Parks v. Coe et al
Plaintiff: |
Damon B. Parks |
Defendant: |
John Coe, Elizabeth Blanchard, John Allen, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Toby Rice and Mr. Brooks |
Case Number: |
3:2018cv01300 |
Filed: |
June 20, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois |
Office: |
East St. Louis Office |
County: |
Fulton |
Presiding Judge: |
David R. Herndon |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 10, 2021 |
Filing
104
ORDER. The motion for extension of time to appeal (Doc. 87 ) is GRANTED in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(5)(C); the Notice of Appeal filed on October 2, 2020 is deemed timely. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/10/2021. (ksp)
|
December 14, 2020 |
Filing
96
ORDER re 87 Notice of Appeal and 88 Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis ("IFP"). Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP on appeal is DENIED. Plaintiff shall tender the appellate filing and d ocketing fee of $505.00 to the Clerk of Court in this District on or before January 13, 2021. Alternatively, he may reapply to the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal within 30 days. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/14/2020. (ksp)
|
August 26, 2020 |
Filing
85
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff Damon Parks' objections are OVERRULED. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation (Doc. 75 ) in its entirety and GRANTS Defendants' motions for summary judgment (Docs. 50 , 57 ). A ccordingly, all claims are DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies prior to filing suit. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to correct Defendant Brooks's name to Randall Brooks in accordance with footnote 1 and the case caption, enter judgment in accordance with this Order, and close this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/26/2020. (ksp)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
13
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/13/2018. (tjk)
|
June 29, 2018 |
Filing
6
ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. 2), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the i nmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS T HEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 12/1/ 2017 to 6/20/2018 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 105 1 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer, Illinois River Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 8/13/2018). Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 6/29/2018. (jaj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?