Ellis v. Afton Pumps, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Ellis
Defendant: Afton Pumps, Inc., Air & Liquid System Corporation, Ameron International Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, A.W. Chesterton Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Corporation, Blackmer Pump Company, Boise Cascade Company, Borg-Warner Corporation, Burnham LLC, Carver Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, The Cincinnati Gasket Packing & MFG., Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Clyde Union Inc., Compudyne Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Crane Co., Pentair, Crown, Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Dap, Inc., Datron Inc. Liquidating Trust, Dezurik, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Eaton Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve Corp., Flowserve Corporation F/K/A, Flowserve US Inc., Fluor Corporation, FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The Gorman-Rupp Company, Gould Electronics, Inc., Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Co., Inc, Grinnell LLC, Hercules, Inc., Honeywell Inc, Honeywell International, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, ITT Corporation, ITT Exelis, James Walker MFG., Co, John Crane , Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, Krogh Pump Company, Lamons Gasket Company, McCord Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Melrath Gasket, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nagle Pumps, Inc., Oberdorfer Pumps, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Resco Holdings LLC, Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric Company, Sepco Corp., Siemans Energy & Automation Inc., Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., SPX Corporation, Strahman Valves, Inc., Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc., Surface Combustions, Inc., SVI Corporation, Taco, Inc., URS Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Valve and Primer Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Weil-Mclain Company, Weil Pump Company, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc., The William Powell Company, York International Corporation, Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC and Zurn Industries
Cross_claimant: Crane Co., Ingersoll-Rand Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Hercules, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve Corporation F/K/A, Flowserve Corp., Honeywell International, Inc., Schneider Electric Company, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Gardner Denver, Inc and Zurn Industries
Cross_defendant: Crane Co., A.O. Smith Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Company, Afton Pumps, Inc., Air & Liquid System Corporation, Ameron International Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Bechtel Construction Company, Bechtel Corporation, Bird Corporation, Blackmer Pump Company, Boise Cascade Company, Borg-Warner Corporation, Burnham LLC, CBS Corporation, Carver Pump Company, Certain-Teed Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Chicago Gasket Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Clyde Union Inc., Compudyne Corporation, Copes-Vulcan, Crown, Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Dap, Inc., Datron Inc. Liquidating Trust, Dezurik, Inc., Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corp., Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve Corporation F/K/A, Flowserve US Inc., Fluor Corporation, Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Gould Electronics, Inc., Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Graybar Electric Company, Inc., Greene Tweed & Co., Inc, Grinnell LLC, Hercules, Inc., Honeywell Inc, Honeywell International, Inc., ITT Corporation, ITT Exelis, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, James Walker MFG., Co, John Crane , Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Krogh Pump Company, Lamons Gasket Company, McCord Corporation, McMaster-Carr Supply Company, Melrath Gasket, Inc., Metallo Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Mueller Steam Specialty Company, Nagle Pumps, Inc., Oberdorfer Pumps, Inc., Pentair, Pneumo Abex LLC, Resco Holdings LLC, SPX Corporation, SVI Corporation, Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric Company, Sepco Corp., Siemans Energy & Automation Inc., Special Electric Company, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Strahman Valves, Inc., Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc., Surface Combustions, Inc., Taco, Inc., The Cincinnati Gasket Packing & MFG., Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company, The Kraissl Company, Incorporated, The William Powell Company, URS Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Valve and Primer Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Weil Pump Company, Inc., Weil-Mclain Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc., York International Corporation, Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC and Zurn Industries
Case Number: 3:2015cv00140
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Rosenstengel
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER GRANTING 609 Motion to Substitute Party. ; GRANTING 609 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 3/15/16. (sgp)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 561 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/8/2016, Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2016, Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/25/2015 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Settlement conference date, Final Pretrial Conference date, and trial date remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/11/15. (sgp)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 536 MOTION to Amend/Correct 395 Amended Complaint filed by Richard Ellis. ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2015.). TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT 556 Joint MOTION to Bar Plaintiff's Undisclosed Witnesses. ( Responses due by 8/13/2015). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/5/15. (sgp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Afton Pumps, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afton Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid System Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameron International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Construction Company
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boise Cascade Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Bridge & Iron Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Gasket Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Gasket Packing & MFG., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Union Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compudyne Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Datron Inc. Liquidating Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: J. Todd Applegate
Represented By: Brian J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corp.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation F/K/A
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Co., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Exelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walker MFG., Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane , Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kraissl Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krogh Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCord Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMaster-Carr Supply Company
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melrath Gasket, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metallo Gasket Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mueller Steam Specialty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagle Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oberdorfer Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resco Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric Company
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepco Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemans Energy & Automation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Electric Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strahman Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surface Combustions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valve and Primer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-Mclain Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil Pump Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ellis
Represented By: Stephanie L. Gold
Represented By: Benjamin R. Schmickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Chicago Bridge & Iron Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Hercules, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Flowserve Corporation F/K/A
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Flowserve Corp.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Schneider Electric Company
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: McMaster-Carr Supply Company
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Gardner Denver, Inc
Represented By: Marcus Rockwell Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Zurn Industries
Represented By: Marcus Rockwell Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Afton Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Air & Liquid System Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ameron International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Armstrong Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Bechtel Construction Company
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Bechtel Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Bird Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Boise Cascade Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Burnham LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Carver Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Chicago Bridge & Iron Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Chicago Gasket Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Clyde Union Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Compudyne Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Copes-Vulcan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dap, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Datron Inc. Liquidating Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dezurik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Flowserve Corp.
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Flowserve Corporation F/K/A
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Fluor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc
Represented By: Marcus Rockwell Morrow
Represented By: Marcus Rockwell Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gould Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Greene Tweed & Co., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Hercules, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Honeywell Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ITT Exelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: James Walker MFG., Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John Crane , Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Krogh Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: McCord Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: McMaster-Carr Supply Company
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Melrath Gasket, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Metallo Gasket Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Mueller Steam Specialty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Nagle Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Oberdorfer Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Pentair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Resco Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: SPX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: SVI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Saint Gobain Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Schneider Electric Company
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Represented By: Dennis J. Dobbels
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sepco Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Siemans Energy & Automation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Special Electric Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Daniel W. McGrath
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Haley Marie Schumacher
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Strahman Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sulzer Pumps (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Surface Combustions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Taco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Cincinnati Gasket Packing & MFG., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Represented By: Paul P. Waller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Kraissl Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: URS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Valve and Primer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Weil Pump Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Weil-Mclain Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: York International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Zurn Industries
Represented By: Marcus Rockwell Morrow
Represented By: Marcus Rockwell Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?