Oberg v. USA
Petitioner: Kyle Wayne Oberg
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2018cv02140
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David R Herndon
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines. Response due by 3/15/2019, per Order at Doc. 7. (kls3)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: For good cause shown, the Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by USA (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED. Response due by March 15, 2019. The Government is advised that additional requests will not likely be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 1/30/2019. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION Requesting Judicial Notice Be Taken Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 201 by Kyle Wayne Oberg. (dmw2)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle. Judge David R. Herndon no longer assigned to the case. (dkd)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Scott, Angela)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Government's Response due by 1/12/2019 (kek)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Kyle Wayne Oberg. The Court DIRECTS the government to respond to the 28 U.S.C. Section 2255 motion on or before January 12, 2019. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 12/11/2018. (jer)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Scott on behalf of USA (Scott, Angela)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Kyle Wayne Oberg. (Attachments: #(1) Letter to AUSA).(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oberg v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Represented By: Angela Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kyle Wayne Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?