Villagran v. Lawrence et al

Plaintiff: Michael Asad Villagran and Denzil Lawrence
Defendant: Bruce Williams, Will Miller and Chester Mental Health Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv00915
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Staci M. Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/19/2018. (tjk)
May 24, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 MOTION to Add Defendant(s) re 1 Complaint filed by Michael Asad Villagran. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff LAWRENCE is TERMINATED from this action. His claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to this Court 9;s Order at Doc. 6. This dismissal shall not count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), and this plaintiff is not obligated to pay the filing fee for this action. Denzil Lawrence terminated.. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/24/2018. (tjk)
April 16, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Denzil Lawrence must indicate his desire to proceed as a plaintiff in this action by submitting a copy of the Complaint, with his signature under the Certification section on page 7, on or before May 16, 2018. If, by that deadline, Lawrence does not return a signed Complaint, he will be dismissed from the lawsuit and will not be charged a filing fee for this action. This is the only way to avoid the obligation to pay a filing fee. See attached order for details. (Action due by 5/16/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2018). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/16/2018. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villagran v. Lawrence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Asad Villagran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denzil Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Mental Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?