Jellis v. Harrington et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Jellis
Defendant: R Harrington, Lt. Tourville, R Davis, C/O Hale, C/O Lindenberg, Lt Veath, Jason Hart, Amy Lang and Dr Shearing
Case Number: 3:2015cv00630
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Rosenstengel
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 264 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 266 Motion in Limine. The parties shall carefully review the attached Order and shall be prepared to present argument, as directed therein, at the final pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 10/27/2019. (kll)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER denying 255 Motion to Strike. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, Defendants' motion to strike is DENIED. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to supplement his expert witness disclosure, however, on or before October 16, 2019. Defendants are granted leave to file a motion in limine out of time related to the expert testimony of Dr. Coe, provided that the motion is filed by October 22, 2019. Plaintiff's response, if any, shall be filed by October 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 10/11/2019. (kll)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 137 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Shearing and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 140 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by the IDOC Defendants. Defendant Shearing's 155 Motion t o Strike is GRANTED and Plaintiff's 154 Supplemental Motion is STRICKEN. The IDOC Defendants' 157 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Plaintiff's 158 Motion for Clarification is DENIED as Moot. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/26/2017. (mlp)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER DENYING 143 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; DENYING 144 Motion to Compel; DENYING 145 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/30/17. (sgp)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER DENYING 101 Motion to Compel; MOOTING 102 Motion to Compel; MOOTING 105 Motion to Compel; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 106 Motion ; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 108 Motion to Compel; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 109 Motion to Compel; D ENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 112 Motion to Compel; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 113 Motion ; DENYING 114 Motion to Compel; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 115 Motion for Hearing; STRIKING 116 Reply; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 118 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; DENYING IN PART 129 Motion. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/30/17. (sgp)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER, DENYING 95 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jerry Jellis, GRANTING IN PART 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Jerry Jellis, GRANTING IN PART 98 MOTION to Amend/Correct 43 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Robert Shearing. Discovery deadline RESET to 1/30/2017, Dispositive Motions deadline RESET to 2/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/11/16. (sgp)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ADOPTING 89 Report and Recommendation and DENYING 57 Motion for Summary Judgment for Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust His Administrative Remedies filed by Defendant Robert Shearing. Defendant Shearing's objection to the Report and Recommendation 92 is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/28/2016. (mlp)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER STRIKING 65 , DENYING 67 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jerry Jellis, DENYING 68 MOTION to Compel filed by Jerry Jellis, DENYING 66 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jerry Jellis, GRANTING 76 MOTION to Continue filed by Dr Shearing. Pavey Evidentiary Hearing RESET for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/20/16. (sgp)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions re Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies due by 12/21/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 2/29/2016. Discovery due by 9/30/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 10/28/2016. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/7/2017 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2017 at 10:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2017 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/19/15. (sgp)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/19/15. (sgp)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/7/2015. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jellis v. Harrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Jellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Tourville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Lindenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Veath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Shearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?