United States of America v. $392,126.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States and USA
Defendant: $392,126.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Neil Brinson
Case Number: 3:2018cv02034
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
0 Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
1 Judge: Stephen C Williams
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 11 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Neil Brinson. Answer does not include the appropriate electronic signature. For future filings, refer to Electronic Filing Rule 8 in the User's Manual Section 2.0 (Retention & Signature Requirements). This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 25, 2018 10 VERIFIED ANSWER to #1 Complaint IN REM by Neil Brinson.(Lentz, Jacek)
December 11, 2018 9 CLAIM Opposing Forfeiture Amended by Neil Brinson. (Lentz, Jacek)
December 11, 2018 8 CLAIM Claim Opposing Forfeiture by Neil Brinson. (Lentz, Jacek)
December 11, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacek W. Lentz on behalf of Neil Brinson (Lentz, Jacek)
November 2, 2018 6 Warrant for Arrest of Articles in Rem. (trb)
November 2, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
October 31, 2018 4 NOTICE by United States of America (Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Coonan, William)
October 31, 2018 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-2034-NJR-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (dmw2)
October 30, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Coonan on behalf of United States (Coonan, William)
October 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $392,126.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coonan, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $392,126.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $392,126.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: William E. Coonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Represented By: William E. Coonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Neil Brinson
Represented By: Jacek W. Lentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?