby ADOPTS the Report in its entirety (Doc. 35 ). Defendants Atchinson, Wexford, Butler, Tilden, Harrington, Caruso, Oakley, and Shicker are DISMISSED with prejudice from this action. Defendants Ojelade and John Do es 1-15 are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendant Lane(1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6(Waiver of Service of Summons). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail these forms, a copy of the complaint, and this Memorandum and Order to each Defendants place of employment as identified by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/22/2015. (jdh)
|
February 23, 2015 |
Filing
6
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/20/2015. (tjk)
|
January 29, 2015 |
Filing
1
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER severing case no. 14-1311-SMY. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/28/2015. (tjk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?