Ayoubi v. Hanesbrands Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Firas M. Ayoubi
Defendant: Hanesbrands Inc., Access Catalogue Company and Keefe Group L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01806
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Stephen C Williams
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 34625088377. (cjo)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Firas M. Ayoubi (kls3)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Plaintiff Ayoubi acknowledging receipt of Complaint without payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Blank Form Motion for IFP) (kls3)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:18-cv-1806-JPG-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Access Catalogue Company, Hanesbrands Inc., Keefe Group L.L.C., filed by Firas M. Ayoubi.(kls3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayoubi v. Hanesbrands Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firas M. Ayoubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanesbrands Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Catalogue Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keefe Group L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?