Hotchkiss v. David et al
Plaintiff: |
James Eugene Hotchkiss |
Defendant: |
A David and Blake Woods |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00752 |
Filed: |
July 6, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Johnson |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael J. Reagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 2, 2021 |
Filing
120
ORDER granting 113 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/2/2021. (dhg)
|
August 13, 2019 |
Filing
65
ORDER ADOPTING 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Alfonso David, M.D., (Doc. 44 ) is DENIED. The Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Dr. David (Doc. 64 ) is GRANTED. The previously imposed stay on discovery is LIFTED. Judge Beatty is DIRECTED to enter an amended scheduling order that extends the deadlines in this case by 90 days. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/13/2019. (mlp)
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the mandate of the Court of Appeals, this Court's September 22, 2016, Judgment (Doc. 8) is VACATED and the case is REOPENED. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that, pursuant to the mandate of the Court of Appeals, this Court's September 22, 2016, Order (Doc. 7) is VACATED IN PART, in that the only claim remaining on remand is COUNT 1 outlined above. The deliberate indifference claim against Woo ds remains dismissed with prejudice.In light of the mandate of the Court of Appeals, that part of this Court's September 22, 2016, Order (Doc. 7) assessing a "strike" against Plaintiff under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) for the dismissal of this case is also VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/5/2017. (tjk)
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing
7
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that COUNTS 1 and 2 are frivolous and fail to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and thus are DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendants David and Woods are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. Plaintiff is advised that this dismissal shall count as one of his allotted strikes under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 9/22/2016. (tjk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?