Beam v. Watco Companies L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Mr. Kevin Beam and Kevin Beam
Defendant: Watco Companies L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02018
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Mincieli on behalf of Kevin Beam (Mincieli, Jonathan)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanislav Levchinsky on behalf of Watco Companies L.L.C. (Levchinsky, Stanislav)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Watco Companies L.L.C.. (Fox, Ronald)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Watco Companies L.L.C.. Responses due by 1/2/2019 (Fox, Ronald)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Fox on behalf of Watco Companies L.L.C. (Fox, Ronald)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Watco Companies L.L.C., filed by Kevin Beam.(Flowers, Peter)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Watco Companies L.L.C. and original mailed to Attorney Flowers. (kdb)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Flowers on behalf of Kevin Beam (Flowers, Peter)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by Kevin Beam.. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Flowers does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-2018-SMY-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kdb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Watco Companies L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3705419.), filed by Kevin Beam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Flowers, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beam v. Watco Companies L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watco Companies L.L.C.
Represented By: Ronald E Fox
Represented By: Stanislav Levchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Kevin Beam
Represented By: Peter J. Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Beam
Represented By: Peter J. Flowers
Represented By: Jonathan P. Mincieli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?