Hatfield v. Sessions
Plaintiff: Hatfield and Larry Edward Hatfield
Defendant: Lynch, Loretta Lynch, Dana J. Boente and Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Case Number: 3:2016cv00383
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Philip M Frazier
2 Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 61 MANDATE of USCA as to #55 Notice of Appeal filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, III. The judgment of the District Court is REVERSED, with costs. (Attachments: #1 Final Order, #2 Final Judgment, #3 Order on Rehearing)(kek)
March 6, 2019 Filing 60 USCA-7 ORDER oral argument in this appeal, scheduled forMonday, April 8, 2019, is VACATED.(trb)
February 5, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Phillip Humphreys on behalf of Jefferson B. Sessions, III (Humphreys, Bradley)
June 26, 2018 Filing 58 USCA Case Number 18-2385 for #55 Notice of Appeal filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, III. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Case Opening)(kek)
June 26, 2018 Filing 57 Circuit Rule 10 Letter. (trb)
June 26, 2018 Filing 56 Transmission of Short Record to US Court of Appeals re #55 Notice of Appeal. (trb)
June 25, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Jefferson B. Sessions, III. (Swinton, Nathan)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying #51 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Larry Edward Hatfield. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/12/2018. (jdh)
May 16, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, III. (Swinton, Nathan)
May 16, 2018 Filing 52 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on 03-27-2018, before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe, Telephone number 618-439-7735. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (skr)
May 2, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, Plaintiff's Contract, #2 Exhibit Ex B, CPI Inflation Calculator, #3 Exhibit Ex C, sample orders, #4 Affidavit Ex D, Affidavit of TGM, #5 Exhibit Ex E, Statement of Hours and Expenses, #6 Affidavit Ex F, Affidavit of Larry Hatfield, #7 Exhibit Ex G, Assignment of Larry Hatfield)(Maag, Thomas)
April 26, 2018 Filing 50 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Edward Hatfield against Jefferson B. Sessions, III. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/26/2018. (jdh)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DENIES the motion for summary judgment by Jefferson B. Sessions, III, in his Official Capacity as the Attorney General of the United States (Doc. #41 ), GRANTS Larry Edward Hatfields motion for summary judgment (See Docs. 47, 48). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/26/2018. (jdh)
March 27, 2018 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Motion Hearing held on 3/27/2018 regarding #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, III. The Court is taking this matter under advisement. Opinion to follow. (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (tag)
February 27, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Maag, Thomas)
February 14, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF HEARING for oral arguments on #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Motion Hearing is set for 3/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response due by 2/27/2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/14/2018. (drs2) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 13, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Maag, Thomas)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/27/2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/13/2018. (jdh)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to substitute Jefferson B. Sessions, III, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the United States, as the party in place of defendant Dana Boente as the Acting Attorney General of the Untied States. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/23/2018. (drs2) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 5, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dana J. Boente. Responses due by 2/8/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Swinton, Nathan)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: At the #39 recent discovery dispute conference, the parties argued regarding Defendant's request that the Court quash Plaintiff's notice of 30(b)(6) deposition. Upon consideration of the arguments, Defendant's request is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 11/7/2017. (dam)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 7, 2017 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Discovery Dispute Conference held on 11/7/2017. (dam)
November 3, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Dispute Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 1:30 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/20/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2018 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Bench Trial set for 5/14/2018 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 10/23/17. (dam)
October 20, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Dana J. Boente. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language "with consent" with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required(kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 19, 2017 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Move for Summary Judgment by Dana J. Boente. (Swinton, Nathan)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/6/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2018 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Bench Trial set for 3/26/2018 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 7/6/17. (dam)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Lift Stay. The stay in this matter is lifted and Magistrate Judge Daly is DIRECTED to enter a new Scheduling and Discovery Order. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/26/2017. (scc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 26, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION to Lift Stay by Larry Edward Hatfield. (Maag, Thomas)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to substitute Acting Attorney General Dana J. Boente in his official capacity as the Acting Attorney General of the United States as party in place of defendant Loretta Lynch as the Acting Attorney General of the Untied States. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/28/2017. (scc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Stay Proceedings. There being no objection filed by the plaintiff, this matter is STAYED pending the Supreme Court's resolution of the United States' petition for certiorari in Binderup v. Lynch. The defendant, Dana J. Boente in his official capacity as the Acting Attorney General of the United States, is DIRECTED to notify the Court upon entrance of a decision in the above matter. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/28/2017. (scc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 9, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Loretta Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit United States petition for certiorari)(Swinton, Nathan)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery to be completed by 6/6/2017. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 1/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(jlm)
January 25, 2017 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Scheduling Conference held on 1/25/2017. The Joint Report of Parties is approved and will be entered. No settlement conference is scheduled at this time. (jlm)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING re #25 Joint MOTION to Reschedule Presumptive Trial Month. Magistrate Judge is directed to enter a new scheduling order. Final Pretrial Conference is Reset for 10/18/2017 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Bench Trial is Reset for 10/30/2017 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/19/2017. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 18, 2017 Filing 25 Joint MOTION Reschedule Presumptive Trial Month by Loretta Lynch. (Swinton, Nathan)
January 6, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 1/25/2017 at 10:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call.(jlm)
January 3, 2017 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Loretta Lynch.(Swinton, Nathan)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Defendant's reply (Doc. 21) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Defendant Loretta Lynch's, in her official capacity as the Attorney General of the United States,Motion (Doc. #13 ) to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/20/2016. (jdh)
September 30, 2016 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim filed by Loretta Lynch. (Swinton, Nathan)
September 19, 2016 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Scheduling Conference held on 9/19/2016. Defendant requested a stay of discovery pending the motion to dismiss currently under submission (Doc. 13). Discovery is stayed pending a ruling on the motion to dismiss. The Court will set a status conference for the purpose of entering a scheduling order following such ruling in the event that it does not dispose of the case. (dam)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Consolidate Briefing Schedule. Although counsel for plaintiff may have indicated an intent to file a dispositive motion, no such motion is currently on file. Therefore, it is only speculation that consolidated briefing is needed. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/19/2016. (scc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 15, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION Consolidate Briefing Schedule by Loretta Lynch. (Swinton, Nathan)
September 13, 2016 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim filed by Larry Edward Hatfield. (Maag, Thomas)
September 13, 2016 Filing 16 Administrative Order 189 Reassigning Case Referral. Case Referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for all further proceedings. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Frazier. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 16-cv-383-JPG-RJD (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 13, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 9/19/2016 at 10:00 AM via telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call. (jlm)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Frazier and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Frazier's email depository for proposed documents. When the conference is set, the party seeking discovery shall place the conference call between the parties and the Court. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. The expense of the call will be borne by the non-prevailing party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier on 8/16/2016. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 16, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 9/19/2016 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier. The parties should call Judge Fraziers conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call. (jlm)
August 12, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim by Loretta Lynch. Responses due by 9/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of motion)(Swinton, Nathan)
August 12, 2016 Filing 12 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/16/2017 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Bench Trial is set for 8/28/2017 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/12/2016. (tag)
August 11, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Michael Swinton on behalf of Loretta Lynch (Swinton, Nathan)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Out of Pocket Expenses. The United States and its agencies, officers, or employees require service by summons pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(i) and are not subject to Rule 4(d)(2). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/13/2016. (scc)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 9, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Out of Pocket Expenses Per FRCP 4(d) by Larry Edward Hatfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Postal Receipt)(Maag, Thomas)
June 9, 2016 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Loretta Lynch (original summons mailed to attorney Thomas Maag). (tkm)
June 8, 2016 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Maag, Thomas)
April 6, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #4 Notice (Other) filed by Larry Edward Hatfield. In document 3 the filer was told to use the event Exhibit; however, the filer used Notice (Other). Docket entry modified by Clerk's Office to reflect the correct event of Exhibit. No further action required by the filer as to this document. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 6, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Maag on behalf of Larry Edward Hatfield (Maag, Thomas)
April 6, 2016 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Maag, Thomas) Modified on 4/6/2016 (tkm).
April 6, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #1 Complaint filed by Larry Edward Hatfield. See attached document for specifics (tkm)
April 6, 2016 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Philip M. Frazier assigned. All future documents must bear case number 16-383-JPG-PMF. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (tkm)
April 6, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Loretta Lynch ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-2906791.), filed by Larry Edward Hatfield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Criminal Charges Paperwork)(Maag, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatfield v. Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Represented By: Nathan Michael Swinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana J. Boente
Represented By: Nathan Michael Swinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Represented By: Nathan Michael Swinton
Represented By: Bradley Phillip Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Edward Hatfield
Represented By: Thomas G. Maag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?