Lough v. Pike
Plaintiff: Jimmie Lough
Defendant: Rita Pike and Rita Juanita Mock-Pike
Case Number: 3:2018cv01384
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Make More Definite filed by Jimmie Lough. (trb)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES: Telephone Scheduling/Discovery Conference set for 9/26/2018 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. (jmp)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/17/2019 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Bench Trial is set for 7/29/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
July 18, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Nagel, Matthew)
July 18, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Make More Definite by Rita Juanita Mock-Pike. Responses due by 8/20/2018 (Nagel, Matthew)
July 18, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Rita Juanita Mock-Pike. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit State Court 1st Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit Defendant's State Court Answer, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit State Court's Order, #7 Exhibit State Court 2nd Amended Complaint)(Nagel, Matthew)
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 EXHIBIT (Civil Cover Sheet)by Rita Juanita Mock-Pike. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Nagel, Matthew)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (dmw2)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 7/30/2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/16/2018. (dmw2)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1384-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (dmw2)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Nagel on behalf of Rita Pike (Nagel, Matthew)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Monroe County, Illinois, case number 17-SC-165 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3615024), filed by Rita Pike. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint)(Nagel, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lough v. Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Lough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Pike
Represented By: Matthew T. Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Juanita Mock-Pike
Represented By: Matthew T. Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?