Wimberly v. Wexford Health Sources Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Wimberly
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc., Trost, John Doe #1, Kimberly Butler, Salvador Godinez, John Doe #2, Gail Walls, K. Allsup and Lori Oakley
Case Number: 3:2016cv00202
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Rosenstengel
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: The Court DENIES the 111 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Kimberly Butler and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the 107 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Dr. Wallace Strow and Defendant Wexford Health Sources, I nc. The motion is granted as to Defendant Strow and denied as to Defendant Wexford. Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Strow is DISMISSED with prejudice. At the close of this case, the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant S trow and against Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant Strow as a party to this action. Plaintiff's deliberate indifference claims within Count 1 against Defendants Butler and Wexford are the only claims that remain pending. A status conference will be set by separate order for the purpose of selecting firm dates for a final pretrial conference and jury trial. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/29/2019. (bak)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ADOPTING 64 Report and Recommendation, GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment, and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. The claims against Defendants Trost, Godinez, Walls, Al lsup, and Oakley are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to terminate these defendants from this action. The Clerk's Office is also DIRECTED to update the docket sheet to reflect the true and accurate names of the fo llowing defendants: "Trost" should be "John Trost, M.D," and "Dr. Strow" should be "Dr. Wallace Strow." In light of the Court's ruling, the action will proceed as to Count One of Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendants Strow, Butler, and Wexford only. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/1/2017. (bak)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER VACATING 37 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, and GRANTING IN PART 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Darrell Wimberly. Clerk to serve Dr. Strow as directed in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/25/16. (sgp)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING 49 Motion to Compel; MOOTING 50 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/23/16. (sgp)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/2/16. (sgp)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/21/2016. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wimberly v. Wexford Health Sources Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Wimberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Godinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Allsup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?