Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc. v. KG Administrative Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.
Defendant: Tracey Keiser, PeopLease, LLC, KG Administrative Services, Inc., Robert Frazier, The Keiser Group, LLC and Keiser Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02067
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
0 Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
1 Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to KG Administrative Services, Inc. on 1/3/2019. (cds)
December 29, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant KG Administrative Services, Inc. by Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.. (Howard, Giles)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to PeopLease, LLC.(cds)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Keiser Group, LLC. (cds)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant PeopLease, LLC by Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.. (Howard, Giles)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant The Keiser Group, LLC by Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.. (Howard, Giles)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.. PeopLease, LLC served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Howard, Giles)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.. KG Administrative Services, Inc. served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Howard, Giles)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to KG Administrative Services, Inc.. (cds)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.. Keiser Group, LLC served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Howard, Giles)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Howard, Giles)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Giles Benjamin Howard on behalf of Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc. (Howard, Giles)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal W Settergren on behalf of Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc. (Settergren, Neal)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Robert Frazier, KG Administrative Services, Inc., Tracey Keiser, PeopLease, LLC, The Keiser Group, LLC. (cjo)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-2067-SMY-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (cjo)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Howard does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.. (Howard, Giles)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3718945.), filed by Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Howard, Giles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc. v. KG Administrative Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Keiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PeopLease, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KG Administrative Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Keiser Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keiser Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Illinois Motor Xpress, Inc.
Represented By: Giles Benjamin Howard
Represented By: Neal W Settergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?