USA v. Santel et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Richard A. Santel, Keri L. Santel, Capital One Bank and Marion County Savings Bank
Case Number: 3:2017cv01179
Filed: October 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Clinton
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Entry of Deficiency Judgment. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/24/2018. (lmp)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Judgment Decree and Order Directing and ORDER granting 15 Motion for Default Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 2/23/2018. (klh)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting with Prejudice 9 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Marion County Savings Bank. The clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant at the conclusion of litigation. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 1/8/2018. (csd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Santel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Gerald M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Santel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keri L. Santel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?