Johnson v. USA
Petitioner: Shaundale J. Johnson
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2018cv02111
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Government's Response due by 2/11/2019. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/2/2019. (drs2) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Robertson, Amanda)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION filed by USA. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/11/2018. (jdh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #4 Memorandum & Order. Incorrect document filed. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STRICKEN PER DOC.#5-MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court ORDERS the Government to file a response to Johnson's 2255 motion within THIRTY DAYS of the date this order is entered. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/11/2018. (jdh) Modified on 12/11/2018 (jdh).
December 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION by USA. (Robertson, Amanda)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ORDERS the Government to file a response to Johnson's 2255 motion within THIRTY DAYS of the date this order is entered. The Government shall, as part of its response, attach all relevant portions of the record in the underlying criminal case. ( Response due by 12/27/2018.)Johnson shall then have FOURTEEN DAYS to reply to the Government's response. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/27/2018. (jdh)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Shaundale J. Johnson. (Attachments: #(1) Consent to Magistrate, #(2) Letter to AUSA).(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shaundale J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Amanda A. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?