Smith v. OSF Healthcare System et al

Plaintiff: Sheilar Smith and Kasandra Anton
Defendant: OSF Healthcare System, John and Jane Does 1-20, John and Jane Does 21-40, Plan Administrator for the OSF Plans and OSF HealthCare System Human Resources Committee
Case Number: 3:2016cv00467
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Referring Judge: Philip M. Frazier
Presiding Judge: Staci M. Yandle
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 147 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/28/2018. (bps)
December 5, 2017 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 130 ). Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs state law claims is GRANTED. Counts X-XIV of the Fourth Amended Complaint (Doc. 138 ) are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/5/2017. (bps)
October 25, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' Motion to Stay (Doc. 62 ) and Defendants' Motion for Hearing (Doc. 66 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/25/2016. (tfs)
August 17, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER DENYING 33 MOTION to Change Venue to the District Court for the Central District of Illinois filed by OSF HealthCare System Human Resources Committee, Plan Administrator for the OSF Plans, OSF Healthcare System; denying 32 & 35 Motions for Hearing; finding as MOOT 30 MOTION to Stay Pending Order on Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/17/2016. (rlw)
July 25, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 33 MOTION to Change Venue to the District Court for the Central District of Illinois filed by OSF HealthCare System Human Resources Committee, Plan Administrator for the OSF Plans, OSF Healthcare System; denying 32 & 35 Motions for Hearing; finding as MOOT 30 MOTION to Stay Pending Order on Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/25/2016. (rlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. OSF Healthcare System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSF Healthcare System
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Represented By: Erin E. McAdams
Represented By: Brian T. Ortelere
Represented By: Roberta H. Vespremi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Represented By: Erin E. McAdams
Represented By: Brian T. Ortelere
Represented By: Roberta H. Vespremi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 21-40
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Represented By: Erin E. McAdams
Represented By: Brian T. Ortelere
Represented By: Roberta H. Vespremi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plan Administrator for the OSF Plans
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Represented By: Erin E. McAdams
Represented By: Brian T. Ortelere
Represented By: Roberta H. Vespremi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSF HealthCare System Human Resources Committee
Represented By: Jeremy Paul Blumenfeld
Represented By: Erin E. McAdams
Represented By: Brian T. Ortelere
Represented By: Roberta H. Vespremi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheilar Smith
Represented By: Matthew H. Armstrong
Represented By: Mary Joanne Bortscheller
Represented By: Laura R. Gerber
Represented By: Karen Handorf
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Scott Michael Lempert
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Havila C. Unrein
Represented By: Michelle C. Yau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasandra Anton
Represented By: Mary Joanne Bortscheller
Represented By: Laura R. Gerber
Represented By: Karen Handorf
Represented By: Ron Kilgard
Represented By: Scott Michael Lempert
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Havila C. Unrein
Represented By: Michelle C. Yau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?