Thompson v. Illinois Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Thompson
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections, Richard Harrington, Kimberly Butler, Jacqueline Lashbrook, Sam Nwaobasi and Trost
Case Number: 3:2015cv00850
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 174 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part and Plaintiff Dennis Thompson's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 178 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Magistrate Judge Wilkerson is DIRECTED to recruit counsel to represent Thompson at trial. A status conference will be set by separate order for the purpose of scheduling this case for a final pretrial conference and jury trial. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/27/2018. (mlp)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DENYING 119 MOTION to Compel filed by Dennis Thompson, MOOTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 120 MOTION to Compel filed by Dennis Thompson, DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART 122 MOTION to Compel filed by Dennis Thompson, DENYING 130 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Dennis Thompson, DENYING 140 MOTION to Strike 137 Response to Motion filed by Dennis Thompson, DENYING 141 MOTION for Order to filed by Dennis Thompson, DENYING 142 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Dennis Thompson, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 143 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel filed by Dennis Thompson. Defendants to supplement discovery responses as set forth in Order by 8/29/2017. Dispositive Motions deadline RESET to 9/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/22/2017. (sgp)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER ADOPTING in part and REJECTING in part 105 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff Ronald Barrow's objection with regard to his claims against Defendant Kimberly Butler in Count 3 is SUSTAINED. Plaintiff's remaining objections are OVERRULED. Further, 108 Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate Count 7 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/2/2017. (mlp)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Dennis Thompson is MOOTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. Plaintiff may refile his motion once the issue of exhaustion has been resolved. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/23/2016. (mlp)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING 58 Motion to Compel; GRANTING 60 Motion for Leave to File; DENYING 64 Motion to Compel; DENYING 65 Motion to Stay; DENYING 66 Motion to Compel; DENYING 75 Motion ; GRANTING 76 Motion for Leave to File. Clerk of Court to file response to 50 and to refile 76 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/29/16. (sgp)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Donald G. Wilkerson, Michael Atchinson and C/O Smith added. Granting 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Amended Complaint filed by Dennis Thompson.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/11/2016. (jsy)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING the complaint without prejudice. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint, if he wishes to proceed with this case. (Amended Pleadings due by 10/14/2015). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/8/2015. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Illinois Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Nwaobasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?