In The Matter Of American River Transportation Company, LLC et al
Defendant: American River Transportation Company, LLC et al and Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation
Petitioner: American River Transportation Company, LLC and Archer Daniels Midland Company
Claimant: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01773
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal Signed by All Parties Who Have Appeared by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company, Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (Lucas, Theodore)
November 19, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , to Stay, to Dissolve Injunction filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (DeKoter, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , to Stay, to Dissolve Injunction by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. Responses due by 12/26/2018 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix to DM&E Motions, #2 Exhibit Offer to Stipulate)(DeKoter, Daniel)
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. DeKoter on behalf of Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation (DeKoter, Daniel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Soo Line Railroad Company, Corporate Parent Canadian Pacific Railway for Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (DeKoter, Daniel)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel E. DeKoter on behalf of Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel E. DeKoter $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3717580 by on behalf of Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (DeKoter, Daniel)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Paschalis on behalf of Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation (Paschalis, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability as directed in #14 Order granting Motion for Issuance of Notice, Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking, and for Issuance of Order Restraining Suits. (lmt)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Notice, Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking, and for Issuance of Order Restraining Suits. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/31/2018. (lmt)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Phil Gilbert: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/31/2018. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (arf)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING: Telephone Status Conference is Reset for 10/31/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL INTO (618) 439-7733. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference is set for 10/23/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL INTO (618) 439-7733. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #3 Motion for Order,, filed by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company. A proposed Order was attached to the main document at [3-2]. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via e-mail to the Court (see CM/ECF User's Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). Proposed order to be deleted in accordance with this Court's practices. Proposed documents need to be e-mailed to the proper judge. (kls3)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #1 Complaint filed by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company. Docket text modified to include receipt of the filing fee. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanislav Levchinsky on behalf of American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company (Levchinsky, Stanislav)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-cv-1773-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (jsm2)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bart C. Sullivan on behalf of American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company (Sullivan, Bart)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Lucas, Theodore)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore H. Lucas on behalf of American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company (Lucas, Theodore)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to(1) Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking; (2) An Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice; and (3) Issuance of an Injunction by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filng of Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability, # 2 Supplement Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Letter of Undertaking, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Suits)(Lucas, Theodore)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 STIPULATION Ad Interim Stipulation for Value by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Undertaking)(Lucas, Theodore)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company. $400 filing fee paid, per receipt 0754-3683562. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lucas, Theodore) Modified on 10/1/2018 (kls3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter Of American River Transportation Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American River Transportation Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation
Represented By: Thomas C. Paschalis
Represented By: Daniel E. DeKoter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American River Transportation Company, LLC
Represented By: Bart C. Sullivan
Represented By: Stanislav Levchinsky
Represented By: Theodore H. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Archer Daniels Midland Company
Represented By: Bart C. Sullivan
Represented By: Stanislav Levchinsky
Represented By: Theodore H. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation
Represented By: Thomas C. Paschalis
Represented By: Daniel E. DeKoter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?