Phillips III v. US Air Force et al

Plaintiff: Clint Phillips III
Defendant: US Air Force and Scott AFB
Case Number: 3:2017cv01079
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/7/2017. (jdh)
November 21, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court DISMISSES without prejudice the U.S. Air Force and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to terminate them as a defendant. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/21/2017. (jdh)
November 6, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting 10 MOTION for Reconsideration re 8 Order Dismissing Case filed by Clint Phillips III. The Court DENIES the plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 3). The plaintiff shall have up to and including November 20, 2017 to file his amended complaint and pay the filing fee. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/6/2017. (jdh)
October 27, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/27/2017. (jdh)
October 24, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/24/2017. (jdh)
October 16, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, re: jurisdictional defect. Amended pleading due by 11/2/2017. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/13/2017. (jdh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips III v. US Air Force et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Phillips III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott AFB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?