White v. USA
Plaintiff: William A White
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2016cv00968
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 27 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/14/2020. (jsy)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall recover nothing, and the action be DISMISSED on the merits with prejudice as to Counts 1-2, 4-8, and 13 to the extent that the relevant agency for purposes of exhaustion is an agency other than the US Mars hals Service. The action is dismissed without prejudice as to all Counts for failure to exhaust, but Plaintiff must file a new suit after he exhausts his administrative remedies to pursue those claims. The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/10/2017. (tkm)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/22/2016. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?