City of Columbia, Illinois v. Crown Castle GT Company LLC, et al

Plaintiff: City of Columbia, Illinois
Defendant: Crown Castle International Corp., Crown Castle GT Company LLC, GTE Wireless Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02065
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
0 Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
1 Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 43 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams no longer assigned to the case. (jaj)
December 28, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Columbia, Illinois. Responses due by 1/31/2019 (Eveker, Margaret)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to Defendant Crown Castle GT Company LLC's Motion to Consolidate shall be filed no more than seven (7) days following the Court's ruling on the pending Motion to Remand in Cause No. 3:18-cv-02063-SMY-RJD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 12/27/2018. (jmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 26, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Consolidate by City of Columbia, Illinois, City of Columbia, Illinois. (Eveker, Margaret)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff, the City of Columbia, Illinois, shall have up to and including December 28, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to Defendant Crown Castle GT Company's Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/21/2018. (klh2) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 21, 2018 Filing 38 SUPPLEMENT by City of Columbia, Illinois, City of Columbia, Illinois. Supplement to #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Notice of Consent by Crown Castle GT. (Eveker, Margaret)
December 21, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #23 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by City of Columbia, Illinois, City of Columbia, Illinois. (Streubel, David)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Amended Notice of Removal (Doc. 35) sufficiently alleges federal subject matter jurisdiction and cures all the defects present in the initial Notice of Removal (Doc. 1). Plaintiffs Motion to Remand #30 is, therefore, DENIED as MOOT. The stay previously issued on Plaintiffs deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. 25) is lifted. Plaintiffs response to the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Doc. 25] is due on or before Friday, January 18, 2019.. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/18/2018. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 17, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE by Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp. Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Court File, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - FCC Notice)(Wacker, Brian)
December 14, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp., New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Detainer Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - City Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order)(Wacker, Brian)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Richard Todd Victoria on behalf of Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp., New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.(cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Plaintiff's deadline to respond to #25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is STAYED, and no response is necessary at this time. The response deadline will be reset, if necessary, after the Court determines whether this case was properly removed and subject matter jurisdiction exists (See Docs. 20, 30). Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/11/2018. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard Todd Victoria $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3742553 by on behalf of Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp., New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Victoria, Richard)
December 10, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Columbia, Illinois, City of Columbia, Illinois. Responses due by 1/14/2019 (Eveker, Margaret)
December 3, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #25 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Crown Castle International Corp., #26 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Crown Castle International Corp. According to the PDF documents attached to these filings, they are filed on behalf of Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp., New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC; however, only Crown Castle International Corp was selected as the filer upon docketing. Docket text of these filings has been modified to include Crown Castle GT Company LLC and New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC as filers. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 3, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #23 Counterclaim filed by Crown Castle GT Company LLC. Filer inadvertently selected itself as the party whom the Counterclaim is against. Docket sheet has been correct and docket text of Document #23 has been modified as follows: COUNTERCLAIM against City of Columbia, Illinois, by Crown Castle GT Company LLC. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 30, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Wacker, Brian)
November 30, 2018 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp., New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. (Wacker, Brian) Modified on 12/3/2018 (kek).
November 30, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp., New Cingular Wireless PCS LLC. Responses due by 1/7/2019 (Wacker, Brian) Modified on 12/3/2018 (kek).
November 30, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Crown Castle International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Tower 1 Lease, #2 Exhibit B-Tower 1 Lease Amd, #3 Exhibit C-Tower Lease 2 Amd, #4 Exhibit D-Tower 2 Letter Amd, #5 Exhibit E-Ordinance, #6 Exhibit F-Ordinance, #7 Exhibit G-Default Notice, #8 Exhibit H-Default Response, #9 Exhibit I-Vogel Response, #10 Exhibit J-Response ltr, #11 Exhibit K-Letter to Vogel, #12 Exhibit L-Letter to Ebken)(Wacker, Brian)
November 30, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against City of Columbia, Illinois by Crown Castle GT Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Tower 1 Lease, #2 Exhibit B-Tower 1 Lease Amd, #3 Exhibit C-Tower Lease 2 Amd, #4 Exhibit D-Tower 2 Letter Amd, #5 Exhibit E-Ordinance, #6 Exhibit F-Ordinance, #7 Exhibit G-Default Notice, #8 Exhibit H-Default Response, #9 Exhibit I-Vogel Response, #10 Exhibit J-Response ltr, #11 Exhibit K-Letter to Vogel, #12 Exhibit L-Letter to Ebken)(Wacker, Brian) Modified on 12/3/2018 (kek).
November 30, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (Welply, Justin)
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Wacker on behalf of New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC (Wacker, Brian)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendants Crown Castle GT Company and Crown Castle International Corp. are ORDERED to file an amended notice of removal on or before December 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/26/2018. (drb)
November 21, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by City of Columbia, Illinois Filing Memorandum re Service on Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Compliance for Service on Secretary of State)(Streubel, David)
November 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #16 Summons Returned Executed filed by City of Columbia, Illinois. Document should not be filed in our Court. (kls3)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Margaret C. Eveker on behalf of City of Columbia, Illinois. (kls3)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 ENTRY STRICKEN. SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Columbia, Illinois. (Streubel, David) Modified on 11/21/2018 (kls3).
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Margaret C. Eveker $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3726854 by on behalf of City of Columbia, Illinois. (Eveker, Margaret)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Streubel on behalf of City of Columbia, Illinois (Streubel, David)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Responsive pleading due no later than November 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 11/16/2018. (jmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Crown Castle International Corp., Crown Castle GT Company LLC. Proposed order was attached to the main document. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via e-mail to the Court (see CM/ECF Users Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). Proposed order to be deleted in accordance with this Courts practices. Proposed documents need to be e-mailed to the proper judge. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp.. (Attachments: Deleted per NOM at doc. 12 # 1 Supplement Proposed Order for Consent Motion for Extension of Time)(Wacker, Brian) Modified on 11/15/2018 (dkd).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The civil cover sheet indicates that a jury demand has been made (Doc. 1-2). Consequently, no Supplement to Notice of Removal is needed and the instructions to that effect in the Court's previous Order can be disregarded (see Doc. 6). Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/14/2018. (klh2) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Wacker on behalf of Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp. (Wacker, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp. (Welply, Justin)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge J. Phil Gilbert recused. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/13/2018. (jdh)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 11/27/2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/13/2018. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:18-cv-2065-JPG-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal)(Wacker, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Castle International Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Crown Castle International for Crown Castle International Corp.. (Wacker, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Castle GT Company LLC identifying Other Affiliate Crown Castle International Corp. for Crown Castle GT Company LLC. (Wacker, Brian)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County, Illinois, case number 2018MR60 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3718871), filed by Crown Castle International Corp., Crown Castle GT Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Court Civil File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wacker, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Columbia, Illinois v. Crown Castle GT Company LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Castle International Corp.
Represented By: Brian M. Wacker
Represented By: Richard Todd Victoria
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Castle GT Company LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Wacker
Represented By: Richard Todd Victoria
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE Wireless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Represented By: Richard Todd Victoria
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Represented By: Brian M. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Columbia, Illinois
Represented By: David A. Streubel
Represented By: Margaret C. Eveker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?