Willaimson v. S.A. Gear Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Steve Williamson |
Defendant: |
S.A. Gear Company, Inc., AutoZone, Inc., AutoZone Stores, Inc. and AutoZone Parts, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00365 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Madison |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Rosenstengel |
Presiding Judge: |
Donald G. Wilkerson |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 26, 2018 |
Filing
214
ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) (Doc. 207 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/26/2018. (mah)
|
June 7, 2018 |
Filing
201
ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class (Doc. 122 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/7/2018. (bps)
|
March 29, 2018 |
Filing
199
ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion Exclude the Opinions of Batzer and Hallman, and Suggestions in Support (Doc. 173 ), Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Steven Tucker, and Suggestions in Support, (Doc. 181 ), and Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Larry Arthur and Suggestions in Support (Doc. 182 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/29/2018. (mah)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing
188
ORDER GRANTING 130 MOTION to Seal for Permission to File Under Seal or Alternatively for Protective Order filed by AutoZone Stores, Inc., AutoZone, Inc., AutoZone Parts, Inc.; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 186 MOTION to Seal Document; and FINDING AS MOOT 187 MOTION Expedite Consideration of Motion to Seal or For Other Relief filed by Steve Williamson, Rhonda Christine LeMaster. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/8/2017. (nms)
|
January 23, 2017 |
Filing
117
ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by AutoZone Stores, Inc., AutoZone, Inc., S.A. Gear Company, Inc., AutoZone Parts, Inc. (Doc. 44 ). Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' implied warranty claims against Defendant SA Gear (Counts I, III, and IV), Plaintiffs' fraudulent concealment claim against all Defendants (Count VII), Plaintiffs' RICO claim against al l Defendants (Count VIII) and Plaintiffs' negligence claims against all Defendants (Counts XII and XIII) is granted without prejudice. The Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss the remainder of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/23/2017. (mah)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
100
ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, and FINDING MOOT IN PART 84 MOTION to Compel as to AutoZone Defendants filed by Steve Williamson, Rhonda Christine LeMaster and 82 MOTION to Compel as to Defendant S.A. Gear filed by Steve Williamson and Rhonda Christine LeMaster. See Order for specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/25/2016. (nms)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?