Luera v. Godinez et al
Petitioner: Jose Luera
Respondent: Salvador A. Godinez, Tracey Engelson, Margaret Thompson, Major Lyerla, Sergeant Birk and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2015cv00350
Filed: March 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Presiding Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER: 255 Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED. Attorneys Kyler Stevens, Matthew Clyde, and Patricia Simons are TERMINATED as counsel of record for Plaintiff Jose Luera. 241 Motion for New Trial is DENIED. 248 Motion to Reopen Time to Fil e Notice of Appeal is DENIED. 249 Motion for Relief from Judgment is DENIED. 258 Omnibus Motion for Equitable Relief is DENIED. 259 Motion re: Bill of Costs is DENIED. 260 Motion for Leave to File Pro Se Supplemental Motion for New Trial is DENIED. 261 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/30/2019. (klh2)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 JUDGMENT in favor of John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Major Lyerla, Margaret Thompson, Michael Lemke, Rick Harrington, Salvador A. Godinez, Sergeant Birk, Tracey Engelson against Jose Luera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/17/2018. (amv)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court GRANTS Defendant Wexford's motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 97 ) and DISMISSES without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Wexford, in cluding Counts II, III, and IV. The Court further DIRECTS the Clerk to substitute the John Doe (Menard and Stateville 1-99) for John Doe #1 (Stateville Counselor), John Doe #2 (unknown Menard Correctional Officers), and John Doe #3 (unknown Statevil le Correctional Officers). In light of the dismissal of the claims against Wexford, the Court FINDS AS MOOT Wexford's motion for summary judgment on the basis of failure to exhaust administrative remedies (Doc. 111 ). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 1/3/2017. (rah)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on March 30, 2015. Mailed notice (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/31/2015.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luera v. Godinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Luera
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Bennett
Represented By: Thomas Jefferson Ramsdell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Salvador A. Godinez
Represented By: Erin Rachel Gard
Represented By: Lyle Kevin Henretty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tracey Engelson
Represented By: Erin Rachel Gard
Represented By: Lyle Kevin Henretty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Margaret Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Major Lyerla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sergeant Birk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?