Sadowski v. Block Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Defendant: Block Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02015
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
2 Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/16/2019. (jdh)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court thus GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and INSTRUCTS the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/16/2019. (jdh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Phil Gilbert: Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2019. The Court hereby Grants #11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Judgment to follow. (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (tag)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of HEARING Regarding #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing is set for 9/16/2019 at 10:30 AM via Telephone Conference before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL INTO (618) 439-7733. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/10/2019. Richard Liebowitz present on behalf of the Plaintiff. Kathleen Kolodgy present on behalf of Defendant. Although the parties submitted an agreed joint report and proposed scheduling and discovery order, there is a pending motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. To date, Plaintiff has failed to respond to the motion to dismiss. The Court raises this issue with the parties from the outset. Plaintiff requests the Court voluntarily transfer the case to the Western District of Kentucky. Defendant opposes this request. The Court advises the parties this type of request must be made by way of motion and will be decided by the district judge. Defendant contends that Plaintiff should dismiss the case and refile it in the Western District of Kentucky and that there is an issue as to whether the proper Defendant has been named. Because all parties agree this case is not appropriate in this district (but disagree as to the vehicle to get it to another district), the Court declines to enter a scheduling order at this time and will reset the Rule 16 Conference at a later date, if necessary. Any relief sought by way of motion should be filed promptly. (Court Reporter proceedings not recorded.) (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE re 15 Order Resetting Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 0398. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Continue filed by Block Communications, Inc. Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 7/10/2019 at 11:15 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 6/13/2019. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue by Block Communications, Inc.. (Kolodgy, Kathleen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing (correcting time only): The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 6/18/2019 at 4:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 0398. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: On the Court's own motion, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 6/18/2019 at 3:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 0398. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Block Communications, Inc.. Responses due by 6/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kieth Wilkowski)(Kolodgy, Kathleen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Block Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent for Block Communications, Inc.. (Kolodgy, Kathleen)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 2:45 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 0398. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/2/2019. (arf)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 6/1/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen W. Kolodgy on behalf of Block Communications, Inc. (Kolodgy, Kathleen)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson no longer assigned to the case. (cds)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Block Communications, Inc. and forwarded to Attorney Richard Liebowitz via First Class Mail. (jsm2)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 AO 121 Report of Filing. (jsm2)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Sadowski. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Liebowitz does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-cv-2015-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (jsm2)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Block Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3704751.), filed by Christopher Sadowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadowski v. Block Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen W. Kolodgy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sadowski
Represented By: Richard M. Liebowitz
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?