USA v. Estate of Michael R. Donohue et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Jeff Ohlson, Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Michael R. Donohue, deceased, Judith Kujanson, Daniel Donohue, Mary E. Donohue, Sean Donohue, Susan V. Becker, Non-Record Claimants, Estate of Michael R. Donohue, Timothy Donohue, Unknown Owners and Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Michael R. Donohue
Case Number: 3:2018cv01910
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Stephen C Williams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Status Conference held on 12/4/2018. Adam Hanna appears for the Plaintiff United States. No other parties appear. Counsel informs that the case will likely be uncontested and not require any discovery. Should the parties require discovery they are directed to contact the magistrate judge assigned the case. Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2019. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing: Scheduling conference cancelled. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling conference reset as a Status Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 03:30 PM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Call-in information remains the same.(anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 19, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Timothy Donohue Without Prejudice and to Substitute Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Timothy Donohue, Deceased by USA. Responses due by 12/26/2018 (Hanna, Adam)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Mary E. Donohue waiver sent on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Hanna, Adam)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, The Court FINDS that defendant Jeff Ohlson is DISMISSED from this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to terminate him as a defendant. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/14/2018. (jdh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Judith Kujanson waiver sent on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Hanna, Adam)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Susan V. Becker. (cjo)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 3:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/26/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Bench Trial is set for 12/9/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sean Donohue.(cds)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Daniel Donohue waiver sent on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Hanna, Adam)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Sean Donohue waiver sent on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Hanna, Adam)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jeff Ohlson by USA. Responses due by 11/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Order)(Hanna, Adam)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1910-JPG-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kdb)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by USA (Hanna, Adam)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Susan V. Becker, Daniel Donohue, Mary E. Donohue, Sean Donohue, Timothy Donohue, Estate of Michael R. Donohue, Judith Kujanson, Non-Record Claimants, Jeff Ohlson, Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Michael R. Donohue, deceased, Unknown Owners, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Estate of Michael R. Donohue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Ohlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Michael R. Donohue, deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Kujanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan V. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Michael R. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs and Legatees of Michael R. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?