West v. Unknown Parties

Plaintiff: Kentes West
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2016cv00986
Filed: August 29, 2016
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Staci M. Yandle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court will not assess a strike. However, Plaintiff's obligation to pay the filing fee for the action was incurred at the time the original action was filed, thus the filing fee of $350.00 remains due and payable despite Plaintiff's request for voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/9/2016. (tjk)
October 11, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that COUNT 13, the only claim at issue in this severed case, is DISMISSED without prejudice against Defendant UNKNOWN PARTY(IES) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted.Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a F irst Amended Complaint in this case on or before November 8, 2016. Should Plaintiff fail to file his First Amended Complaint within the allotted time, dismissal of this action will become with prejudice. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2016). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/11/2016. (tjk)
August 29, 2016 1 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER severing case number 16-414-SMY. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/29/2016. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentes West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?