Klug et al v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Klug and Fred D. Klug
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01509
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 18 Acknowledgment from Washington County Circuit Court. (cjo)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 Letter to Washington County Circuit Clerk re #16 Order of Remand (lmb)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND: Case remanded to Washington County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/18/2018. (jdh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #14 Jurisdictional Memorandum filed by Fred D. Klug and Kathleen A. Klug. The Memorandum does not include the appropriate electronic signature. For future filings, refer to Electronic Filing Rule 8 in the User's Manual Section 2.0 (Retention & Signature Requirements). NO action is necessary as this notice is for informational purposes only. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 JURISDICTIONAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs. Plaintiff's Brief on the Issue of Removal. (Liefer, Lucas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by CMH Homes, Inc.. pursuant to the Court's Order of 8/21/18 - Doc. 8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leritz, Christopher)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Declaratory Judgment filed by CMH Homes, Inc.. (Leritz, Christopher)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Declaratory Judgment by CMH Homes, Inc.. Responses due by 9/27/2018 (Leritz, Christopher)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by CMH Homes, Inc..(Leritz, Christopher)
August 24, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant CMH Homes, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CMH Homes, Inc..(Leritz, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, re: jurisdiction. The Court ORDERS CMH Homes to file a supplemental brief on this issue by September 5, 2018. The plaintffs' response, if any, will be due by September 19, 2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/21/2018. (jdh)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by CMH Homes, Inc.. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Jury Demand)(Leritz, Christopher)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 8/31/2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/17/2018. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1509-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdb)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 EXHIBIT by CMH Homes, Inc.. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal - Civil Cover Sheet. (Leritz, Christopher)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMH Homes, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clayton Homes, Inc., Corporate Parent CMH Homes, Inc. for CMH Homes, Inc.. (Leritz, Christopher)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Leritz on behalf of CMH Homes, Inc. (Leritz, Christopher)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 18-CH-19 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3646736), filed by CMH Homes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Exhibit A)(Leritz, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klug et al v. CMH Homes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Klug
Represented By: Lucas H. Liefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred D. Klug
Represented By: Lucas H. Liefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher P. Leritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?