Croom v Unknown Party

Plaintiff: Christopher Croom
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook, Rodely and John Baldwin
Case Number: 3:2017cv00633
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Referring Judge: Reona J. Daly
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 6/30/2017. (jaj)
June 19, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should he wish to proceed with this case, plaintiff shall file his first amended complaint, identi fying any defendants involved in the conduct he complains of, within 28 days of the entry of this Order. An amended complaint supersedes and replaces the original complaint, rendering the original complaint void. In order to assist plaintiff in preparing his amended complaint, the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 6/16/2017. ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2017.) (tkm)
June 14, 2017 1 Opinion or Order of the Court MNEMORANDUM AND ORDER severing case. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 6/14/2017. (jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croom v Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Croom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Represented By: Christine G. McClimans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodely
Represented By: Christine G. McClimans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?