Allen v. Westfall et al
Plaintiff: |
Roderick T Allen |
Defendant: |
C/O Westfall, J Engelage, C/O Berner, M. Hanks, C/O Hopp, C/O Kempler, C/O Hoffman and C/O Reynolds |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00175 |
Filed: |
February 19, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Randolph |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Reagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 28, 2021 |
Filing
23
ORDER denying 22 Motion for Rescission/Modification of Filing Restriction. The FILING RESTRICTION REMAINS IN EFFECT and is EXTENDED until Allen has paid his outstanding filing fees of $8,8350.00. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to continue ret urning any documents submitted in violation of the Order Imposing Filing Restriction (Doc. 15 , p. 5) to Allen unfiled. Allen may seek modification or rescission of this Order by filing a motion in this Court no earlier than two years from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 10/28/2021. (jrj)
|
September 11, 2017 |
Filing
21
ORDER denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the FILING RESTRICTION (Doc. 15, p. 7) remains in effect and is EXTENDED by one year until August 18, 2018. The Clerk is again DIRECTED to return any documents submitted in vi olation of this Order and the Order Imposing Filing Restriction (Doc. 15, p. 5) to Plaintiff unfiled.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request to file the new case is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to open the new case effective September 7, 2017, which is the date it was received. The new case shall be ASSIGNED to the undersigned judge. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/9/2017. (tjk)
|
August 18, 2015 |
Filing
15
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. This dismissal shall NOT count as another strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Roderick Al len, #R94327, is hereby RESTRICTED from filing any new civil actions in this Court until such time as his outstanding filing fees of $6,625.00 have been paid in full. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 8/18/2015. (tjk)
|
July 6, 2015 |
Filing
13
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is DENIED without prejudice.IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 6) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee of $400.00 for this action within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this Order (on or before August 5, 2015). If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order in the time allotted by the Court, this case will be dismissed.(Action due by 8/5/2015). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 7/6/2015. (tjk)
|
March 11, 2015 |
Filing
4
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to withdraw complaint (Doc. 3) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file his First Amended Complaint on or before April 15, 2015. Should Plaintiff fail to file his Fi rst Amended Complaint within the allotted time or consistent with the instructions set forth in this Order, the entire case will be dismissed. To enable Plaintiff to comply with these orders, the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form and another Motion and Affidavit to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2015). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 3/10/2015. (tjk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?