Trainor et al v. Gebke et al

Plaintiff: Corey Trainor, Michael Turner, Terrance Garrett, James Groleau, Dylan Metzel and Keverez Tanzy
Defendant: Larry Gebke, Robert C. Mueller, Monica Christianson and Officer Rovenstein
Case Number: 3:2017cv00627
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Clinton
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. COUNT 4 is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 20(a)(2), Trainors retaliation claims (COUNTS 1 and 2) against CHRISTIANSON and ROVENSTEIN, which are unrelated to the claims against Gebke and Mueller in Count 3 for rejection of publications in violation of the First Amendment, are SEVERED into a new case. That new case shall be: Claims by TRAINOR against CHRISTIANSON and ROVENSTEIN for retaliation (Counts 1 and 2 herein). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the only claim remaining in this action is COUNT 3 against Defendants GEBKE and MUELLER, for rejecting Trainors and Turners publications in violation of the First Amendment. This case shall now be captioned as: COREY TRAINOR and MICHAEL TURNER, Plaintiffs, vs. LARRY GEBKE and ROBERT C. MUELLER, Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants CHRISTIANSON and ROVENSTEIN are TERMINATED from this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 10/27/2017. (jaj)
October 26, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS ORDERED that KEVEREZ TANZY is DISMISSED as a co-Plaintiff in this action, for failure to comply with an order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Tanzy's motions for leave to proceed IFP (Docs. 6, 25, and 28) are DENIED. Despite his dismissal from the action, Tanzy's filing fee shall remain due and payable. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 10/26/2017. (tjk)
September 26, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that KEVEREZ TANZY shall submit, within 21 days of this order (on or before October 16, 2017), a certified copy of his prisoner trust fund statement covering the dates from Dec. 14, 2016 June 14, 2017. To enable Tanzy to compl y with this Order, the CLERK is DIRECTED to mail him another blank form Certification of trust fund statement, to be completed by the prison trust fund officer. Failure to comply with this Order will result in co-Plaintiff Tanzy's DISMISSAL from this action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), for failure to comply with an order of this Court. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 10/16/2017). Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/25/2017. (tjk)
August 22, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS ORDERED that JAMES GROLEAU is voluntarily DISMISSED as a co-Plaintiff in this action. In accordance with the Court's July 20, 2017, order (Doc. 13) Groleau shall not be assessed a filing fee for this case. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/21/2017. (tjk)
August 8, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that DYLAN METZEL is voluntarilyDISMISSED as a co-Plaintiff in this action. In accordance with the Courts July20, 2017, order (Doc. 13) Metzel shall not be assessed a filing fee for this case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to each of thePlaintiffs who remain in this case. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/8/2017. (tkm)
July 28, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that TERRANCE GARRETT is voluntarily DISMISSED as a co-Plaintiff in this action. In accordance with the Courts July 20, 2017, order (Doc. 13) Garrett shall not be assessed a filing fee for this case. Gar retts motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 8) is TERMINATED AS MOOT. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to each of the Plaintiffs in this case. re 15 Response filed by Terrance Garrett, 13 Order. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/28/2017. (tkm)
July 20, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each non-lead Plaintiff (TURNER, GARRETT, GROLEAU, METZEL, and TANZY) shall advise the Court in writingon or before August 18, 2017, whether he wishes to continue as a Plaintiff in this group action. I f, by that deadline, any non-lead Plaintiff advises the Court that he does not wish to participate in the action, he will be dismissed from the lawsuit and will not be charged a filing fee for this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each non-lead Pla intiff who chooses to continue as a Plaintiff either in this action or in a severed individual case, is hereby ORDERED to pay his filing fee of $400.00 or file a properly completed motion for leave to proceed IFP if he has not already done so, on or before August 18, 2017. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/19/2017. (jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trainor et al v. Gebke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Groleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Metzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keverez Tanzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Gebke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rovenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?