Owens v. Lamb et al
Plaintiff: James Owens
Defendant: Warden Lamb, John Coe, Lt McArthy, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2017cv00667
Filed: June 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Staci M. Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 91 ) and GRANTING Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 82 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/12/2021. (sgp)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER. Plaintiff's appeal of Magistrate Judge Daly's September 23, 2019 Order (Doc. 101 ) is DENIED; Plaintiff's response to the motion for summary judgment (Doc. 103 ) is STRICKEN; the Motion to Stay Judgment on the Report and Recom mendation (Doc. 102 ) is DENIED as moot; and Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections (Doc. 97 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's objections are due within 14 days of this Order. There will be no further extension of that deadline absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/25/2020. (ksp)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 72 ) and GRANTING MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Amy Ulrey (Doc. 61 ). Defendant Amy Ulrey is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/13/2019. (sgp)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File (Doc. 42 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/24/18. (bps)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Defendant John Coe's Motion for Summary Judgment(Doc. 27 ). Summary judgment is hereby GRANTED in favor of Defendant Coe and the claims against him are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/22/2018. (bps)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for interim injunctive relief under Rule 65(a) or (b) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/7/2017. (jaj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Lamb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt McArthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?