Wilson v. Santos et al
Plaintiff: Larry Wilson
Defendant: Lana Nalewajka, Nurse Harrell, Tammy L. Tyler, Vipin Shah, Nurse Shoemaker, Venerio Santos, Wexford Health Sources Inc., Nurse Beverly, Jane Doe and Jon Fatheree
Case Number: 3:2018cv01483
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nurse Shoemaker waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj)
October 5, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Venerio Santos waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj)
October 5, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Jon Fatheree waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj)
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Nurse Beverly waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (jaj)
October 4, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Lana Nalewajka waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (tjk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Wexford Health Sources Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (tjk)
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Wexford Health Sources, Inc. on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tammy L. Tyler on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nurse Shoemaker on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Vipin Shah on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Venerio Santos on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lana Nalewajki on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nurse Harrell on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jon Fatheree on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nurse Beverly on 10/2/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2018. (jaj)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/1/2018. (tjk)
August 29, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 34625086527 (cds)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ). A federal court may permit an indigent party to proceed without pre-payment of fees. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The Court is not satisfied from Wilson's affidavit that he is indigent. Plaintiff's monthly income as of the date of filing is $732.91 (Doc. #4 ). Plaintiff lists no other monthly expenses, and his average monthly balance ranges from over $600 to over $900 during the six month period immediately preceding the filing of this case. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ). Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee no later than September 21, 2018. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/22/2018. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Wilson. (jaj)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from USDC/SDIL to Plaintiff informing him of case number and filing fee requirements. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed IFP, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (jaj)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry Wilson. (jaj)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Larry Wilson.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Santos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lana Nalewajka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy L. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vipin Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venerio Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Fatheree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?