Hall v. Spiller et al
Plaintiff: Robert Hall
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook, Shaun Gee, McCarthy, Jason Hart, William Spiller, Kent Bookman, Teri Kennedy and Donna Jones
Counter Claimant: Scanning Pontiac
Case Number: 3:2018cv02009
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint filed by Shaun Gee, Jacqueline Lashbrook, Kent Bookman, Jason Hart, McCarthy, William Spiller. Defendants are GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 1/18/2019, to file an answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 12/21/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 20, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Kent Bookman, Shaun Gee, Jason Hart, Jacqueline Lashbrook, McCarthy, William Spiller. (Patel, Hinal)
December 17, 2018 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $70.29 received, receipt number 34625089275. (dmw2)
December 13, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #20 Notice of Appearance filed by Shaun Gee, Jacqueline Lashbrook, Kent Bookman, Jason Hart, McCarthy, William Spiller. Certificate of Service contains the incorrect service address for plaintiff. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (cjo)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #19 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Shaun Gee, Jacqueline Lashbrook, Kent Bookman, Jason Hart, McCarthy, William Spiller. Attorney Christopher L. Higgerson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 12/12/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Hinal Akshay Patel on behalf of Kent Bookman, Shaun Gee, Jason Hart, Jacqueline Lashbrook, McCarthy, William Spiller (Patel, Hinal)
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Kent Bookman, Shaun Gee, Jason Hart, Jacqueline Lashbrook, McCarthy, William Spiller. (Patel, Hinal)
December 6, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Higgerson on behalf of Kent Bookman, Shaun Gee, Jason Hart, Jacqueline Lashbrook, McCarthy, William Spiller (Higgerson, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #3 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $27.29. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Pontiac Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/14/2018. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jaj)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Kent Bookman waiver sent on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018; Shaun Gee waiver sent on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018; Jason Hart waiver sent on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018; Jacqueline Lashbrook waiver sent on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018; McCarthy waiver sent on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018; William Spiller waiver sent on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (tjk)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jason Hart on 10/26/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/25/2018. (jaj)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kent Bookman on 10/26/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/25/2018. (jaj)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Shaun Gee on 10/26/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/25/2018. (jaj)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to McCarthy on 10/26/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/25/2018. (jaj)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jacqueline Lashbrook on 10/26/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/25/2018. (jaj)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to William Spiller on 10/26/2018. Waiver of Service due by 11/25/2018. (jaj)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/26/2018. (jaj)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. 3), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 4/1/2018 to 10/23/2018 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Pontiac Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 12/10/2018). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/26/2018. (jaj)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: This Notice and Order includes important information concerning the initial stages of your lawsuit. The Court has received your complaint. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify claims and defendants and to dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days. The Court will then inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or documents. If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within 60 days of filing your complaint, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. The Court will not consider a status motion at any time prior to the 60 day deadline. If you have filed a motion for recruitment of counsel, it will not be considered until the complaint is reviewed. In addition, any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel such as a list of attorneys contacted and copies of letters sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If your motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted and if your claim(s) survive the merit review, the Court will send a Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service Form to the appropriate defendant(s). This will be the first time the defendant(s) will be informed of your lawsuit. After a defendant signs the waiver and returns it, that defendant will then have 60 days to file an answer to your complaint. If a defendant does not return the completed waiver, the Court will follow up as necessary to complete service on that defendant. When all of the defendants have filed answers, the Court will enter a Scheduling Order containing important information on deadlines, discovery, and procedures. All requests for file-stamped copies of documents must be accompanied by a stamped, self-addressed envelope and an extra copy of the document to be file-stamped and returned. The Clerk cannot photocopy documents for you unless the copy fee of $0.50 per page is submitted in advance. Finally, you must promptly notify the court in writing of any change of address. Failure to notify the court of a change in your address could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/23/2018. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from USDC/SDIL to Plaintiff informing him of case number. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (jaj)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Hall. (jaj)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by Robert Hall. (jaj)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Spiller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Represented By: Christopher L. Higgerson
Represented By: Hinal Akshay Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Gee
Represented By: Christopher L. Higgerson
Represented By: Hinal Akshay Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy
Represented By: Christopher L. Higgerson
Represented By: Hinal Akshay Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hart
Represented By: Christopher L. Higgerson
Represented By: Hinal Akshay Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Spiller
Represented By: Christopher L. Higgerson
Represented By: Hinal Akshay Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Bookman
Represented By: Christopher L. Higgerson
Represented By: Hinal Akshay Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Scanning Pontiac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?