Alexander v. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Alexander
Defendant: Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Yuke's LA Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd., Visual Concepts Entertainment, 2K Sports Inc., World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. and 2K Games, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00966
Filed: April 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Michael J Reagan
Referring Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
2 Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/19/2022. (mah)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER RE: JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/19/2022. (mah)
September 19, 2022 Filing 274 NOTICE by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. re #269 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Designations and Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Page, #2 Exhibit B - Redline of Corrections)(Cendali, Dale)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the final pretrial conference set for September 14, 2022 is VACATED. The final pretrial conference is RESET for September 19, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. via video conference before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. Full access to this hearing is available remotely. Instructions for non-participants to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 877-873-8017, when prompted enter Access Code 4354777. In light of the public health crisis due to the COVID-19 virus, the Court finds that full access to the press and public cannot be afforded for this hearing. Other alternatives to closure were considered, but at this time the Court only has the technological capability to allow access by teleconference. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/13/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 12, 2022 Filing 272 TRIAL BRIEF by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
September 12, 2022 Filing 271 TRIAL BRIEF by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
September 12, 2022 Filing 270 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #269 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Designations and Objections filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language with consent with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF Users Manual. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (jlh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 9, 2022 Filing 269 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections by2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
September 9, 2022 Filing 268 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byCatherine Alexander. (Tahan, Paul)
September 7, 2022 Filing 267 RESPONSE in Opposition re #262 MOTION in Limine filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
September 7, 2022 Filing 266 RESPONSE to Motion re #263 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Omnibus filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of E. Kiang Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of M. Little Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - WWE Booking Contract, #4 Exhibit D - Opening Expert Report of J. Zagal, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Take-Two Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories - 10-15-2018)(Simon, Anthony)
August 26, 2022 Filing 265 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections by2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
August 26, 2022 Filing 264 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byCatherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
August 24, 2022 Filing 263 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Omnibus by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 1 - Alexander's Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 2 -Alexander's Suppl Responses to First Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt from Deposition of Ryan Clark, #5 Exhibit 4 - October 2020 Pretrial Order, #6 Exhibit 5 - First Amended Final Pretrial Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt from Deposition of Catherine Alexander, #8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt from Alexander's Responses to First Requests for Production, #9 Exhibit 8 - Expert Report of Jose Zagal, #10 Exhibit 9 - Alexander's Trial Exhibit 68, #11 Exhibit 10 - WWE Responses to Alexander's First Interrogatories, #12 Exhibit 11 - Responding Expert Report of Zagal)(Cendali, Dale)
August 24, 2022 Filing 262 MOTION in Limine by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of R. Cornett, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of J. Wright, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of G. Glatstein)(Simon, Anthony)
February 8, 2022 Filing 261 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections by2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
January 31, 2022 Filing 260 Transcript of Final Pretrial Conference held on 01/24/2022, before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Court Reporter Christine D. LaBuwi, Telephone number (618) 439-7725. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2022. (cad)
January 26, 2022 Filing 259 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byCatherine Alexander. (Tahan, Paul)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER: As discussed on the record during the January 24, 2022 final pretrial conference, the Court makes the following rulings for case management purposes. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/25/2022. (mah)
January 24, 2022 Filing 257 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Staci M. Yandle: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/24/2022. Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 9/14/2022 at 9:30 AM via video before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. Full access to this hearing is available remotely. Instructions for non-participants to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 877-873-8017, when prompted enter Access Code 4354777. In light of the public health crisis due to the COVID-19 virus, the Court finds that full access to the press and public cannot be afforded for this hearing. Other alternatives to closure were considered, but at this time the Court only has the technological capability to allow access by teleconference. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Order to enter. (Court Reporter Chris LaBuwi.) (jlm)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the final pretrial conference set for January 19, 2022 is VACATED. The final pretrial conference is RESET for January 24, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. via video conference before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. Full access to this hearing is available remotely. Instructions for non-participants to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 877-873-8017, when prompted enter Access Code 4354777. In light of the public health crisis due to the COVID-19 virus, the Court finds that full access to the press and public cannot be afforded for this hearing. Other alternatives to closure were considered, but at this time the Court only has the technological capability to allow access by teleconference. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/18/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 14, 2022 Filing 255 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections by2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Final Pretrial Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Deposition Designation Objections, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Deposition Counter Designations, #4 Exhibit 4 - Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibit List)(Cendali, Dale)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER: Given the current surge of the omicron coronavirus pandemic in this district, the Court has determined that a jury cannot be safely impaneled and trial cannot proceed as currently scheduled. Accordingly, the January 31, 2022 trial setting is hereby VACATED. The Final Pretrial Conference will proceed as scheduled on January 19, 2022 and a new trial date will be set at that time. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/3/2022. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 31, 2021 Filing 253 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byCatherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER: Due to the public health crisis presented by the COVID-19 pandemic, jury trial is RESET for January 31, 2022 at 9:00 AM in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. The final pretrial conference is RESET for January 19, 2022 at 10:30 AM via video conference before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. Full access to this hearing is available remotely. Instructions for non-participants to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 877-873-8017, when prompted enter Access Code 4354777. In light of the public health crisis due to the COVID-19 virus, the Court finds that full access to the press and public cannot be afforded for this hearing. Other alternatives to closure were considered, but at this time the Court only has the technological capability to allow access by teleconference. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/16/2021. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER: In light of the current status of the coronavirus pandemic in this district, the September 20, 2021 trial setting is hereby VACATED. Trial will be reset by separate order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/8/2021. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' First Amended Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Doc. #248 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/8/2021. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2021 Filing 249 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Staci M. Yandle: Status Conference held on 9/8/2021. R. Seth Compton, Anthony R. Friedman, Paul Joseph Tahan, and Anthony G. Simon appear on behalf of Plaintiff. Dale Cendali, Christopher Ilardi, Joshua Simmons, and Miranda Means appear on behalf of Defendants Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc., and Visual Concepts Entertainment. Curtis Krasik appears on behalf of Defendant World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. Michael J. Nester appears on behalf of all Defendants. In light of the current status of the coronavirus pandemic in this district, the current trial setting is hereby VACATED. Counsel is ordered to meet and confer and submit an agreed upon revised trial date. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Chris Dohack LaBuwi.) (lmt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 7, 2021 Filing 248 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants' First Amended Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tahan, Paul)
September 3, 2021 Filing 247 TRIAL BRIEF by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
September 3, 2021 Filing 246 TRIAL BRIEF by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
September 1, 2021 Filing 245 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 9/8/2021 at 9:30 AM via video conference before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. (lmt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 24, 2021 Filing 244 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #243 Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Designations and Objections. Text entry modified to include "First Amended" to more accurately describe the title of the filed document. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 23, 2021 Filing 243 FIRST AMENDED RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections by2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale) Modified on 8/24/2021 (kls3).
August 4, 2021 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Joseph Tahan on behalf of Catherine Alexander (Tahan, Paul)
August 4, 2021 Filing 241 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Staci M. Yandle: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/4/2021. (Court Reporter Chris LaBuwi.) (slh)
February 3, 2021 Filing 240 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Staci M. Yandle: Status Conference held on 2/3/2021. Telephonic status conference is set for August 4, 2021 at 10:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference is set for September 1, 2021 at 1:30 PM via video conference; and Jury Trial is set for September 20, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse. See attached for details.(Court Reporter Chris LaBuwi.) (slh)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER: In light of the current status of the coronavirus pandemic in this district, the current trial setting is hereby VACATED. The current final pretrial conference setting scheduled on February 3, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. is converted to a telephonic status conference for the purpose of resetting the final pretrial and trial dates. The instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: All parties should call toll free 877-873-8017 and enter the access code 4354777. Then when prompted, enter security code 0203. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/26/2021. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 20, 2021 Filing 238 NOTICE by Catherine Alexander Joint Correspondence to Court regarding Trial Setting (Friedman, Anthony)
October 30, 2020 Filing 237 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byCatherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
October 21, 2020 Filing 236 Transcript of Final Pretrial Conference held on 09/28/2020, before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Court Reporter Christine LaBuwi, Telephone number (618) 439-7725. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. (cad)
October 16, 2020 Filing 235 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections by2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pretrial Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Designation Objections, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Counter Designations, #4 Exhibit 4 - Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #5 Exhibit 5 - Rebuttal Exhibit List)(Cendali, Dale)
October 16, 2020 Filing 234 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byCatherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Simon, Anthony)
October 2, 2020 Filing 233 EXHIBIT by Catherine Alexander. Exhibit to #217 Response in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit A - Deposition of E. Kiang. (Simon, Anthony)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER FOR TRANSCRIPT: It is hereby ORDERED that the preparation of the transcript of the final pretrial conference held on September 28, 2020 be prepared by the Court Reporter and filed with the Clerk of the Court, at the expense of the United States, within 30 days. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/30/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 29, 2020 Filing 231 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking [217-1] (Exhibit A) Deposition of E. Kiang Per Order at Doc. 229.(ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 28, 2020 Filing 230 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Staci M. Yandle: Pretrial Conference held on 9/28/2020. Due to the public health crisis presented by the COVID-19 pandemic, jury trial is RESET for February 16, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. The final pretrial conference is SET for February 3, 2021 at 1:30 PM via video conference before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. Full access to this hearing is available remotely. Instructions for non-participants to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 877-873-8017, when prompted enter Access Code 4354777. In light of the public health crisis due to the COVID-19 virus, the Court finds that full access to the press and public cannot be afforded for this hearing. Other alternatives to closure were considered, but at this time the Court only has the technological capability to allow access by teleconference. (Court Reporter Chris LaBuwi.) (slh)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendants' Motion to Seal Three Exhibits and File with Redactions (Doc. #218 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to seal Doc. [142-22] and Doc. [142-23]. The Clerk's Office is further DIRECTED to Strike Doc. [217-1]. The parties are ORDERED to refile a redacted version of Doc. [217-1] and to file Doc. [218-1]) within 7 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/28/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER: Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #139 ) is GRANTED, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #141 ) is DENIED, Defendant WWE's Motion for Joinder (Doc. #138 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement (Doc. #207 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/26/2020. (mah)
September 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER: Defendants' motions to exclude (Docs. #143 and #145 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/26/2020. (mah)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting #225 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 21, 2020 Filing 225 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick K. Arnett $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4285945 by on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Arnett, Patrick)
September 18, 2020 Filing 224 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections byCatherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Initial Deposition Designations, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Trial Witness List)(Simon, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Filing 223 RULE 26(a)(3) Disclosures, Designations, and Objections by2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
September 18, 2020 Filing 222 RESPONSE in Opposition re #210 MOTION in Limine filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Alexander Dep Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Thomas Ray Cornett, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of DeShawn Morris, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Justin Wright)(Cendali, Dale)
September 18, 2020 Filing 221 Exhibit List Plaintiff's Initial Trial Exhibit List by Catherine Alexander.. (Simon, Anthony)
September 18, 2020 Filing 220 RESPONSE to Motion re #212 MOTION in Limine filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of E. Kiang Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of M. Little Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - WWE Booking Contract, #4 Exhibit D - Opening Expert Report of J. Zagal, #5 Exhibit E - Expert Rebuttal Report of R. Clark)(Simon, Anthony)
September 10, 2020 Filing 219 RESPONSE to Motion re #207 MOTION to Supplement Summary Judgment Evidence with Recent Deposition Transcript of Defendant WWE filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Response ISO Summary Judgment)(Cendali, Dale)
September 10, 2020 Filing 218 MOTION to Seal Three Exhibits and File with Redactions by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Exhibits)(Cendali, Dale)
September 10, 2020 Filing 217 RESPONSE in Opposition re #207 MOTION to Supplement Summary Judgment Evidence with Recent Deposition Transcript of Defendant WWE, #208 MOTION to Seal Document #207 MOTION to Supplement Summary Judgment Evidence with Recent Deposition Transcript of Defendant WWE filed by Catherine Alexander. Exhibit 1 is STRICKEN, per Doc. 229 (Attachments: #1 STRICKEN Exhibit A - Deposition of E. Kiang)(Simon, Anthony) Modified on 9/29/2020 (ack).
September 10, 2020 Filing 216 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Ryan Clark Refiled per Order [Dkt 213 and Dkt 214]] filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of R. Clark Depo, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rebuttal Expert Report of R. Clark, #3 Exhibit 3 - TAKE-TWO_0001332, #4 Exhibit 4 - TAKE-TWO_0000983)(Simon, Anthony)
September 10, 2020 Filing 215 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment Refiled per Order [Dkt 213 and Dkt 214]] filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registrations, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of M. Little Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of C. Alexander Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Expert Report of J. Zagal)(Simon, Anthony)
September 9, 2020 Filing 214 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #168 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Catherine Alexander, #165 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Catherine Alexander. Documents stricken per order at Document 213.(ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER: The motions to seal (Docs. #147 , #150 , #169 , and #208 ) are DENIED. The parties are DIRECTED to refile Docs. 165 and 168 and all attachments/exhibits not under seal within 7 days from entry of this Order. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to unseal Docs. #140 , #148 and #151 . The Clerk's Office is further DIRECTED to STRIKE Docs. 165 and 168. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/8/2020. (mah)
September 4, 2020 Filing 212 MOTION in Limine by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deborah Jay Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Zagal Dep Excerpt, #3 Exhibit 3 - Clark Dep Excerpt, #4 Exhibit 4 - Kiang Dep Excerpt, #5 Exhibit 5 - Zagal Expert Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - Alexander Dep Excerpt, #7 Exhibit 7 - WWE Rog Responses, #8 Exhibit 8 - Clark Report Exhibit A - CV)(Cendali, Dale)
September 4, 2020 Filing 211 STIPULATION relating to Evidence, Argument and Testimony by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
September 4, 2020 Filing 210 MOTION in Limine by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion for Order to Conduct Final Pretrial Conference Remotely (Doc. #206 ): The final pretrial conference is set for September 28, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. via video conference before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Information regarding the video conference will be sent by email to all parties. Full access to this hearing is available remotely. Instructions for non-participants to join the hearing are as follows: Call toll free 877-873-8017, when prompted enter Access Code 4354777. In light of the public health crisis due to the COVID-19 virus, the Court finds that full access to the press and public cannot be afforded for this hearing. Other alternatives to closure were considered, but at this time the Court only has the technological capability to allow access by teleconference. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/31/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 27, 2020 Filing 208 MOTION to Seal Document #207 MOTION to Supplement Summary Judgment Evidence with Recent Deposition Transcript of Defendant WWE by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
August 27, 2020 Filing 207 MOTION to Supplement Summary Judgment Evidence with Recent Deposition Transcript of Defendant WWE by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
August 26, 2020 Filing 206 Joint MOTION for Order to Conduct Final Pretrial Conference Remotely by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
July 29, 2020 Filing 205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Staci M. Yandle: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/29/2020. Counsel for plaintiff and defendants appear via telephone. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 9/28/2020 at 1:30 PM and Jury Trial RESET for 10/19/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. (Court Reporter Chris LaBuwi.) (slh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER - This matter is set for a Telephonic Motion Hearing on July 29, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. regarding Defendants' Motion to Continue Trial Date (Doc. #197 ). The instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: All parties should call toll free 877-873-8017 and enter the access code 4354777. Then when prompted, enter security code 0729. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/23/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 22, 2020 Filing 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Staci M. Yandle: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2020. Counsel for plaintiff and defendants appear via telephone. For reasons stated on the record, the Court in part GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Continue Trial (Doc. #197 ). Order to issue with new dates for final pretrial conference and jury trial. (Court Reporter Chris LaBuwi.) (slh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER DENYING Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #172 ): The Court finds no exceptional circumstances to justify the filing of a reply. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/22/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING Motion Unopposed Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant World Wrestling Entertainment Inc. (Doc. #199 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/21/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 20, 2020 Filing 200 RESPONSE to Motion re #197 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
July 14, 2020 Filing 199 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant World Wrestling Entertainment Inc. by Catherine Alexander. (Friedman, Anthony)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER - This matter is set for a Telephonic Motion Hearing on July 22, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. regarding Defendants' Motion to Continue Trial Date (Doc. #197 ). The instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: All parties should call toll free 877-873-8017 and enter the access code 4354777. Then when prompted, enter security code 0722. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/6/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 6, 2020 Filing 197 MOTION to Continue Trial Date by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Cendali, Dale)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING in PART Defendants' Motion for Clarification of Orders Pertaining to Trial Date and for Extension of Related Deadlines (Doc. #195 ): Administrative Order No. 261 did not extend the final pretrial conference or trial date in this case. Final pretrial conference remains set for September 16, 2020, and trial remains set for September 28, 2020. Defendants will need to file a motion if they seek a continuance of the current trial setting. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/29/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 17, 2020 Filing 195 MOTION to Clarify Orders Pertaining to Trial Date and Extension of Related Deadlines by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Cendali, Dale)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Doc. #193 ). Attorney Benjamin R. Askew terminated. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/20/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2020 Filing 193 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Benjamin R. Askew by Catherine Alexander. (Askew, Benjamin)
May 19, 2020 Filing 192 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2020 regarding #178 Motion to Compel. Attorneys Anthony Friedman and Anthony Simon appear on behalf of Plaintiff Catherine Alexander. Attorneys Joshua Simmons and Michael Nester appear on behalf of Defendants, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.; 2K Games, Inc.; 2K Sports Inc.; Visual Concepts Entertainment. Attorney Michael Nester appears on behalf of all Defendants. After reviewing the pleadings and considering the arguments of the parties, the Motion to Compel #178 is GRANTED. The Court provides detailed analysis on the record regarding its ruling on the motion to compel. For further details and analysis, the parties should consult the official Court transcript. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to case. (Court Reporter Karen Waugh.) (jmj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2020 Filing 191 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #178 MOTION to Compel Take-Two Defendants to Pay Plaintiff's Expert Ryan Clark's Reasonable Fees For Time Spent Responding to Discovery : Telephonic Motion Hearing for the Court to advise of its ruling from the 5/13/2020 hearing is set for 5/19/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 1-877-336-1829; (2) when prompted, enter the Access Code: 4442281; (3) followed by the Security Code: 0966.(jmj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 13, 2020 Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2020 regarding #178 Motion to Compel. Attorneys Anthony Friedman and Anthony Simon appears on behalf of Plaintiff Catherine Alexander. Attorneys Joshua Simmons and Michael Nester appears on behalf of Defendants, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.; 2K Games, Inc.; 2K Sports Inc.; Visual Concepts Entertainment. Attorney Michael Nester appears on behalf of all Defendants. The Court entertains oral argument on the motion to compel. After reviewing the pleadings and considering the arguments of the parties, the Motion to Compel #178 is taken under advisement. The Court will either schedule a hearing in short order to provide an oral ruling on the record or draft a short written order. (Court Reporter Karen Waugh.) (jmj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #178 MOTION to Compel Take-Two Defendants to Pay Plaintiff's Expert Ryan Clark's Reasonable Fees For Time Spent Responding to Discovery: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Counsel may participate via telephone conference. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 877-336-1829; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 4442281; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0966.Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/6/2020. (jmj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 1, 2020 Filing 188 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc..(Cendali, Dale)
May 1, 2020 Filing 187 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #178 MOTION to Compel Take-Two Defendants to Pay Plaintiff's Expert Ryan Clark's Reasonable Fees For Time Spent Responding to Discovery filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Cendali, Dale)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER DENYING Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Notice of Supplemental Authority (Doc. #184 ): The Court finds no exceptional circumstances to justify the filing of a reply. Accordingly, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/22/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER: Pursuant to Amended Administrative Order No. 261 entered on March 21, 2020 and Second Amended Administrative Order No. 261 entered on April 1, 2020, both of which were drafted in response to the COVID-19 outbreak, the undersigned has the discretion to extend, shorten, or revoke the extensions provided for in the Administrative Orders. The Court finds it appropriate to exercise his discretion here and shorten the deadline so as to move this discovery dispute along. Accordingly, Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion to compel #178 is due on or before May 1, 2020. Once the discovery dispute is briefed, the undersigned will set a hearing. In the meantime, the undersigned encourages both parties to consult his case management procedures for meeting and conferring to resolve a discovery dispute. In short, a good faith effort to resolve a discovery dispute requires more than an exchange of letters or e-mails. The undersigned encourages the parties to attempt to resolve this discovery dispute through a telephone call or a videoconference meeting prior to any hearing with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 4/21/2020. (jmj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 20, 2020 Filing 184 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Notice of Supplemental Authority by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply in Support of Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Cendali, Dale)
April 20, 2020 Filing 183 RESPONSE to #182 Notice (Other) re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Expert Fees filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Cendali, Dale)
April 20, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE by Catherine Alexander re #178 MOTION to Compel Take-Two Defendants to Pay Plaintiff's Expert Ryan Clark's Reasonable Fees For Time Spent Responding to Discovery (Simon, Anthony)
April 17, 2020 Filing 181 RESPONSE to #180 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Authority filed by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
March 27, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary Judgment Order)(Cendali, Dale)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Motion to Compel Take-Two Defendants to Pay Plaintiff's Expert Ryan Clark's Reasonable Fees For Time Spent Responding to Discovery filed by Catherine Alexander (Doc. #178 ) referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/27/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 27, 2020 Filing 178 MOTION to Compel Take-Two Defendants to Pay Plaintiff's Expert Ryan Clark's Reasonable Fees For Time Spent Responding to Discovery by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Friedman, Anthony)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Continue Trial Date filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., Yuke's LA Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd. (Doc. #175 ): Final pre-trial conference is RESET for September 16, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. and jury trial is RESET for September 28, 2020, in the Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/23/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER: Defendants Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., 2K Games, Inc.,2K Sports Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., and Yukes LA, Inc. Motion to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) and FRCP 12(b)(6) (Doc. #89 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Yuke's Co., Ltd. and Yukes LA, Inc. are DISMISSED for lack of personal jurisdiction and Plaintiff's copyright claim as to the Bible tattoo is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to obtain a certificate of registration. The remainder of the Motion is DENIED. Defendant World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.'s Motion under FRCP 12(b)(2) (Doc. #91 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 3/18/2020. (mah)
March 10, 2020 Filing 175 MOTION to Continue Trial Date by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Cendali, Dale)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time and Motion for Leave to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts Out of Time filed by Catherine Alexander (Docs. #166 , #153 ). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/31/2020. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 13, 2019 Filing 173 RESPONSE to Motion re #166 MOTION for Leave to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts Out of Time filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
December 12, 2019 Filing 172 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Cendali, Dale)
December 10, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #169 Motion to Seal Document, filed by Catherine Alexander. Proposed documents are not to be filed on the docket but rather emailed to the appropriate Judge. The proposed documents have been deleted from the docket. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 9, 2019 Filing 170 RESPONSE to Motion re #139 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Cendali, Dale)
December 9, 2019 Filing 169 MOTION to Seal Document #165 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #168 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: # 1 Dkt 165, # 2 Dkt 165-4, # 3 Dkt 168, # 4 Dkt 168-1, # 5 Dkt 168-2, # 6 Dkt 168-3, # 7 Dkt 168-4)(Simon, Anthony)
December 9, 2019 Filing 168 STRICKEN MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #145 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Ryan Clark filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - To Be Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - To Be Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - To Be Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - o Be Filed Under Seal)(Simon, Anthony) Modified on 9/9/2020 (ack).
December 9, 2019 Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #143 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Jose Zagal filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Simon, Anthony)
December 9, 2019 Filing 166 MOTION for Leave to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts Out of Time by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
December 9, 2019 Filing 165 STRICKEN MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - To Be Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Simon, Anthony) Modified on 9/9/2020 (ack).
December 2, 2019 Filing 164 RESPONSE to Motion re #153 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #143 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Jose Zagal, #145 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Ryan Clark filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
November 27, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE: A party to this action has declined to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Accordingly, pursuant to Administrative Order 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 19-966-SMY. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 26, 2019 Filing 162 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Krasik, Curtis)
November 26, 2019 Filing 161 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Cendali, Dale)
November 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #153 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #143 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Jose Zagal, #145 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Ryan Clark . Responses due by 12/2/2019 (lmb)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: If Defendants wish to respond or otherwise object to #153 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, such response is due on or before December 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 11/25/2019. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 21, 2019 Filing 159 RESPONSE to Motion re #156 MOTION for Joinder in Take-Two Motion to Stay Pre-Trial Proceedings (Doc. No. 155), #155 MOTION to Stay Pre-Trial Proceedings filed by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
November 21, 2019 Filing 158 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #155 MOTION to Stay Pre-Trial Proceedings filed by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
November 21, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE by Catherine Alexander re #153 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #143 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Jose Zagal, #145 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Ryan Clark Plaintiff's Modification of Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Designate it Unopposed (Simon, Anthony)
November 21, 2019 Filing 156 MOTION for Joinder in Take-Two Motion to Stay Pre-Trial Proceedings (Doc. No. 155) by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Krasik, Curtis)
November 20, 2019 Filing 155 MOTION to Stay Pre-Trial Proceedings by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
November 20, 2019 Filing 154 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Simon, Anthony)
November 20, 2019 Filing 153 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #143 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Jose Zagal, #145 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Ryan Clark by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/20/2019. (mar)
November 12, 2019 Filing 151 Sealed Document re #140 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, by Catherine Alexander. (Friedman, Anthony)
November 12, 2019 Filing 150 MOTION to Seal Document #140 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, by Catherine Alexander. (Friedman, Anthony)
November 8, 2019 Filing 149 MOTION for Joinder in #141 Motion for Summary Judgment by Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
November 8, 2019 Filing 148 Sealed Document re #146 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #142 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, #144 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 142-14, Ex. 7, App. A, #2 Dkt 142-15, Ex. 7, App. B, #3 Dkt 142-20, Ex. 12, #4 Dkt 142-22, Ex. 14, #5 Dkt 142-23, Ex. 15, #6 Dkt 144-3, Ex. 3, #7 Dkt 146-1, Ex. 1, #8 Dkt 146-2, Ex. 2)(Cendali, Dale)
November 8, 2019 Filing 147 MOTION to Seal Document #142 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, #146 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #144 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Exhibits to Memorandums by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Cendali, Dale)
November 8, 2019 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM in Support re #145 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Ryan Clark filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Clark Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Clark Rebuttal Report)(Cendali, Dale)
November 8, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Ryan Clark by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Cendali, Dale)
November 8, 2019 Filing 144 MEMORANDUM in Support re #143 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Jose Zagal filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Zagal Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Zagal Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Zagal Supplemental Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Zagal Responding Report)(Cendali, Dale)
November 8, 2019 Filing 143 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Jose Zagal by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Cendali, Dale)
November 8, 2019 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM in Support re #141 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Little Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, Appendix A - WWE 2K16 Gameplay, #3 Exhibit 1, Appendix B - WWE 2K17 Gameplay, #4 Exhibit 1, Appendix C - WWE 2K18 Gameplay, #5 Exhibit 2 - Orton Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 - Glatstein Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 - Bogost Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 - Jablonski Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 - Jay Declaration, #10 Exhibit 6, Appendix A - Jay Report Part 1, #11 Exhibit 6, Appendix A - Jay Report Part 2, #12 Exhibit 6, Appendix A - Jay Report Part 3, #13 Exhibit 7 - Malackowski Declaration, #14 Exhibit 7, Appendix A - Malackowski Report, #15 Exhibit 7, Appendix B - Malackowski Rebuttal, #16 Exhibit 8 - Zagal Report, #17 Exhibit 9 Alexander Deposition Excerpts, #18 Exhibit 10 - Zagal Deposition Excerpts, #19 Exhibit 11 - Clark Deposition Excerpts, #20 Exhibit 12 - Little Deposition Excerpts, #21 Exhibit 13 - Alexander Discovery Responses, #22 Exhibit 14 - License Agreement, #23 Exhibit 15 - License Agreement Amendment, #24 Exhibit 16 - WWE 2K16 for XBox One, #25 Exhibit 17 - WWE 2K17 for XBox One, #26 Exhibit 18 - WWE 2K18 for XBox One, #27 Exhibit 19 - Dove Registration, #28 Exhibit 20 - Rose Registration, #29 Exhibit 21 - Skulls Registration, #30 Exhibit 22 - Tribal Addition Design Registration, #31 Exhibit 23 - Tribal Design Registration, #32 Exhibit 24 - Copyright Office Letter)(Cendali, Dale)
November 8, 2019 Filing 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. Responses due by 12/12/2019 (Cendali, Dale)
November 8, 2019 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM in Support re #139 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deft Take-Two Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Deft 2K Games Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, #3 Exhibit C - Deft 2K Sports Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, #4 Exhibit D - Deft Visual Concepts Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, #5 Exhibit E - Take-Two Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Admission, #6 Exhibit F - Expert Report and Declaration of I. Bogost, Ph.D., #7 Exhibit G - Exceprt of M. Little 8/14/19 Deposition Testimony)(Simon, Anthony)
November 8, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Catherine Alexander. Responses due by 12/12/2019 (Simon, Anthony)
November 8, 2019 Filing 138 MOTION for Joinder in the motion for summary judgment filed by Take-Two Defendants by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Krasik, Curtis)
October 11, 2019 Filing 137 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. Related document: #134 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Cendali, Dale)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Miranda D. Means. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2019 Filing 135 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Miranda D. Means $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3996710 by on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Means, Miranda)
September 11, 2019 Filing 134 Plaintiff's Second Set of REQUEST for Admissions to Defendants Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports, Inc. and Visual Concepts Entertainment by Catherine Alexander.(Friedman, Anthony)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #132 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Christopher Ilardi on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 6, 2019 Filing 132 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher Ilardi $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3970907 by on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Ilardi, Christopher)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER granting #126 Motion to Continue Trial Date. Discovery due by 10/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2019. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 5/20/2020 at 10:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Jury Trial reset for 6/1/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Absent extraordinary circumstances, further extensions will not be granted. The parties are reminded that they may stipulate amongst themselves as to extending any interim discovery deadlines, such as expert witness depositions, as long as it does not affect the current discovery and dispositive motions deadlines. If, after meeting and conferring, the parties cannot agree on an extension of an interim deadline, they may contact the court for a discovery dispute conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/22/2019. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DENYING #125 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow the Disclosure of Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/22/2019. (arf)
August 21, 2019 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2019. (cjo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Status Conference/Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2019. Attorney Anthony Friedman appears on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Dale Cendali, Michael Nester, and Joshua Simmons appear on behalf of Take-Two Interactive Software, 2K Games, 2K Sports, Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yikes Co., and Yuke's LA. Attorneys Curtis Krasik and Michael Nester appear on behalf of Defendant World Wrestling Entertainment. Plaintiff has no opposition to Defendants' motion to continue the trial setting. Oral arguments are presented on Plaintiff's motion to allow the disclosure of expert witnesses. The motion is taken under advisement. The parties agree to a dispositive motions deadline of 11/8/2019. The Court will enter a written order or set a follow-up status conference to discuss its decision and to discuss scheduling logistics. (Court Reporter: Liberty Recording.) (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 16, 2019 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #125 MOTION for Order toTO ALLOW THE DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cendali, Dale)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: If the parties intend to file responses to #125 MOTION for Order to Allow the Disclosure of Expert and #126 MOTION to Continue Presumptive Trial Date, such responses are due on or before August 16, 2019. The undersigned intends to discuss the issues presented in these motions at the status conference scheduled for August 20, 2019, at 3:00PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/12/2019. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 9, 2019 Filing 126 MOTION to Continue Presumptive Trial Date by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 30 2019 Email from Take-Two, #2 Exhibit B - June 19 2019 Email from C. Roseman, #3 Exhibit C - August 2019 Email Chain re Schedule)(Cendali, Dale)
August 9, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION for Order toTO ALLOW THE DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT by Catherine Alexander. (Friedman, Anthony)
May 21, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Hearing: On the Court's own motion, the Telephonic Status Conference is RESET for 8/20/2019 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 1834. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING #78 Motion to Stay. Merits-based discovery is STAYED as to Defendants World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., Yukes Co., Ltd., and Yukes LA, Inc. pending resolution of their motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Docs. 89, 91). In light of this ruling, #100 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel discovery responses from these Defendants is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/20/2019. (klh2)
April 26, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 2:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 1834. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying #103 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Amended Scheduling Order. Based on the new trial setting (Doc. 119 ) and for the reasons discussed during the status conference held on 4/25/2019, the parties are directed to submit an amended proposed scheduling order to MABpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 4/26/2019. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 25, 2019 Filing 120 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/25/2019. Attorney Anthony Simon appears on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Dale Cendali, Michael Nester, and Joshua Simmons appear on behalf of Take-Two Interactive Software, 2K Games, 2K Sports, Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yikes Co., and Yuke's LA. Attorneys Curtis Krasik and Michael Nester appear on behalf of Defendant World Wrestling Entertainment. The parties are in agreement that if the motion to stay (Doc. #78 ) is granted, the motion to compel (Doc. #100 ) can be denied as moot. Based on the new trial setting, the Court will deny the motion to amend (Doc. #103 ). The parties are directed to submit an amended proposed scheduling order to the Court's proposed documents inbox in light of the new trial setting. A status conference will be set by further order of the Court. (Court Reporter: proceedings not recorded.)(arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion to Continue Presumptive Trial Date (Doc. #117 ): This matter is VACATED from the final pretrial conference setting of May 1, 2019, and jury trial setting of May 13, 2019. Final pretrial conference is RESET for April 15, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. and jury trial is RESET for April 27, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. in the Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/17/2019. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 15, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #117 Motion to Continue, filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's LA Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd.. Proposed order was attached to the main document. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via e-mail to the Court (see CM/ECF Users Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). Proposed order to be deleted in accordance with this Courts practices. Proposed documents need to be e-mailed to the proper judge. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 12, 2019 Filing 117 Joint MOTION to Continue Presumptive Trial Date by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cendali, Dale)
April 8, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 3:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 8429. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: Due to the recent reassignment of this case to Judge Staci M. Yandle, the Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 5/1/2019 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle and Jury Trial is reset for 5/13/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/4/2019. (slh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 1, 2019 Filing 114 Case Reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle. Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan no longer assigned to the case. (dkd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Settlement Conference: Having reviewed the settlement statements of the parties, the Court has determined a settlement conference in this matter would be futile. The settlement conference scheduled for Tuesday, March 26, 2019 is CANCELLED. (jmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2019 Filing 112 RESPONSE to #97 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Supplemental Response In Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Registration - Tribal Design Tattoo, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Registration - Dove, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Registration - Rose Tattoo, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Registration - Skulls Tattoo, #5 Exhibit E - Certificate of Registration - Tribal Addition Design Tattoo, #6 Exhibit F - 2/25/19 Correspondence from Copyright Office re Refusal of Bible Verse Tattoo, #7 Exhibit G - Fourth EstatePublic Benefit corp. v. Wall-Street.com, LLC, et al.)(Simon, Anthony)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING #98 Joint MOTION for Protective Order . The parties have conferred and agreed upon the terms of the Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 1/22/2019. (jer)
January 14, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE of Hearing: Due to scheduling conflicts amongst the parties, Settlement Conference is RESET for 3/26/2019 at 1:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 8, 2019 Filing 109 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson no longer assigned to the case. (lmb)
January 7, 2019 Filing 108 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Catherine Alexander. Related document: #104 Request for Admissions filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment.(Simon, Anthony)
December 28, 2018 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #100 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc. and World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. filed by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: Notwithstanding the notice filed on 12/3/18, the #100 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc. and World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. is hereby TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. The Court finds it convenient to consider the discovery dispute through motion practice. Responses due by 12/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/19/2018. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE is hereby set before Chief Judge Reagan at 1:00 p.m. on March 7, 2019. Lead counsel and the parties must attend in person. (A named individual defendant need not attend if covered by liability insurance. However, in that instance, an insurance representative with full authority to negotiate and settle the case must be present.) A proper defendant representative will be a person who can agree to any sum demanded by the plaintiff, without resort to the telephone. Settlement statements are not filed with the Clerk's Office. Rather, the parties should send their settlement statements to Judge Reagan's proposed document email inbox: MJRpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Settlement statements should be mailed to this address no later than five business days before the settlement conference date. Click on #Settlement Statement of Attorney for a copy of the form to be used in submitting settlement statements. Judge Reagan's imminent retirement from the bench (Friday, March 29, 2019 is his last day in chambers/court) and limited docket availability prior to that date renders it extremely unlikely that a motion to continue the settlement conference can be granted. This NOTICE CANCELS the settlement conference previously set in this case before Magistrate Judge Wilkerson on April 16, 2019 (see Doc. #55 ). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 12/12/2018. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 7, 2018 Filing 104 Second REQUEST for Admissions to Plaintiff Catherine Alexander by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment.(Cendali, Dale)
December 5, 2018 Filing 103 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #54 Scheduling Order by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Cendali, Dale)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER MOOTING #96 Motion for Protective Order per #99 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 12/5/2018. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 3, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE by Catherine Alexander re #100 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc. and World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses (Simon, Anthony)
November 30, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc. and World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Simon, Anthony)
November 28, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment re #96 MOTION for Protective Order Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order (Cendali, Dale)
November 28, 2018 Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Cendali, Dale)
November 21, 2018 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Complaint, #89 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tribal Addition-Back, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bible Verse, #3 Exhibit 3 - Dove, #4 Exhibit 4 - Rose, #5 Exhibit 5 - Skull Sleeve-Arm, #6 Exhibit 6 - Tribal-Arm)(Simon, Anthony)
November 15, 2018 Filing 96 MOTION for Protective Order by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B- Email re Proposed Protective Order)(Cendali, Dale)
November 5, 2018 Filing 95 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Catherine Alexander. Related document: #77 Request for Admissions filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment.(Simon, Anthony)
October 25, 2018 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #78 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: In light of the amended complaint filed October 2, 2018, the motions to dismiss directed at the original complaint (Docs. #49 , #51 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 10/24/2018. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 23, 2018 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Support re #91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Complaint filed by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Edward M. Kiang)(Krasik, Curtis)
October 23, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Complaint by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. Responses due by 11/29/2018 (Krasik, Curtis)
October 23, 2018 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM in Support re #89 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
October 23, 2018 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. Responses due by 11/29/2018 (Cendali, Dale)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER, GRANTING #80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #76 Amended Complaint filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., Yuke's LA Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd. 2K Games, Inc. answer due 10/23/2018; 2K Sports Inc. answer due 10/23/2018; Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. answer due 10/23/2018; Visual Concepts Entertainment answer due 10/23/2018; World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. answer due 10/23/2018; Yuke's Co., Ltd. answer due 10/23/2018; Yuke's LA Inc. answer due 10/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/16/2018. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 15, 2018 Filing 87 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Yuke's LA Inc.. Related document: #72 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Cendali, Dale)
October 15, 2018 Filing 86 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Yuke's Co., Ltd.. Related document: #71 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Cendali, Dale)
October 15, 2018 Filing 85 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Visual Concepts Entertainment. Related document: #69 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Cendali, Dale)
October 15, 2018 Filing 84 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by 2K Sports Inc.. Related document: #68 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Cendali, Dale)
October 15, 2018 Filing 83 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by 2K Games, Inc.. Related document: #67 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Cendali, Dale)
October 15, 2018 Filing 82 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. Related document: #66 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Cendali, Dale)
October 15, 2018 Filing 81 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. Related document: #70 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Krasik, Curtis)
October 12, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #76 Amended Complaint by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Nester, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM in Support re #78 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Krasik, Curtis)
October 11, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION to Stay Discovery by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Krasik, Curtis)
October 5, 2018 Filing 77 First REQUEST for Admissions to Catherine Alexander by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment.(Cendali, Dale)
October 2, 2018 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
October 2, 2018 Amended Complaint due by 10/3/2018. (cjo)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING #65 Motion for Leave to File. No objection having been filed, Plaintiff to file amended complaint by 10/3/18. Defendants to respond consistent with the Federal Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/1/2018. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 18, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #73 Response to Motion. Docket text modified to include filer World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 17, 2018 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re #65 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc., and World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale) Modified on 9/18/2018 (cjo).
September 14, 2018 Filing 72 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander's REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant Yuke's LA, Inc. by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Filing 71 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant Yuke's Co., Ltd. by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Filing 70 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant World Wrestling Entertainment by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Filing 69 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant Visual Concepts Entertainment by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Filing 68 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander's REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant 2K Sports Inc. by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Filing 67 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander's REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant 2K Games Inc. by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
September 14, 2018 Filing 66 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander's REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
September 5, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Catherine Alexander. (Simon, Anthony)
August 21, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #58 Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission filed by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. Response was filed before the Request for Admissions were filed. Clerk's office to modify the docket text to include the relationship to document #59. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 17, 2018 Filing 63 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Yuke's Co., Ltd.. Related document: #61 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Cendali, Dale)
August 17, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE/ANSWER TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS by Yuke's LA Inc.. Related document: #60 Request for Admissions filed by Catherine Alexander.(Cendali, Dale)
August 17, 2018 Filing 61 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander's First Set of REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant Yuke's Co., Ltd. by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
August 17, 2018 Filing 60 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander's First Set of REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant Yuke's LA Inc. by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
August 17, 2018 Filing 59 Plaintiff Catherine Alexander's First Set of REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. by Catherine Alexander.(Simon, Anthony)
August 17, 2018 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission filed by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (related document #59 REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. by Catherine Alexander). (Krasik, Curtis) Modified on 8/21/2018 (cjo).
August 8, 2018 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Tribal addition - back, #2 Exhibit 2. Bible verse, #3 Exhibit 3. Dove, #4 Exhibit 4. Rose, #5 Exhibit 5. Skull sleeve - arm, #6 Exhibit 6. Tribal - arm)(Simon, Anthony)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/3/2018. (jmp)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson.(jmp)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/3/2018. (jmp)
July 12, 2018 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/12/2018. Attorneys Simon, Cendali, Nester, Simmons, and Krasik for their respective client. Parties to submit an amended JROP by July 16, 2018. Parties shall indicate a deadline for personal jurisdiction discovery which shall take priority over merits discovery. If any party seeks to stay any portion of discovery, they shall file a motion. (Court Reporter n/a.) (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 9, 2018 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Support re #51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Edward M. Kiang)(Krasik, Curtis)
July 9, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. Responses due by 8/13/2018 (Krasik, Curtis)
July 9, 2018 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Support re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
July 9, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. Responses due by 8/13/2018 (Cendali, Dale)
July 6, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nester on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc. (Nester, Michael)
June 18, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE TO COUNSEL:Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 7/12/2018 at 2:15 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (jmp)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or to otherwise respond filed by Yuke's LA Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd. Yuke's Co., Ltd. answer due 7/9/2018; Yuke's LA Inc. answer due 7/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 6/8/2018. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 30, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or to otherwise respond by Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
May 30, 2018 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
May 30, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Simmons on behalf of Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc. (Simmons, Joshua)
May 30, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale M. Cendali on behalf of Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc. (Cendali, Dale)
May 25, 2018 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Alexander. Yuke's LA Inc. served on 5/22/2018, answer due 6/12/2018. (Simon, Anthony)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #36 Motion for Substitution of Service upon Defendant Yuke's LA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/22/2018. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2018 Filing 39 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. Jury Trial set for 5/13/2019 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(rah)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or to otherwise respond filed by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. answer due 7/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/14/2018. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or to otherwise respond by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Krasik, Curtis)
May 10, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution of Service on Yuke's LA, Inc. by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Simon, Anthony)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or to otherwise respond filed by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. 2K Games, Inc. answer due 7/9/2018; 2K Sports Inc. answer due 7/9/2018; Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. answer due 7/9/2018; Visual Concepts Entertainment answer due 7/9/2018. Counsel will note that the extension of time has not been granted as to World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. If that Defendant requires additional time to answer, its attorneys (who entered an appearance after the motion was filed) may file a motion, which will be deemed timely, by May 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/10/2018. (sgp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Jerry S. McDevitt on behalf of World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Curtis B. Krasik on behalf of World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 10, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry S. McDevitt on behalf of World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (McDevitt, Jerry)
May 10, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis B. Krasik on behalf of World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Krasik, Curtis)
May 10, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission by Attorney Jerry S. McDevitt $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3559276 by on behalf of World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (McDevitt, Jerry)
May 10, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission by Attorney Curtis B. Krasik $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3559247 by on behalf of World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Krasik, Curtis)
May 9, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Simmons on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Simmons, Joshua)
May 9, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale M. Cendali on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment (Cendali, Dale)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Joshua Simmons on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Dale Cendali on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 9, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or to otherwise respond by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
May 9, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
May 9, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua L. Simmons $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3558853 by on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Simmons, Joshua)
May 9, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dale M. Cendali $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3558842 by on behalf of 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment. (Cendali, Dale)
April 25, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Alexander. Visual Concepts Entertainment served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. (Simon, Anthony)
April 19, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Alexander. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. (Simon, Anthony)
April 19, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Alexander. 2K Sports Inc. served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. (Simon, Anthony)
April 19, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Alexander. 2K Games, Inc. served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. (Simon, Anthony)
April 19, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Alexander. World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/10/2018. (Simon, Anthony)
April 18, 2018 Filing 15 AO121 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed, including copy of Complaint, to Register of Copyrights this date. (cjo)
April 18, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to 2K Games, Inc., 2K Sports Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Visual Concepts Entertainment, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc., Yuke's Co., Ltd., Yuke's LA Inc.. (cjo)
April 18, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-966-MJR-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (cjo)
April 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Seth Crompton on behalf of Catherine Alexander (Crompton, R.)
April 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony R. Friedman on behalf of Catherine Alexander (Friedman, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin R. Askew on behalf of Catherine Alexander (Askew, Benjamin)
April 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony G. Simon on behalf of Catherine Alexander (Simon, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Simon, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Simon, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Simon, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Simon, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Requested. (Simon, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Requested. (Simon, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested. (Simon, Anthony)
April 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3538750.), filed by Catherine Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simon, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Christopher Ilardi
Represented By: Joshua L. Simmons
Represented By: Miranda D. Means
Represented By: Patrick K. Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuke's LA Inc.
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Joshua L. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuke's Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Joshua L. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visual Concepts Entertainment
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Christopher Ilardi
Represented By: Joshua L. Simmons
Represented By: Miranda D. Means
Represented By: Patrick K. Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2K Sports Inc.
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Christopher Ilardi
Represented By: Joshua L. Simmons
Represented By: Miranda D. Means
Represented By: Patrick K. Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2K Games, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Michael J. Nester
Represented By: Christopher Ilardi
Represented By: Joshua L. Simmons
Represented By: Miranda D. Means
Represented By: Patrick K. Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Alexander
Represented By: R. Seth Crompton
Represented By: Anthony R. Friedman
Represented By: Benjamin R. Askew
Represented By: Paul Joseph Tahan
Represented By: Anthony G. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?