Ripper v. Leisure Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ripper and David Ripper
Defendant: Leisure Properties, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01719
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Michael J Reagan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. (Stoddard, Mitchell)
October 31, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell B. Stoddard on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stoddard, Mitchell)
October 15, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Leisure Properties, LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Craft-Schrick, Laura)
October 15, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leisure Properties, LLC. (Craft-Schrick, Laura)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery to be completed by 6/7/2019. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(jlm)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the Scheduling and Discovery Conference presently set for 10/12/2018 is CANCELED. The Joint Report of Parties is approved and will be entered. Status Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 9:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 10/12/2018. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dani Liblang on behalf of David and Kimberly Ripper. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dani K. Liblang $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3686208 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Liblang, Dani)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading filed by Leisure Properties, LLC. Defendant Leisure Properties, LLC is GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 10/15/2018, to file a Responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 9/25/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 9/25/2018. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 25, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 10/12/2018 at 11:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call.(jlm)
September 24, 2018 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Leisure Properties, LLC. (Craft-Schrick, Laura)
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. Bench Trial set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(rah)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Leisure Properties, LLC. Attorney Nicholas J. Ranke terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 9/17/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Leisure Properties, LLC. (Schuver, Mark)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E. Craft-Schrick on behalf of Leisure Properties, LLC (Craft-Schrick, Laura)
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Schuver on behalf of Leisure Properties, LLC (Schuver, Mark)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 Letter to Attorneys of Record regarding case opening. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (cjo)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 3:18-cv-11773. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER. Case TRANSFERRED to Southern District of Illinois. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to Response re #3 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Leisure Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Ranke, Nicholas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING on #3 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion Hearing RE-set for 9/19/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland(LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 RE-NOTICE OF HEARING on #3 MOTION to Change Venue . Reply due by 7/18/2018 Motion Hearing reset for 8/1/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag)[Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Change Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Liblang, Dani) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING on #3 MOTION to Change Venue Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2018 02:30 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
June 12, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 7/9/18 is Cancelled pending resolution of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Change Venue by Leisure Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Ranke, Nicholas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
June 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2018 04:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Leisure Properties, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 18-004717-NZ. Receipt No: 0645-6759319 - Fee: $ 400 Previously dismissed case: Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ranke, Nicholas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]
June 4, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ripper v. Leisure Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ripper
Represented By: Dani K. Liblang
Represented By: Mitchell B. Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ripper
Represented By: Dani K. Liblang
Represented By: Mitchell B. Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leisure Properties, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ranke
Represented By: Laura E. Craft-Schrick
Represented By: Mark S. Schuver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?