Doe v. St. Clair County et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: St. Clair County, Richard Watson and Robert Sneed
Case Number: 3:2018cv00380
Filed: February 14, 2018
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Presiding Judge: Staci M. Yandle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Richard Watson and St. Clair County (Doc. 21 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/10/2018. (mah)
July 18, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART Motion to Stay re 1 Complaint filed by Robert Sneed (Doc. 28 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/18/2018. (mah)
February 26, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Sealed Motion filed by Jane Doe (Doc. 10 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 2/26/2018. (mah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. St. Clair County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Daniel Phillip Kiss
Represented By: Louis J Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Clair County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?