Harders et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Harders, Christine Harders, Tammy Abell, Helen Allison, Jeanne Amadon, Karen Arnholt, Marjorie Babb, Belinda Ball, Nancy Ann Balough, Vanessa Banks, Linda Barrett, Josette Bartolo, Lesia Beach, Audrey Begaye, Latricia Benson, Julie Bernthold, Kimberly Bethell, Janice Blish, Jeanne Booth, Julie Bowen, Deanna Bowen, Kathy Bradley, Wendy Brewer, Diane Brodnick, Beverly Brown, Sheryl Butler, Vicky Caldwell, Judith Cardinale, Donna Cardwell, Esperanza Castillo, Laurel Ann Chavez, Anjilla Cloud, Tonya Coleman-Sandoval, Sharon Dalto, Christine Davis, Glynda Davis, Karen Demello, Elsa DiBernardo, Terese Dominski, Katherine Dunn, Brenda Edwards, Dorothy Eledge, Darnella Englehart, Caroline Evans, Vicki Eversole, Sandra Farino, Maria Ferran, Cynthia Fields, Erin Frank, Christine Gaffney, Laurie Gay, Barbara Giannotti, Patricia Giffen, Theresa Gilbert, Angela Goforth, Johelen Golden, Susan Gray, Virginia Hagen, Judy Haley, Frances Halliday-Cornell, Kerry Hammett, Hilda Harper, Betty Hawley, Debbie Hebdon, Cheryl Heffner, Stephanie Hess, Vivian High-Rodriguez, Laura Hubbard, Melissa Hughes, Jacqueline Hunter, Heidi Husman, Joycelyn Huyler, Estelle Inocencio, Karen Jacobs, Dagmar Jensen, Barbara Kaiser, Rhonda Kamlitz, Nancy Keily, Carol Kessenich, Deborah Kittle, Colleen Labat, Linda Lanahan, Lanome Lang, Frances Lookingbill, Rosanne Lopa, Kelly Ann Loughlin, Yvette Lucantoni, Kimberly Manaois, Sharon Martens, Donna Martin, Cynthia Martin, Lisa Mascitelli, Jennifer Matheny, Erika Matulich, Sarah Jane McAndrews, Selina McClain, Kimberly McCormick, Renee McGrail, Annette McNair, Lauralee McTamney, Cynthia Meier, Sandra Milburn, Shana Miller, Heather Miller, Debra Miller, Linda Mitchell, Maria Monzon, Leilani Morales, Donna Morris, Carson Morton, Merrilyn Muller, Mary Murray, Lela Murray, Debra Murray, Mandy Myers, Lori Napolitano, Karen Narcavage, Kathy Neal, Michelle Neal, Donna Newbury, Shirley Nicodem, Jo Odums, Sylvia Oesterle, Louise O'Farrell, Alice Oliver, Lavinia Orecchia, Kathleen Orr, Christine Owen, Donna Owens, Katie Parker, Vicki Patterson, Felicia Peregrina, Catherine Peterson, Nancy Peterson, Debra Powell, Joan Proctor, Beth Quigley, Joann Roach, Denise Robertson, Ruth Robinson, Gracita Robinson, Lissette C. Rocha, Bonny Rock, Mary Rodriguez, Maritza Rodriguez, Lisa Roemisch, Gladys Roman, Raynee Rowe, Cynthia Salazar, Susan Scherer, Laurie Schmandt, Christen Schude, Louise Schulte, Nancy Schulz, Margaret Sheffield, Osie Shmaeff, Mary Colleen Short, Shannon Sickles, Jeannette Smith, Kathryn Smith, Sharon Smith, Teresa Smith, Tracine Smoot, Stephanie Sorensen, Bonnie Starkes, Carolyn Stehler, Eleanor Stentiford, Jean Stettner, Yasmin Syed, Tracy Takahashi, Marisa Telesca, Victoria Terifaj, Cheryl Tipton, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Doreen Toro, Justine Townsend, Kimberly Trahan, Jennifer Vernon, Brenda Vice, Janice Vincent, Susan Vlaun, Lacie Vosgien, Nancy Waite, Marilyn Walker, Misty Waterman, Jane West, Carole West, Yvette White, Carole White, Caryl Wiley, Diana Williams, Anita Williamson, Lynn Witter, Joanne Wood, Linda Wright, Anne Wygal, Tina Yaw, Michelle Zurowski, Dolores Ranzie, Pamela Richardson, Marie Simpson, Debra Smith and Yolanda Williams
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. and Luzenac America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00903
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: David R Herndon
2 Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE - Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:17-cv-00726, filed 02/03/2017. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 2, 2017 Filing 67 DOCKET ANNOTATION - Case electronically transferred to District of New Jersey. (kek)
February 2, 2017 Filing 66 TRANSFER ORDER: Case transferred to District of New Jersey and MDL No. 2738 In Re: Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(kek)
February 2, 2017 Filing 65 PRELIMINARY TRANSFER ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Clerk, #2 Minute Order)(kek)
December 9, 2016 Filing 64 MOTION for Hearing re #59 MOTION for Order to Determine Grounds for Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and For Suggestion to the JPML by All Plaintiffs. (Blair, William)
December 8, 2016 Filing 63 JOINDER by Imerys Talc America, Inc.. Joinder in #61 Response in Opposition to Motion Determine Grounds for Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Suggestion to the JPML. (Mellow, Mary)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: The Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: Depositions of Plaintiff's expert(s) shall be taken by September 25, 2017. All other scheduling and discovery dates and deadlines remain the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/7/2016. (nms)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 6, 2016 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION for Order to Determine Grounds for Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and For Suggestion to the JPML filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
November 28, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #59 Motion for Order filed by Plaintiffs. Document does not reflect accurate case number/judge assignment. Should be 3:16-cv-00903-DRH-DGW. No further action required by the filer.(kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 23, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION for Order to Determine Grounds for Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and For Suggestion to the JPML by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blair, William)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/15/2017 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson.(jmp)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/2/2016. (jmp)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/6/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 11/21/2017.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 11/2/2016. (jmp)
November 3, 2016 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/2/2016. Attorney Blair for Plaintiffs and attorneys Mellow and Bauer for Defendants. Court does not adopt JROPs submitted by parties. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter n/a.) (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 24, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 11/2/2016 at 3:45 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (jmp)
October 19, 2016 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc..(Bauer, Beth)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING #49 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #50 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #51 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to plantiffs listed in Exhibit A. The Court DISMISSES said plaintiffs without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to dismiss the plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A from the docket. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 10/17/16. (lmp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 15, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marisa Telesca, Victoria Terifaj, Elizabeth Ann Tobin, Doreen Toro, Justine Townsend, Kimberly Trahan, Jennifer Vernon, Susan Vlaun, Misty Waterman, Carole West, Yvette White, Diana Williams, Yolanda Williams, Lynn Witter, Joanne Wood, Linda Wright, Anne Wygal, Tina Yaw, Michelle Zurowski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blair, William)
October 15, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Erika Matulich, Sarah Jane McAndrews, Kimberly McCormick, Renee McGrail, Cynthia Meier, Linda Mitchell, Donna Morris, Carson Morton, Merrilyn Muller, Debra Murray, Lela Murray, Mandy Myers, Karen Narcavage, Kathy Neal, Shirley Nicodem, Donna Owens, Felicia Peregrina, Beth Quigley, Dolores Ranzie, Pamela Richardson, Joann Roach, Gracita Robinson, Ruth Robinson, Lissette C. Rocha, Bonny Rock, Maritza Rodriguez, Mary Rodriguez, Lisa Roemisch, Gladys Roman, Raynee Rowe, Cynthia Salazar, Christen Schude, Louise Schulte, Margaret Sheffield, Shannon Sickles, Marie Simpson, Debra Smith, Jeannette Smith, Bonnie Starkes, Carolyn Stehler, Eleanor Stentiford, Tracy Takahashi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blair, William)
October 15, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Allison, Jeanne Amadon, Belinda Ball, Vanessa Banks, Linda Barrett, Josette Bartolo, Lesia Beach, Audrey Begaye, Latricia Benson, Julie Bernthold, Kimberly Bethell, Janice Blish, Deanna Bowen, Vicky Caldwell, Judith Cardinale, Donna Cardwell, Elsa DiBernardo, Katherine Dunn, Dorothy Eledge, Darnella Englehart, Vicki Eversole, Maria Ferran, Christine Gaffney, Patricia Giffen, Susan Gray, Judy Haley, Betty Hawley, Vivian High-Rodriguez, Melissa Hughes, Jacqueline Hunter, Karen Jacobs, Barbara Kaiser, Rhonda Kamlitz, Colleen Labat, Linda Lanahan, Lanome Lang, Yvette Lucantoni, Kimberly Manaois, Cynthia Martin, Donna Martin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blair, William)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #29 Motion for Order to Deem this Removed Lawsuit a "Mass Action" Under 28 USC 1332(d)(11)(B). Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 10/4/16. (lmp)
October 3, 2016 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying #25 Motion for Joinder. See (Doc. 42) for details. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/30/16. (lmp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 29, 2016 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
September 28, 2016 Filing 44 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Jury Trial set for presumptive trial month, March, 2018, in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge David R. Herndon. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(cekf)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #40 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. The motion is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 09/27/2016. (Herndon, David)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Stay. This matter was recently reassigned to the undersigned judge. Upon reviewing the docket sheet, the Court notes that no purpose will be served by staying this case at this point. The JPML will be meeting in two days time and, presumably, will rule one way or the other on the pending petitions in short order. A stay order is frivolous. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 09/27/2016. (Herndon, David)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 27, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE by Imerys Talc America, Inc. of Consent to Notice of Removal (Mellow, Mary)
September 26, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
September 19, 2016 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Blair, William)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David R. Herndon for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/19/2016. (jdh)
September 15, 2016 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blair, William)
September 15, 2016 Filing 36 EXHIBIT by All Plaintiffs. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, 7 Notice of Deficiencies,, Cleaner copy of State Court Complaint. (Rados, Stephanie)
September 6, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #34 Motion for Joinder filed by Imerys Talc America, Inc.. Pdf document and event do not match. See Section 4.0: pages 4.6 & 4.7 of the Users Manual. Document is a Notice of Joinder, not a Motion for Joinder. The correct event would be located in CIVIL - OTHER FILINGS - JOINDER. Motion terminated by Clerk's Office Staff and text of entry modified. This notice is informational - for reference with future filings. No further action required. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 2, 2016 Filing 34 Joinder in the Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Opposiiton to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Deeming this Removed Lawsuit a "Mass Action" Under 28 U.S.C. 1332(d)(11)(B) by Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary) Modified on 9/6/2016 (jaj).
September 1, 2016 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Order toDeem this Removed Lawsuit a "Mass Action" Under 28 USC 1333(d)(11)(B), and Notice of All Plaintiffs that No Plaintiff Requests Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 23, 2016 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Blair, William)
August 22, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #28 Summons Returned Executed filed by All Plaintiffs. See attached document for specifics (tkm)
August 19, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger C. Denton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Denton, Roger)
August 18, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION for Order toDeem this Removed Lawsuit a "Mass Action" Under 28 USC 1333(d)(11)(B), and Notice of All Plaintiffs that No Plaintiff Requests Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1407 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Blair, William)
August 18, 2016 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc., served on 7/18/2016, answer due 8/8/2016 (Rados, Stephanie) Modified on 8/22/2016 (tkm).
August 18, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #21 Summons Returned Executed filed by All Plaintiffs. Filer attached document from State Court and did not select the party that was served. Docket entry STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. Document must be re-filed. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 17, 2016 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Imerys Talc America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IMERYS MINERALS HOLDING LIMITED (UK), Corporate Parent IMERYS USA, INC., Corporate Parent IMERYS S.A. for Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary)
August 17, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION for Joinder by Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary)
August 17, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Imerys Talc America, Inc.. Responses due by 9/19/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Mellow, Mary)
August 17, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Anne Mellow on behalf of Imerys Talc America, Inc. (Mellow, Mary)
August 17, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Prost on behalf of Imerys Talc America, Inc. (Prost, Mark)
August 17, 2016 Filing 21 ENTRY STRICKEN - SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Rados, Stephanie) Modified on 8/18/2016 (tkm).
August 17, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L. Rados on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rados, Stephanie)
August 16, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #17 Summons Returned Executed filed by All Plaintiffs. Filer did not select the defendant that was served. Docket entry STRICKEN as Ordered by the Court. Document must be re-filed. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 16, 2016 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Imerys Talc America, Inc. served on 7/11/2016, answer due 8/1/2016. (Rados, Stephanie)
August 16, 2016 Filing 17 ENTRY STRICKEN - SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Rados, Stephanie) Modified on 8/16/2016 (tkm).
August 16, 2016 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Johnson & Johnson served on 7/13/2016, answer due 8/3/2016. (Rados, Stephanie)
August 12, 2016 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bauer, Beth)
August 12, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 12, 2016 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bauer, Beth)
August 12, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2016 (Bauer, Beth)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel recused. Case reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for all further proceedings. All future filing to reflect case number 16-cv-903-JPG-DGW. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/12/16. (drb)
August 11, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth A. Bauer on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc. (Bauer, Beth)
August 11, 2016 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
August 11, 2016 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson. (Bauer, Beth)
August 11, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc. Filer added 5 parties (Dolores Ranzie, Pamela Richardson, Marie Simpson, Debra Smith and Yolanda Williams) when opening the case; however, after reviewing the case these 5 parties were not listed in the State Court Complaint. Clerk's Office has removed the 5 parties from the docket sheet. Notice of Errors for informational purposes. No further action required by the filer as to this document. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ted G. Meadows on behalf of All Plaintiffs on 8/11/2016. (tkm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 11, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ted G Meadows $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3010603 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Meadows, Ted)
August 11, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ERRORS AND/OR DEFICIENCIES See attached document for specifics (tkm)
August 11, 2016 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 16-903-NJR-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (tkm)
August 10, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. to Plaintiff of Filing Notice of Removal (Bauer, Beth)
August 10, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Madsion County, Illinois, case number 16-L-961 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3010038), filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bauer, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harders et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Harders
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Abell
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Allison
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Amadon
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Arnholt
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Babb
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Ball
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Ann Balough
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Banks
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Barrett
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josette Bartolo
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesia Beach
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Begaye
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latricia Benson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Bernthold
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Bethell
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Blish
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Booth
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Bowen
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Bowen
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Bradley
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Brewer
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Brodnick
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Brown
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Butler
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Caldwell
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Cardinale
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Cardwell
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esperanza Castillo
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Ann Chavez
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjilla Cloud
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Coleman-Sandoval
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Dalto
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Davis
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynda Davis
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Demello
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa DiBernardo
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terese Dominski
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Dunn
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Edwards
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Eledge
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnella Englehart
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Evans
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Eversole
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Farino
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ferran
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Fields
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Frank
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Gaffney
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Gay
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Giannotti
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Giffen
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Gilbert
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Goforth
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johelen Golden
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gray
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Hagen
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Haley
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Halliday-Cornell
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Hammett
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Harper
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Hawley
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Hebdon
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Heffner
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hess
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian High-Rodriguez
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hubbard
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hughes
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Hunter
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Husman
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joycelyn Huyler
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estelle Inocencio
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Jacobs
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dagmar Jensen
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Kaiser
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Kamlitz
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Keily
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Kessenich
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Kittle
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Labat
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lanahan
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanome Lang
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Lookingbill
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanne Lopa
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Ann Loughlin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Lucantoni
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Manaois
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Martens
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Martin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Martin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Mascitelli
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Matheny
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Matulich
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Jane McAndrews
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selina McClain
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly McCormick
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee McGrail
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette McNair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauralee McTamney
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Meier
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Milburn
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Miller
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Miller
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Miller
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Mitchell
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Monzon
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leilani Morales
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Morris
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carson Morton
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrilyn Muller
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Murray
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela Murray
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Murray
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Myers
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Napolitano
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Narcavage
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Neal
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Neal
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Newbury
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Nicodem
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Odums
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Oesterle
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise O'Farrell
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Oliver
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavinia Orecchia
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Orr
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Owen
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Owens
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Parker
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Patterson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Peregrina
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Peterson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Peterson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Powell
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Proctor
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Quigley
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Roach
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Robertson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Robinson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracita Robinson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lissette C. Rocha
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonny Rock
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rodriguez
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Rodriguez
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Roemisch
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Roman
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynee Rowe
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Salazar
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Scherer
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Schmandt
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christen Schude
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Schulte
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Schulz
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Sheffield
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osie Shmaeff
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Colleen Short
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Sickles
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Smith
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Smith
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Smith
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Smith
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracine Smoot
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Sorensen
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Starkes
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Stehler
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Stentiford
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Stettner
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasmin Syed
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Takahashi
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Telesca
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Terifaj
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Tipton
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ann Tobin
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Toro
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Townsend
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Trahan
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vernon
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Vice
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Vincent
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Vlaun
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacie Vosgien
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Waite
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Walker
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Waterman
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane West
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole West
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette White
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole White
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caryl Wiley
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Williams
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Williamson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Witter
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Wood
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Wright
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Wygal
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Yaw
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Zurowski
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Ranzie
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Richardson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Simpson
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Smith
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Williams
Represented By: W. Wylie Blair
Represented By: Roger C. Denton
Represented By: Stephanie L. Rados
Represented By: Ted G Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Products, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Prost
Represented By: Mary Anne Mellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luzenac America, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Prost
Represented By: Mary Anne Mellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?