Begin v. Air & Liquid System Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ginny Begin and William D. Begin
Defendant: CSR, Ltd, Air & Liquid System Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC, Viking Pumps, Inc, Flowserve Corporation, Pneumo Abex Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, Riley Power Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Certain-Teed Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Weil-Mclain Company, Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc, Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Whitney Automotive Group, Inc., Trane U.S. Inc., J R Clarkson Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Buffalo Pumps, Greene Tweed & Co., Inc, Dana Companies, LLC, CBS Corporation, Taco, Inc., Young Group, LTD, J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., Zurn Industries, LLC, Amphenol Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Dow Chemical Company, Aurora Pump Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Imo Industries Inc., General Electric Company, Arvinmeritor, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Dap, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Kelly Moore Paint Company, Lear-Siegler, Inc, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc, Gardner Denver, Inc., Consolidated Sugar and Refining, Siemens Industry, Inc., Illinois Tool Works Inc, Toledo Edison Company, Conwed Corporation, Continental Teves Inc., ITT Corporation, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, FMC Corporation, Bae Systems, Inc and John Crane Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00830
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 Filing 380 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/33/2017. (mah)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Dismiss Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC with prejudice (Doc. #378 ). Defendant Warren Pumps LLC is DISMISSED in all capacities. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/22/2016. (mah).
December 22, 2016 Filing 378 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC with prejudice by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/26/2017 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On September 30, 2016, having been advised by Plaintiffs and Defendant Warren Pumps LLC that this matter had settled, the Court granted the parties 60 days to consummate settlement before entering judgment (Doc. #374 ). To date, no response has been filed. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to show cause on or before December 14, 2016, as to why this matter should not be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/7/2016. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and Defendant Crane Co. (Doc. #375 ). Defendant Crane Co. is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/14/2016. (mah).
October 14, 2016 Filing 375 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and by Crane Co.. Responses due by 11/17/2016 (Wilson, Benjamin)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 60 DAY ORDER as to Plaintiffs and Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/30/2016. (mah).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER: The Court finds neither good cause for seeking an extension on the day Plaintiffs' response was due nor good cause for the extension as outlined in the motion. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #370 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/23/2016.(mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 23, 2016 Filing 372 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #370 Motion for Extension of Time filed by William D. Begin, Ginny Begin. See attached document for specifics (tkm)
September 22, 2016 Filing 371 RESPONSE to Motion re #367 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Defendant Crane Co. filed by Crane Co.(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Cochrane, Inc, aka Jenkins Valves, Inc, aka Pacific Pump, Inc). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D Part 1, #5 Exhibit D Part 2)(Wilson, Benjamin)
September 22, 2016 Filing 370 MOTION for Extension of Time File Response/ReplyIn Which to Respond to ? re #366 Defendant Crane Co's Motion for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 9/23/2016 (tkm).
August 22, 2016 Filing 369 NOTICE of Settlement by Warren Pumps LLC (Grabowski, James)
August 19, 2016 Filing 368 MEMORANDUM in Support re #367 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Defendant Crane Co. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hulla, Timothy)
August 19, 2016 Filing 367 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Defendant Crane Co. by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/22/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
August 19, 2016 Filing 366 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Crane Co.(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Cochrane, Inc, aka Jenkins Valves, Inc, aka Pacific Pump, Inc). Responses due by 9/22/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Wilson, Benjamin)
August 10, 2016 Filing 365 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Settlement Conference held on 8/10/2016. Attorney Hulla for Plaintiffs and attorney Schilling for Warren Pumps. Case did not settle.(Court Reporter n/a.) (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 9, 2016 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew M Schilling on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Schilling, Drew)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER GRANTING #362 Motion for to be excused from attending settlement conference in person. William Begin, Ginny Begin, and a representative from Warren Pumps, LLC are excused from appearing at the 8/10/16 settlement conference. However, they must be available by telephone at the time of and during the conference. The Court expects the attorneys to appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/2/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 1, 2016 Filing 362 MOTION for Joinder To Attend Telephonically by Warren Pumps LLC. (Grabowski, James)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER GRANTING #360 Motion: Crane Co. is excused from attending 8/10/16 settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 7/21/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 19, 2016 Filing 360 MOTION To Be Excused From Settlement Conference or, Alternatively, To Attend Telephonically by Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER DENYING Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #356 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/16/2016. (mah)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER GRANTING Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Doc. #352 ), Joint MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Doc. #354 ), and Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Air & Liquid System Corporation (Doc. #355 ). These Defendants are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice in all capacities. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/7/2016. (mah).
June 6, 2016 Filing 357 RESPONSE in Opposition re #356 MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
June 1, 2016 Filing 356 MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/5/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
June 1, 2016 Filing 355 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Air & Liquid System Corporation. Responses due by 7/5/2016 (Schag, Michael)
May 31, 2016 Filing 354 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2016 (Tayyab, Julia)
May 19, 2016 Filing 353 Transcript of IN-PERSON DISCOVERY DISPUTE CONFERENCE held on 5/6/2016, before Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Court Reporter Molly Clayton, Telephone number 618.482.9226. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2016. (mnc)
May 17, 2016 Filing 352 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Union Carbide Corporation. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Zimmerman, Justin)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER re 350 Discovery Dispute Conference and STRIKING #337 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Designations and Objections filed by William D. Begin, Ginny Begin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/10/16. (sgp)
May 6, 2016 Filing 350 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 5/6/2016. Timothy P. Hulla appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorneys James R. Grabowski, Justin Zimmerman, Benjamin Wilson and Jessica Schmitt appeared on behalf of the respective defendants. Court heard argument on the disputed matters. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Electronic.) (jmp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 5, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Tayyab, Julia)
May 5, 2016 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Wilks, Undray)
May 4, 2016 Filing 347 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #345 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc. See attached document for specifics. (anm)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER, GRANTING #345 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc. Attorney Undray Wilks for Goulds Pumps, Inc. added. Attorneys Bauman, Graber, Schumacher, Brodzik, Rice and Sondag terminated as to Goulds Pump, Inc. Clerk to make changes to the docket as necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/4/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 2, 2016 Filing 345 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Tayyab, Julia)
April 29, 2016 Filing 344 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference held on 4/29/2016. Attorney Hulla for Plaintiff and attorneys Wilson, Hill and Anderson for respective Defendants. In perso Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 5/6/2016 at 11:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Parties should be prepared to discuss Plaintiff's expert disclosures #337 . Parties are directed to meet and confer as to Plaintiff's interrogatories and request to produce served on October 7, 2015 and to be prepared to discuss any remaining dispute as to those documents. (Court Reporter Liberty.) (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 4/29/2016 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Defendant Crane Co has indicated that there is a dispute as to Plaintiff's expert disclosures #337 . Parties to call the Court's conference line 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 7912189, and enter security code 9382. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 4/27/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 15, 2016 Filing 342 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #341 Stipulation filed by J R Clarkson Company. See attached document for specifics (slh)
April 14, 2016 Filing 341 STRICKEN AT DOCUMENT 342 - STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by J R Clarkson Company. (Wilks, Undray) Modified on 4/15/2016 (slh).
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER GRANTING Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arvinmeritor, Inc.(Doc. #339 ) and GRANTING Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aurora Pump Company (Doc. #338 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/6/2016. (mah)
March 24, 2016 Filing 339 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Arvinmeritor, Inc.. Responses due by 4/28/2016 (Johnson, Dayna)
March 21, 2016 Filing 338 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Aurora Pump Company. Responses due by 4/25/2016 (Bultman, Bradley)
March 18, 2016 Filing 337 STRICKEN AT DOC. 351 - RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections by All Plaintiffs. (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 5/11/2016 (slh).
January 29, 2016 Filing 336 ANSWER to #303 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Co..(Geraci, Carl)
January 28, 2016 Filing 335 ANSWER to #303 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to First Amended Complaint by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Brodzik, James)
January 28, 2016 Filing 334 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #305 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by John Crane Inc. The defendant is no longer a party in this case. Document stricken per efiler's request.(jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER GRANTING #326 #327 #328 #329 #330 #331 MOTIONS to Withdraw. Attorney Michael D. Schag terminated as to Certain-Teed Corporation, Dana Companies LLC, Riley Power Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., Taco, Inc. and Viking Pumps, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/28/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 27, 2016 Filing 332 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/27/2016. Attorney Hulla for Plaintiff and attorneys Schag, Bultman, Schmidt, Broadnick, and Zimmerman for Defendants. Also present were attorney Fergus (for John Crane) and attorney Rich (for BAE Systems, Inc.). No attorney appeared on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company or Warren Pumps, LLC. Parties indicate that no discovery is required as to cross claims. Plaintiff indicates that there is a discovery dispute as to Crane Co. Court instructs parties to meet and confer per Rule 37 and to contact the Court if the dispute remains. (Court Reporter n/a.) (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 26, 2016 Filing 331 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Entry of Appearance on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. by Viking Pumps, Inc. (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 330 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Entry of Appearance on behalf of Taco, Inc. by Taco, Inc.. (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 329 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Entry of Appearnce on Behalf of Riley Power Inc. by Riley Power Inc.. (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 328 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Entry of Appearance on Behalf of IMO Industries Inc. by Imo Industries Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Turbine, Inc). (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 327 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw Entry of Appearance on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC by Dana Companies, LLC. (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 326 MOTION to Withdraw #319 Notice of Appearance Motion to Withdraw Entry of Appearance on behalf of CertainTeed Corporation by Certain-Teed Corporation. (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Viking Pumps, Inc (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 322 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Riley Power Inc. (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Imo Industries Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Turbine, Inc) (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Certain-Teed Corporation (Schag, Michael)
January 26, 2016 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of Air & Liquid System Corporation (Schag, Michael)
January 25, 2016 Filing 317 ANSWER to #303 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claims and Answer to Cross Claims by Aurora Pump Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
January 20, 2016 Filing 316 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re 309 Notice of Hearing,, Notice to Counsel of Status Conference (Hulla, Timothy)
January 20, 2016 Filing 315 ANSWER to #303 Amended Complaint and Affirmatived Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Air & Liquid System Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
January 20, 2016 Filing 314 ANSWER to #303 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Warren Pumps LLC.(Hill, Keith)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , General and Specific, filed by General Electric Company [Doc. 11], Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company [Doc. 19], and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CBS Corporation [Doc. 62]. MOOTING First Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by General Electric Company [Doc. 310]. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/19/2016. (mah)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER MOOTING Motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V filed by Aurora Pump Company #71 and Motion to Dismiss Spoliation Claims filed by Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co. #25 per the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/19/2016. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 19, 2016 Filing 311 ANSWER to #303 Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin)
January 19, 2016 Filing 310 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by General Electric Company. Responses due by 2/22/2016 (Meyer, Julie)
January 19, 2016 Filing 309 NOTICE of Hearing: Due to the Court's trial schedule, the Status Conference originally set for 1/20/16 is RESET to 1/27/2016 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. The status conference will be by TELEPHONE. Plaintiff shall initiate the phone conference. If a call-in conference number is used, Plaintiff shall file a notice in this matter setting forth the call-in information by 1/26/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #298 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Only attorneys Voss and Maschhoff have entered an appearance in this matter on behalf of BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. To the extent that other attorneys seek to represent that Defendant in this Court, they must enter an appearance. At no time have Attorneys Hatch or Ward entered an appearance in this matter. If an attorney seeks to withdraw, that attorney must file the appropriate motion. The parties should also review CM/ECF guidelines for redaction of signatures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/19/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER MOOTING #18 #21 #30 #31 #38 #98 #199 #200 #207 #260 #261 #262 #263 #264 #265 #266 #267 #268 #269 #270 #271 #272 #273 #274 #275 #276 #277 #278 #279 #280 #281 #282 #283 #284 #285 #286 #287 #288 #289 #290 #291 #292 #293 #294 #295 #296 per the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/19/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 19, 2016 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Schmit on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia-Pacific LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane U.S. Inc. (Schmit, Jessica)
January 18, 2016 Filing 305 STRICKEN- ANSWER to #303 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Deman by John Crane Inc..(Fergus, Sean) Modified on 1/28/2016 (jlrr).
January 13, 2016 Filing 304 RESPONSE to 302 Order to Show Cause, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hulla, Timothy)
January 12, 2016 Filing 303 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin.(Hulla, Timothy)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing and by 1/14/2016, why this Court should not recommend that sanctions be issued, up to and including dismissal with prejudice, for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with two (2) Orders of this Court which directed the filing of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/12/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER re 297 Order on Motion for Leave to File: Plaintiffs were directed to file their amended complaint by January 7, 2016. Plaintiffs have failed to do so by the deadline. Plaintiffs are sua sponte granted until close of business today, 1/11/2016, to file their amended pleading. Failure to do so by the new deadline may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/11/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 7, 2016 Filing 300 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #298 Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. A document requiring multiple signatures should have "with consent" following the name of the non-filing signatory. Please refer to the User's Manual section 2.0 page 2.1. No further action required by the filer. (slh) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 6, 2016 Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Voss on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC (Voss, Andrew)
January 6, 2016 Filing 298 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. (Voss, Andrew)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER GRANTING #250 Motion for Leave to File. No objection having been filed, Plaintiffs to file First Amended Complaint by January 7, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/5/16. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 4, 2016 Filing 296 MOTION to Withdraw #274 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant John Crane Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 295 MOTION to Withdraw #294 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 294 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 293 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant FMC Corporation by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 292 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Draco Mechanical Supply by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 291 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Dow Chemical Company by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 290 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dana Companies, LLC by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 289 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant CSR, Ltd by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 288 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Conwed Corporation by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 287 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Certain Teed Corporation by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 286 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Caterpillar Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 285 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Borg Warner Morse Tec LLC by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 284 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Arvinmeritor Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 283 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Amphenol Corporation by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 282 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant General Gasket by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 281 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Georgia-Pacific, LLC by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 280 MOTION to Withdraw #272 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant J.R. Clarkson Company by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 279 MOTION to Withdraw #277 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Grinnell LLC by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 278 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant BAE Systems Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 277 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Grinnell LLC by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 276 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Honeywell International by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 275 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 274 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant John Crane Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 273 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 272 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant J.R. Clarkson Company by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 271 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 270 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lamons Gasket Company by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 269 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lear-Siegler, Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 268 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 267 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Riley Power Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 266 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rockwell Automation Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 265 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Siemens Industry Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 264 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sprinkmann Sons Corporation by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 263 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Taco Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 262 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Trane US, Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 261 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Viking Pumps, Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Filing 260 MOTION to Dismiss Whitney Automotive Group Inc. by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. Responses due by 1/25/2016 (Hulla, Timothy)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and filed by Weil-Mclain Company [Doc. 258], Joint Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and filed by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc. [Doc. 257], Joint Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and filed by Illinois Tool Works Inc. [Doc. 256], Joint Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and filed by Flowserve Corporation [Doc. 255], Joint Motion to Dismiss with Plaintiff filed by Zurn Industries, LLC [Doc. 253], Joint Motion to Dismiss with Plaintiff filed by Gardner Denver, Inc. [Doc. 252], Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Dap, Inc. [Doc. 251], Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. without prejudice filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. [Doc. 238]. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/21/15. (mah).
December 17, 2015 Filing 258 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and by Weil-Mclain Company. Responses due by 1/22/2016 (Bultman, Bradley)
December 17, 2015 Filing 257 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc. Responses due by 1/22/2016 (Bultman, Bradley)
December 17, 2015 Filing 256 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and by Illinois Tool Works Inc(individually and as successor-in-interest to Devcon Corp). Responses due by 1/22/2016 (Bultman, Bradley)
December 17, 2015 Filing 255 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and by Flowserve Corporation(sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BW/IP International, Inc). Responses due by 1/22/2016 (Bultman, Bradley)
December 15, 2015 Filing 254 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #250 Motion for Leave to File filed by William D. Begin, Ginny Begin. See attached document for specifics (msd)
December 15, 2015 Filing 253 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Plaintiff by Zurn Industries, LLC. Responses due by 1/19/2016 (Powell, Daniel)
December 15, 2015 Filing 252 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Plaintiff by Gardner Denver, Inc.. Responses due by 1/19/2016 (Powell, Daniel)
December 15, 2015 Filing 251 MOTION to Dismiss Joint with Plaintiff by Dap, Inc.. Responses due by 1/19/2016 (Powell, Daniel)
December 14, 2015 Filing 250 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hulla, Timothy)
December 7, 2015 Filing 249 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. for Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. (Cross, William)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER re 247 Discovery Dispute Conference: During the deposition of Plaintiff in Boston, MA, Plaintiff objected to the participation of local counsel for Crane Co. (and/or other Defendants represented by the firm HeplerBroom in this Court) pursuant to Local Rule 83.1. The Court overrules the objection and directs the deposition to continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/4/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 4, 2015 Filing 247 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference held on 12/4/2015. Attorney Hulla and Wilson for their respective clients (in addition to a number of other attorneys). Order to issue. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 4, 2015 Filing 246 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference set for 12/4/2015 at 9:10 AM before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson regarding Plaintiff's deposition, currently underway, in Boston, MA. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting #244 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert F Martin on behalf of Defendant, CBS Corporation. (slh) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 3, 2015 Filing 244 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert F. Martin $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2793096 by on behalf of CBS Corporation(fka Viacom, Inc. merger to CBS Corporation, fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation). (Martin, Robert)
December 3, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Cross on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Cross, William)
December 1, 2015 Filing 242 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arvinmeritor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Meritor, Inc. for Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc., Arvinmeritor, Inc.. (Johnson, Dayna)
December 1, 2015 Filing 241 ANSWER to Complaint (Cross-Claims), CROSSCLAIM and Jury Demand against Air & Liquid System Corporation, Amphenol Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, Bae Systems, Inc, Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC, CBS Corporation, CSR, Ltd, Caterpillar, Inc., Certain-Teed Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Continental Teves Inc., Conwed Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Dap, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, General Gasket Corporation, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene Tweed & Co., Inc, Grinnell LLC, Honeywell International Inc., ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, J R Clarkson Company, J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., John Crane Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Lamons Gasket Company, Lear-Siegler, Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Riley Power Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Siemens Industry, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Taco, Inc., Toledo Edison Company, Trane U.S. Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Viking Pumps, Inc, Warren Pumps LLC, Weil-Mclain Company, Whitney Automotive Group, Inc., Young Group, LTD, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc, Zurn Industries, LLC by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
December 1, 2015 Filing 240 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Johnson, Dayna)
December 1, 2015 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayna L. Johnson on behalf of Arvinmeritor, Inc. (Johnson, Dayna)
November 30, 2015 Filing 238 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. without prejudice by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. Responses due by 1/4/2016 (Hudgens, Meredith)
November 23, 2015 Filing 237 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #235 Notice to Take Foreign Deposition filed by William D. Begin, Ginny Begin, #236 Notice to Take Foreign Deposition filed by William D. Begin, Ginny Begin. See attached document for specifics. (slh)
November 20, 2015 Filing 236 NOTICE to Take Foreign Deposition from Ginny Begin., filed by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin.(Hulla, Timothy)
November 20, 2015 Filing 235 NOTICE to Take Foreign Deposition from William Begin., filed by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin.(Hulla, Timothy)
November 19, 2015 Filing 234 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #233 Notice (Other), filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion. See attached document for specifics (slh)
November 18, 2015 Filing 233 STRICKEN - NOTICE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion(sued individually and as successor-in-interest of C H Wheeler) Certificate of Service of Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Answers to Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Pozan, Kyle)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER GRANTING #229 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Bradley R. Bultman terminated as to Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/29/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 28, 2015 Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Hart on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion (Hart, Steven)
October 28, 2015 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Pozan on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion (Pozan, Kyle)
October 28, 2015 Filing 229 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Withdraw Appearances by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion. (Hart, Steven)
October 28, 2015 Filing 228 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #225 Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion. See attached document for specifics. (slh)
October 27, 2015 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Pozan on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion (Pozan, Kyle)
October 27, 2015 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Hart on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion (Hart, Steven)
October 27, 2015 Filing 225 STRICKEN - MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Withdraw Appearances by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion. (Hart, Steven)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V filed by Imo Industries Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Air & Liquid System Corporation, Riley Power Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Viking Pumps, Inc, Certain-Teed Corporation, and Taco, Inc. [Doc. 201]. The Court MOOTS the pending motions to dismiss filed by these Defendants. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/26/15. (mah)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER DISMISSING Defendants Continental Teves, Inc., Young Group, LTD, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., and The Toledo Edison Company. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/21/15. (mah)
October 8, 2015 Filing 222 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #212 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin, #217 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin, #211 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin, #214 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin, #209 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin, #213 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin, #216 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin, #210 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin, #218 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin, #215 Notice (Other) filed by William D. Begin. See attached document for specifics (slh)
October 7, 2015 Filing 221 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs William D. Begin and Ginny Begin and by Continental Teves Inc.. Responses due by 11/9/2015 (Prior, John)
October 7, 2015 Filing 220 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs William D. Begin and Ginny Begin and by Young Group, LTD, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. Responses due by 11/9/2015 (Prior, John)
October 7, 2015 Filing 219 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Bae Systems, Inc.(Rich, Trisha)
October 7, 2015 Filing 218 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 217 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 216 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 215 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 214 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 213 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 212 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 211 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 210 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 209 STRICKEN - NOTICE by William D. Begin Certificate of Service (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 10/8/2015 (slh).
October 7, 2015 Filing 208 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Siemens Industry, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
October 7, 2015 Filing 207 MOTION to Strike and Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint by Siemens Industry, Inc.. (Foster, Margaret)
October 1, 2015 Filing 206 NOTICE by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin Amended Notice to the Court (Hulla, Timothy)
October 1, 2015 Filing 205 NOTICE by Ginny Begin, William D. Begin Notice to Court (Hulla, Timothy)
September 30, 2015 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by John Backes Prior on behalf of Continental Teves Inc. (Prior, John)
September 30, 2015 Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by John Backes Prior on behalf of Young Group, LTD, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc (Prior, John)
September 30, 2015 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward Keeler, III on behalf of Sprinkmann Sons Corporation (Keeler, William)
September 28, 2015 Filing 201 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V by Air & Liquid System Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC, Imo Industries Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Turbine, Inc), Riley Power Inc., Taco, Inc., Viking Pumps, Inc, Warren Pumps LLC. Responses due by 11/2/2015 (Grabowski, James)
September 28, 2015 Filing 200 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Responses due by 11/2/2015 (Warchol, Jerome)
September 28, 2015 Filing 199 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc. Responses due by 11/2/2015 (Warchol, Jerome)
September 28, 2015 Filing 198 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. by Kelly Moore Paint Company. Responses due by 11/2/2015 (Dauphin, Michael)
September 25, 2015 Filing 197 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Gasket Corporation. (Bronsky, A.)
September 25, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of General Gasket Corporation (Bronsky, A.)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER MOOTING #127 Motion per Scheduling Order #192 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/21/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 18, 2015 Filing 194 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ITT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal as to Defendant ITT Corporation.)(Tayyab, Julia)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 8/10/2016 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson.(jmp)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/5/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2016. Status Conference set for 1/20/2016 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Settlement Conference set for 8/10/2016 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/17/15. (sgp)
September 17, 2015 Filing 191 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Scheduling Conference held on 9/16/2015. Attorneys Bultman, Chenevert, Dauphin, Fergus, Hudgens, Hulla, Lee, Maschhoff, Meyer, Powell, Rice, Rich, Titzer, Warchol, Wilks, Wilson, and Zimmerman for their respective clients. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter n/a.) (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 15, 2015 Filing 190 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES Siemens Industry, Inc., Is a wholly owned subsidiary of Siemens Corporation by Siemens Industry, Inc..(Foster, Margaret)
September 15, 2015 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret M. Foster on behalf of Siemens Industry, Inc. (Foster, Margaret)
September 14, 2015 Filing 188 NOTICE by William D. Begin Notice of Call-In Information for Pretrial Scheduling and Discovery Conference (Hulla, Timothy)
September 4, 2015 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy D. Hoyt on behalf of Bae Systems, Inc (Hoyt, Troy)
September 4, 2015 Filing 186 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bae Systems, Inc. (Rich, Trisha)
September 4, 2015 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha M. Rich on behalf of Bae Systems, Inc (Rich, Trisha)
September 2, 2015 Filing 184 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lamons Gasket Company.(Lee, Paul)
September 2, 2015 Filing 183 ANSWER to Complaint , First CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lamons Gasket Company.(Lee, Paul)
September 2, 2015 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Lee on behalf of Lamons Gasket Company (Lee, Paul)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING #180 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Madeline Victoria Tzall terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/1/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 28, 2015 Filing 180 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dap, Inc.. (Tzall, Madeline)
August 27, 2015 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Powell on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Powell, Daniel)
August 27, 2015 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Powell on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Powell, Daniel)
August 27, 2015 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Powell on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Powell, Daniel)
August 25, 2015 Filing 176 NOTICE TO COUNSEL:Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 9/16/2015 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall be responsbile for initiating the call. Because of the number of participants, the Plaintiff shall file a NOTICE with the Court indicating the call in number for the conference call. (jmp)
August 25, 2015 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of J R Clarkson Company (Tayyab, Julia)
August 25, 2015 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of ITT Corporation (Tayyab, Julia)
August 25, 2015 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Tayyab, Julia)
August 25, 2015 Filing 172 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J R Clarkson Company identifying Corporate Parent Pentair Valves & Controls, LLC, Other Affiliate Pentair PLC for J R Clarkson Company. (Wilks, Undray)
August 25, 2015 Filing 171 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT Corporation. (Wilks, Undray)
August 25, 2015 Filing 170 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Simplex Time Recorder Company, Other Affiliate Tyco International Ltd. for Grinnell LLC. (Wilks, Undray)
August 25, 2015 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of J R Clarkson Company (Wilks, Undray)
August 25, 2015 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of ITT Corporation (Wilks, Undray)
August 25, 2015 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Undray Wilks on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Wilks, Undray)
August 21, 2015 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Viking Pumps, Inc (Grabowski, James)
August 21, 2015 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Grabowski, James)
August 21, 2015 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Imo Industries Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Turbine, Inc) (Grabowski, James)
August 21, 2015 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Grabowski, James)
August 21, 2015 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Riley Power Inc. (Grabowski, James)
August 21, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Grabowski, James)
August 21, 2015 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Certain-Teed Corporation (Grabowski, James)
August 21, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Grabowski on behalf of Air & Liquid System Corporation (Grabowski, James)
August 20, 2015 Filing 158 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 157 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal,,,, and Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint by Zurn Industries, LLC. (Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 156 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Victoria Tzall on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 154 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 153 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal,,,, and Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 152 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Victoria Tzall on behalf of Gardner Denver, Inc. (Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 150 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dap, Inc.. (Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 149 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal,,,, and Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint by Dap, Inc.. (Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 148 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Answers to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Dap, Inc..(Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Victoria Tzall on behalf of Dap, Inc. (Tzall, Madeline)
August 20, 2015 Filing 146 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
August 20, 2015 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taco, Inc.. (Hill, Keith)
August 20, 2015 Filing 144 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain-Teed Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France for Certain-Teed Corporation. (Hill, Keith)
August 20, 2015 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dana Companies, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Dana Holding Corporation for Dana Companies, LLC. (Hill, Keith)
August 20, 2015 Filing 142 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imo Industries Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Turbine, Inc) identifying Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent Imo Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Imo Industries Inc. (Hill, Keith)
August 20, 2015 Filing 141 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps LLC identifying Other Affiliate Colfax Pump Group for Warren Pumps LLC. (Hill, Keith)
August 20, 2015 Filing 140 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Babcock Power Inc. a Delaware Corporation for Riley Power Inc. (Hill, Keith)
August 20, 2015 Filing 139 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pumps, Inc identifying Corporate Parent IDEX Corporation for Viking Pumps, Inc, (Hill, Keith)
August 20, 2015 Filing 138 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid System Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid System Corporation (Hill, Keith)
August 19, 2015 Filing 137 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Titzer, Ross)
August 18, 2015 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of Kelly Moore Paint Company (Dauphin, Michael)
August 18, 2015 Filing 135 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #95 Notice (Other) filed by Kelly Moore Paint Company. Incorrect document type selected (PDF and event do not match). Filer selected Notice (other); however the document filed is a Notice of Appearance. (slh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 18, 2015 Filing 134 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Warren Pumps LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Orris on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation (Orris, Thomas)
August 18, 2015 Filing 132 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Against All Defendants, and Answer to Cross-Claims against Pneumo Abex Corporation by Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Titzer, Ross)
August 18, 2015 Filing 131 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Viking Pumps, Inc. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Imo Industries Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Turbine, Inc). Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 129 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Taco, Inc.. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Riley Power Inc.. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 127 MOTION FOR INSTITUTION OF DENIALS UNDER FEDERAL RULE 5(c)(1)(B) by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Titzer, Ross)
August 18, 2015 Filing 126 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Dana Companies, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 125 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Titzer, Ross)
August 18, 2015 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross S. Titzer on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation (Titzer, Ross)
August 18, 2015 Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Certain-Teed Corporation. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V of Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Air & Liquid System Corporation. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 121 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conwed Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Leucadia LLC for Conwed Corporation. (Brodzik, James)
August 18, 2015 Filing 120 ANSWER to Complaint by Conwed Corporation.(Brodzik, James)
August 18, 2015 Filing 119 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation for Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Brodzik, James)
August 18, 2015 Filing 118 ANSWER to Complaint by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Brodzik, James)
August 18, 2015 Filing 117 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Warren Pumps LLC.(Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 116 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Viking Pumps, Inc.(Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 115 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Imo Industries Inc.(individually and as successor-in-interest to Delaval Turbine, Inc).(Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 114 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Taco, Inc..(Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Riley Power Inc..(Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 112 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Dana Companies, LLC.(Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 111 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Certain-Teed Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 110 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by Air & Liquid System Corporation.(Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Viking Pumps, Inc (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Riley Power Inc. (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Imo Industries Inc. (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Dana Companies, LLC (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Certain-Teed Corporation (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Hill on behalf of Air & Liquid System Corporation (Hill, Keith)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING #96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kelly Moore Paint Company. Kelly Moore Paint Company answer due 9/3/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/18/15. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 17, 2015 Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
August 14, 2015 Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion(sued individually and as successor-in-interest of C H Wheeler). (Bultman, Bradley)
August 14, 2015 Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion(sued individually and as successor-in-interest of C H Wheeler). Responses due by 9/17/2015 (Bultman, Bradley)
August 14, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion(sued individually and as successor-in-interest of C H Wheeler) (Bultman, Bradley)
August 14, 2015 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kelly Moore Paint Company. (Dauphin, Michael)
August 14, 2015 Filing 95 STRICKEN - NOTICE by Kelly Moore Paint Company of Special and Limited Entry of Appearance (Dauphin, Michael)
August 13, 2015 Filing 94 CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indemnity and its Answer to all Cross-Claims and Counter-Claims of Any Other Defendant against All Defendants, filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc..(Hudgens, Meredith)
August 13, 2015 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver Holdings for Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Hudgens, Meredith)
August 13, 2015 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith S Hudgens on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Hudgens, Meredith)
August 13, 2015 Filing 91 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution or Indeminity and Answer to all Cross-Claims and Counterclaims of any other / against All Defendants by Honeywell International Inc..(Jones, Kirra)
August 13, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor A. Sondag on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Sondag, Trevor)
August 12, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Bauman on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Bauman, Mark)
August 12, 2015 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V by Flowserve Corporation. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 86 ANSWER to Complaint , Cross-Claims and Answer to All Cross-Claims by Flowserve Corporation.(Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Illinois Tool Works Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V by Illinois Tool Works Inc. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint , Cross-Claims, and Answer to All Cross-Claims by Illinois Tool Works Inc.(Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Illinois Tool Works Inc (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil-Mclain Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V by Weil-Mclain Company. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint , Cross-Claims and Answer to All Cross-Claims by Weil-Mclain Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Weil-Mclain Company (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint , Cross-Claims, and Answer to All Cross-Claims by Greene Tweed & Co., Inc.(Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Greene Tweed & Co., Inc (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company. (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and V by Aurora Pump Company. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint , Cross-Claims, and Answer to All Cross-Claims by Aurora Pump Company.(Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Bultman on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Bultman, Bradley)
August 12, 2015 Filing 68 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2016 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 11/28/2016 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/12/2015. (kek)
August 11, 2015 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2015 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dow Chemical Company. (Bash, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2015 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Dow Chemical Company (Bash, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Bash, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2015 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Zimmerman, Justin)
August 11, 2015 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CBS Corporation. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Dauphin, Michael)
August 11, 2015 Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Dow Chemical Company.(Zimmerman, Justin)
August 11, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE by CBS Corporation re #10 Joinder, #1 Notice of Removal,,,, Joinder in Crane Co. and General Electric Company's Notice of Removal and Notice of Removal Based on Assertion of Independent Federal Officer Grounds for Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dauphin, Michael)
August 11, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of Dow Chemical Company (Zimmerman, Justin)
August 11, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Zimmerman, Justin)
August 11, 2015 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin on behalf of CBS Corporation (Dauphin, Michael)
August 11, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole E. Rice on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Rice, Nicole)
August 11, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Marie Schumacher on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Schumacher, Haley)
August 11, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Marie Schumacher on behalf of Conwed Corporation (Schumacher, Haley)
August 10, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Shultz, Jr on behalf of Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc (Shultz, William)
August 10, 2015 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
August 10, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc (Warchol, Jerome)
August 10, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Graber on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Graber, Dennis)
August 10, 2015 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
August 10, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn N. Chenevert on behalf of FMC Corporation (Chenevert, Kaitlyn)
August 7, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #45 Notice of Appearance filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. Filer's signature does not match login and password. Document must be re-filed. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 7, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Shultz, Jr on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Shultz, William)
August 7, 2015 Filing 45 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome) Modified on 8/7/2015 (cds).
August 7, 2015 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Warchol, Jerome)
August 7, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome S. Warchol, Jr on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Warchol, Jerome)
August 7, 2015 Filing 42 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Crane Co..(Geraci, Carl)
August 7, 2015 Filing 41 Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Caterpillar, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
August 7, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #29 Affirmative Defenses filed by Crane Co., #28 Affirmative Defenses filed by Caterpillar, Inc.. See attached document for specifics (slh)
August 7, 2015 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for voluntary dismissal without prejudice by Toledo Edison Company. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Wilson, Benjamin)
August 7, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Spoliation Claims Counts IV and V by John Crane Inc.. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Fergus, Sean)
August 7, 2015 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer To Crossclaims and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid System Corporation, Amphenol Corporation, Arvinmeritor, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Bae Systems, Inc, Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC, CBS Corporation, CSR, Ltd, Caterpillar, Inc., Certain-Teed Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Continental Teves Inc., Conwed Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Dap, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, General Gasket Corporation, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene Tweed & Co., Inc, Grinnell LLC, Honeywell International Inc., ITT Corporation, Illinois Tool Works Inc, Imo Industries Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, J R Clarkson Company, J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Kelly Moore Paint Company, Lamons Gasket Company, Lear-Siegler, Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Riley Power Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Siemens Industry, Inc., Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, Taco, Inc., Toledo Edison Company, Trane U.S. Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Viking Pumps, Inc, Warren Pumps LLC, Weil-Mclain Company, Whitney Automotive Group, Inc., Young Group, LTD, Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc, Zurn Industries, LLC by John Crane Inc..(Fergus, Sean)
August 7, 2015 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane Inc.. (Fergus, Sean)
August 7, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Fergus on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Fergus, Sean)
August 7, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirra N. Jones on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Jones, Kirra)
August 7, 2015 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc.. (Hardee, Kathleen)
August 7, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Hardee on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Hardee, Kathleen)
August 6, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Georgia-Pacific LLC. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Amphenol Corporation. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Finnigan, Mindy)
August 6, 2015 Filing 29 STRICKEN - Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand by Crane Co.. (Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 28 STRICKEN - Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Mindy A. Finnigan on behalf of Amphenol Corporation (Finnigan, Mindy)
August 6, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Kanute on behalf of Amphenol Corporation (Kanute, Michael)
August 6, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Spoliation Claims by Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co.. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Brodzik on behalf of Conwed Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Brodzik, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. (Maschhoff, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed by Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. (Maschhoff, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) by Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Maschhoff, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Maschhoff on behalf of Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC (Maschhoff, James)
August 6, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ingersoll-Rand Company. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Business Corporation Annual Report)(Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Trane U.S. Inc.. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Business Corporation Annual Report)(Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia-Pacific LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane U.S. Inc. (Wilson, Benjamin)
August 6, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia-Pacific LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane U.S. Inc. (Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane U.S. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Trane U.S. Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
August 6, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , General and Specific, by General Electric Company. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Fournie, Raymond)
August 6, 2015 Filing 10 JOINDER by General Electric Company. Joinder in #1 Notice of Removal,,,, and Notice of Removal Based on Assertion of Independent Federal Officer Grounds for Jurisdiction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories)(Fournie, Raymond)
August 6, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita M. Kidd on behalf of General Electric Company (Kidd, Anita)
August 6, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie R. King on behalf of General Electric Company (King, Melanie)
August 6, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer on behalf of General Electric Company (Meyer, Julie)
August 6, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie on behalf of General Electric Company (Fournie, Raymond)
August 5, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Hulla on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hulla, Timothy)
July 31, 2015 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 15-830-SMY-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (slh)
July 30, 2015 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
July 30, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilson on behalf of Crane Co. (Wilson, Benjamin)
July 30, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial Circuit Madison County, case number 15-L-796 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2684216), filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Affidavit of Pantaleoni, #3 Exhibit 3: Affidavit of Sargent Part 1, #4 Exhibit 4: Affidavit of Sargent Part 2, #5 Exhibit 5: Affidavit of Sargent Part 3, #6 Exhibit 6: Affidavit of Sargent Part 4, #7 Exhibit 7: Affidavit of Sargent Part 5, #8 Exhibit 8: Affidavit of Forman Part 1, #9 Exhibit 9: Affidavit of Forman Part 2, #10 Exhibit 10: Affidavit of Forman Part 3, #11 Exhibit 11: Affidavit of Forman Part 4, #12 Exhibit 12: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #13 Civil Cover Sheet 13: Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Exhibit 14: State Court Docket Part 1, #15 Exhibit 15: State Court Docket Part 2, #16 Exhibit 16: State Court Docket Part 3, #17 Exhibit 17: State Court Docket Part 4, #18 Exhibit 18: State Court Docket Part 5, #19 Exhibit 19: State Court Docket Part 6, #20 Exhibit 20: State Court Docket Part 7)(Wilson, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Begin v. Air & Liquid System Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid System Corporation
Represented By: James R. Grabowski
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Represented By: William D. Shultz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Jessica Schmit
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Jessica Schmit
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: James R. Grabowski
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Represented By: Drew M Schilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pumps, Inc
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: James R. Grabowski
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Gasket Corporation
Represented By: A. J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: James R. Grabowski
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith S Hudgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: James R. Grabowski
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Hardee
Represented By: Kirra N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Represented By: Paul B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-Mclain Company
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc
Represented By: Jerome S. Warchol, Jr.
Represented By: William D. Shultz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC
Represented By: James D. Maschhoff
Represented By: Andrew M. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Jessica Schmit
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Automotive Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Schmit
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J R Clarkson Company
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Schmit
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps
Represented By: James R. Grabowski
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Co., Inc
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: James R. Grabowski
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: James R. Grabowski
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Group, LTD
Represented By: John Backes Prior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Represented By: Madeline V. Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amphenol Corporation
Represented By: Mindy A. Finnigan
Represented By: Michael J. Kanute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries Inc.
Represented By: Keith B. Hill
Represented By: James R. Grabowski
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Dayna L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Haley Marie Combs
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: William D. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dap, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Represented By: Madeline V. Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporartion
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Represented By: Steven A. Hart
Represented By: Kyle Pozan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Moore Paint Company
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear-Siegler, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc
Represented By: John Backes Prior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Represented By: Madeline V. Tzall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Sugar and Refining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Industry, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret M. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Tool Works Inc
Represented By: Bradley R. Bultman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toledo Edison Company
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conwed Corporation
Represented By: Nicole E. Rice
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Represented By: Haley Marie Combs
Represented By: Trevor A. Sondag
Represented By: Mark D. Bauman
Represented By: James M. Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Teves Inc.
Represented By: John Backes Prior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Undray Wilks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprinkmann Sons Corporation
Represented By: William Edward Keeler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Kaitlyn N. Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bae Systems, Inc
Represented By: Trisha M. Rich
Represented By: Troy D. Hoyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Sean P. Fergus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginny Begin
Represented By: Laci Marie Whitley
Represented By: Timothy P. Hulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Begin
Represented By: Laci Marie Whitley
Represented By: Timothy P. Hulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?