Community Bank of Trenton et al v. Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Plaintiff: Southpointe Credit Union, First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Community Bank of Trenton and University of Illinois Employees Credit Union
Defendant: Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01125
Filed: October 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Clinton
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Michael J Reagan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2018 Filing 78 MANDATE of USCA as to #70 Notice of Appeal filed by First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Community Bank of Trenton, Southpointe Credit Union, University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. The judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED, with costs, in accordance with the decision ofthe US Appellate Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified Opinion, #2 Certified Judgment)(lmb)
November 21, 2017 Filing 77 Acknowledgment of receipt of Record on Appeal by USCA-7 re #70 Notice of Appeal (kls3)
November 20, 2017 Filing 76 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #70 Notice of Appeal. (dmw2)
November 17, 2017 Filing 75 Request from USCA to transmit Record on Appeal re #70 Notice of Appeal. (dmw2)
June 14, 2017 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION SHEET by Attorney/Pro Se Party (Driscoll, John)
June 14, 2017 Record on Appeal Prepared re #70 Notice of Appeal. (jsm2)
June 2, 2017 Filing 73 USCA-7 Case Number 17-2146 for #70 Notice of Appeal filed by First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Community Bank of Trenton, Southpointe Credit Union, University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Appellate Case Opening)(kls3)
June 1, 2017 Filing 72 Rule 10 Letter - Appeal Record due to be prepared by 6/14/2017. (jsm2)
June 1, 2017 Filing 71 Transmission of Short Record to US Court of Appeals re #70 Notice of Appeal. (jsm2)
May 31, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #68 Order, Terminate Motions, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,, by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0754-3258564. (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement)(Driscoll, John)
May 1, 2017 Filing 69 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiffs. Approved by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 5/1/17. (rah)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court GRANTS Schnucks's Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim (Doc. #55 ): all counts are dismissed with prejudice because the Court is of the opinion that further amendments will not present a plausible theory for relief. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 5/1/17. (rah)
February 21, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #66 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc. Per e-filer's request incorrect motion was linked to document. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 21, 2017 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Scott, Russell) Modified on 2/21/2017 (jsm2).
February 14, 2017 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Driscoll, John)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extra pages to file their response brief, the Court will accept a 23-page brief in this case (Doc. #63 ). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 2/14/17. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 10, 2017 Filing 63 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Community Bank of Trenton, First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Southpointe Credit Union, University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. (Driscoll, John)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: The Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond (Doc. #61 ) to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #55 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their response by Tuesday, February 14, 2017. Defendants shall then have until February 21, 2017, to file a brief reply of no more than five pages. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further continuances will be allowed in the briefing schedule because this case needs to proceed in a timely manner. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 2/7/17. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 6, 2017 Filing 61 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Coffman, Richard)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #59 ) is hereby granted. The Court finds that it is advisable to defer addressing the class certification issue until after the motion to dismiss has been fully briefed and considered. The Court confirmed that Defendants do not oppose an extension. A new deadline will be set for class certification matters once the dispositive motions have been addressed. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 2/2/17. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 1, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to file their Motion for Class Certification by All Plaintiffs. (Quinn, Christopher)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: The Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond (Doc. #57 ) to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #55 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their response by Tuesday, February 7, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 1/17/17. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 16, 2017 Filing 57 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Quinn, Christopher)
December 12, 2016 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Additional Excerpts of Visa Rules, #2 Exhibit B - Additional Excerpts of MasterCard Rules)(Warren, Daniel)
December 12, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2017 (Warren, Daniel)
November 1, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to #52 is due by December 12, 2016. Action due by 12/12/2016. (cds)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Amended Complaint (Doc. #53 ). Plaintiffs do not oppose the request. The Court finds that given the length and complexity of the Amended Complaint (Doc. #52 ), the requested extension is appropriate and does not cause prejudice to any party. Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. Defendant's response is due by December 12, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 10/31/16. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 28, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Warren, Daniel)
October 19, 2016 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Driscoll, John)
September 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: First Amended Complaint due by 10/19/2016 Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2016. (cds)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: In light of the recent change in the dispositive motion deadline, the Court RESETS the Final Pretrial Conference to 12/21/2017 at 11:00 AM in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. For the same reason, the Court RESETS the Jury Trial to 1/8/2018 at 09:00 AM in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/28/2016. (wtw) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum and order, the Court GRANTS Schnucks's motion to dismiss (Doc. #27 ): Counts 1-5 and 8-12 are DISMISSED without prejudice under Illinois and Missouri law, and Counts 6 and 7 are DISMISSED with prejudice under Illinois law and without prejudice under Missouri law. Because all of the substantive claims in this case have been dismissed, the Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a first amended complaint by Wednesday, October 19, 2016. If they fail to do so, this entire action will be dismissed and the case will be closed. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/28/2016. (wtw)
September 28, 2016 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/1/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2017. (jlrr)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Motion for class certification due by 2/1/17. Discovery to be completed by 7/1/2017. Dispositive Motions to be completed by 8/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 9/27/16. (dam)
September 26, 2016 Filing 48 Consent MOTION to Revise Case Schedule by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PDF Copy of Proposed Order)(Warren, Daniel)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 9/19/16. (dam)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 189 REASSIGNING CASE REFERRAL. Case referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for all further proceedings. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Frazier. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 15-1125-MJR-RJD. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/9/2016. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 18, 2016 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Warren, Daniel)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Consistent with the Court's August 1, 2016 order concerning Plaintiffs' early motion for class certification, Plaintiffs have moved to withdraw the initial motion for class certification without prejudice. Counsel for Defendant has advised the Court that it has no objection to the motion to withdrawal without prejudice (Doc. #43 ), so the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' placeholder motion for class certification (Doc. #12 ) is hereby WITHDRAWN. This withdrawal is without prejudice -- Plaintiffs are free to file another motion for class certification at a later date. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 8/4/2016. (wtw) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 3, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw #12 MOTION to Certify Class Without Prejudice by All Plaintiffs. (Quinn, Christopher)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Shortly after filing their putative class action complaint in this Court against Schnuck Markets, Inc., Plaintiffs filed a motion for class certification, asking the Court to certify this case for class treatment. As a part of the class certification motion, Plaintiffs said that they filed the class certification motion early to stop any attempt by Schnucks to moot the case through buy-off, and they asked the Court to hold the class certification motion in abeyance until investigation and discovery would allow it to be fully ruled on. The Court allowed the class certification motion to remain pending on the docket because the practice of using early class certification motions to avoid mootness problems was endorsed by the Seventh Circuit in Damasco v. Clearwire Corp., 662 F.3d 891 (7th Cir. 2011). The rub is that Damasco was overruled by Chapman v. First Index, Inc., 796 F.3d 783 (7th Cir. 2015), and the ongoing need for plaintiffs to file early class certification motions to avoid mootness has been placed into considerable doubt by the Seventh Circuit in Chapman and by the Supreme Court in Campbell-Ewald Co. v.Gomez, 136 S. Ct. 663 (2016). Given this change in the legal landscape, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file a brief supporting the need to keep the class certification motion pending on the docket by Tuesday, August 16, 2016. If Plaintiffs are of the view that they no longer need a pending class certification motion to avoid the problems they advanced to justify the early motion, they are DIRECTED to alternatively file a motion to withdraw the class certification motion without prejudice by Tuesday, August 16, 2016. Plaintiffs will, of course, be free to file a new motion for class certification once the issue is ready for resolution. Schnucks is free to respond to Plaintiffs' brief or motion to withdraw by Tuesday, August 30, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 8/1/2016. (wtw) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sam A. Camardo on behalf of Schnuck Markets, Inc. (jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney James A. Slater on behalf of Schnuck Markets, Inc. (jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 13, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sam A. Camardo $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2963523 by on behalf of Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Camardo, Sam)
June 13, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James A. Slater $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2963511 by on behalf of Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Slater, James)
May 31, 2016 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #36 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Warren, Daniel)
May 26, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Supplemental Authority (Coffman, Richard)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs may submit the cited supplemental authority, along with a letter brief limited to 350 words, on or before May 27, 2016. Defendants may submit a letter brief in response, similarly limited to 350 words, on or before June 1, 2016. No further briefing will be necessary absent order of the Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 5/24//2016. (wtw) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 19, 2016 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #33 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Warren, Daniel)
May 18, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Community Bank of Trenton, First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Southpointe Credit Union, University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. (Quinn, Christopher)
February 15, 2016 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Scott, Russell)
February 1, 2016 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Driscoll, John)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 1/11/2016 at 11:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Frazier IS canceled. Joint Report of Parties approved and entered. Discovery to be completed by 6/8/2017. Dispositive Motions to be completed by 6/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 1/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(krm)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' consent motion for an extension of time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. 28) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response is now due on February 1, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 1/7/16. (wtw) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 5, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Community Bank of Trenton, First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Southpointe Credit Union, University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. (Quinn, Christopher)
December 14, 2015 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Scott, Russell)
December 14, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. Responses due by 1/19/2016 (Scott, Russell)
December 14, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Warren on behalf of Schnuck Markets, Inc. (Warren, Daniel)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Frazier and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Frazier's email depository for proposed documents. When the conference is set, the party seeking discovery shall place the conference call between the parties and the Court. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. The expense of the call will be borne by the non-prevailing party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 12/10/2015. (krm) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 10, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 1/11/2016 at 11:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier. The parties should call Judge Fraziers conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call. (krm)
December 7, 2015 Filing 22 CJRA TRACK D assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2017 at 09:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2017 at 09:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(dkd)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Shortly after filing their complaint, Plaintiffs filed a class certification motion, seemingly in an effort to avoid mootness through buy-off. See Damasco v. Clearwire Corp., 662 F.3d 891 (7th Cir. 2011). In the motion, Plaintiffs asked the Court to delay ruling on the class issue until additional discovery and investigation could take place, and Defendant has recently filed a similar motion, asking the Court to extend its time to respond to the class motion so that the parties can better flesh out the issue. Defendant's motion (Doc. #20 ) is GRANTED. Briefing on the class issue is STAYED, and the Court will RESERVE RULING so as to provide additional time for discovery and investigation. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer concerning deadlines for class certification motions and responses thereto and include dates for those matters in the proposed scheduling order submitted to the magistrate judge. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/03/15. (dkd)
November 23, 2015 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Certify Class by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Scott, Russell)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Schnuck Markets, Inc. demonstrates good cause for an extension of time. The deadline for the defendant to file an answer or responsive pleading to plaintiffs' complaint is hereby extended to December 14, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 11/9/15. (kos)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 9, 2015 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Schnuck Markets, Inc.. (Scott, Russell)
November 9, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell K. Scott on behalf of Schnuck Markets, Inc. (Scott, Russell)
October 21, 2015 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan pursuant to Court Order. Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to the case. (myz)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This lawsuit is one of a series of similar cases filed in (or removed to) this Court in which Plaintiffs allege data breach violations against Schnuck Markets, Inc. Those cases are assigned to the Honorable Michael J. Reagan, Chief District Judge. Under the logic of Smith v. Check-n-Go of Illinois, 200 F.3d 511, 513 n.1 (7th Cir. 1999), this case should be reassigned to Judge Reagan. Accordingly, the undersigned hereby TRANSFERS this case (for reassignment by the Clerk's Office) to District Judge Reagan. Counsel should use the suffix "-MJR" in the case number of all future pleadings herein. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/20/15 (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mitchell A Toups on behalf of Community Bank of Trenton, First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Southpointe Credit Union and University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. (jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 19, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mitchell A Toups $100 fee paid,receipt number 0754-2754543 by on behalf of Community Bank of Trenton, First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Southpointe Credit Union, University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. (Toups, Mitchell)
October 19, 2015 Filing 12 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 44 - MOTION to Certify Class by Community Bank of Trenton, First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, Southpointe Credit Union, University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. Responses due by 11/23/2015 (Quinn, Christopher) Modified on 9/26/2016 (tkm).
October 14, 2015 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Community Bank of Trenton identifying Corporate Parent CBT BANCORP, INC. for Community Bank of Trenton. (Quinn, Christopher)
October 14, 2015 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southpointe Credit Union. (Coffman, Richard)
October 14, 2015 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. (Coffman, Richard)
October 14, 2015 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana identifying Corporate Parent Great American Bancorp, Inc. for First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana. (Coffman, Richard)
October 14, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Lyle Coffman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Coffman, Richard)
October 14, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Quinn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Quinn, Christopher)
October 14, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Driscoll on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Driscoll, John)
October 13, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES See attached document for specifics (jwf)
October 13, 2015 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Schnuck Markets, Inc. (jwf)
October 13, 2015 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier assigned. All future documents must bear case number 15-1125-SMY-PMF. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (jwf)
October 9, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action - Jury Trial Demanded) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2748024.), filed by Southpointe Credit Union, Community Bank of Trenton, First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana, University of Illinois Employees Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Driscoll, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Bank of Trenton et al v. Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southpointe Credit Union
Represented By: Richard Lyle Coffman
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Mitchell A Toups
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Federal Savings Bank of Champaign-Urbana
Represented By: Richard Lyle Coffman
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Mitchell A Toups
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Bank of Trenton
Represented By: Richard Lyle Coffman
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Mitchell A Toups
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Illinois Employees Credit Union
Represented By: Richard Lyle Coffman
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Mitchell A Toups
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schnuck Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R Warren
Represented By: Sam A. Camardo
Represented By: Russell K. Scott
Represented By: James A. Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?