Jenkins v. USA

Petitioner: Antwon Deshane Jenkins
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2018cv00610
Filed: March 26, 2018
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/25/2018. (ceh)
August 24, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion to Compel Review of Case File and Request for Documents. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/24/2018. (ceh)
July 25, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/25/2018. (ceh)
April 12, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion for Release on Bond. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 4/11/2018. (ceh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antwon Deshane Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Laura V. Reppert(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?