Willaimson v. S.A. Gear Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steve Williamson
Defendant: S.A. Gear Company, Inc., AutoZone, Inc., AutoZone Stores, Inc. and AutoZone Parts, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00365
Filed: April 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Rosenstengel
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) (Doc. 207 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/26/2018. (mah)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class (Doc. 122 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/7/2018. (bps)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion Exclude the Opinions of Batzer and Hallman, and Suggestions in Support (Doc. 173 ), Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Steven Tucker, and Suggestions in Support, (Doc. 181 ), and Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Larry Arthur and Suggestions in Support (Doc. 182 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/29/2018. (mah)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER GRANTING 130 MOTION to Seal for Permission to File Under Seal or Alternatively for Protective Order filed by AutoZone Stores, Inc., AutoZone, Inc., AutoZone Parts, Inc.; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 186 MOTION to Seal Document; and FINDING AS MOOT 187 MOTION Expedite Consideration of Motion to Seal or For Other Relief filed by Steve Williamson, Rhonda Christine LeMaster. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/8/2017. (nms)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by AutoZone Stores, Inc., AutoZone, Inc., S.A. Gear Company, Inc., AutoZone Parts, Inc. (Doc. 44 ). Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' implied warranty claims against Defendant SA Gear (Counts I, III, and IV), Plaintiffs' fraudulent concealment claim against all Defendants (Count VII), Plaintiffs' RICO claim against al l Defendants (Count VIII) and Plaintiffs' negligence claims against all Defendants (Counts XII and XIII) is granted without prejudice. The Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss the remainder of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/23/2017. (mah)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, and FINDING MOOT IN PART 84 MOTION to Compel as to AutoZone Defendants filed by Steve Williamson, Rhonda Christine LeMaster and 82 MOTION to Compel as to Defendant S.A. Gear filed by Steve Williamson and Rhonda Christine LeMaster. See Order for specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/25/2016. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willaimson v. S.A. Gear Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Williamson
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.A. Gear Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Parts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?